The Board of Trustees v. Buena Vista Grading & Paving, Inc.
Plaintiff: The Board of Trustees
Defendant: Buena Vista Grading & Paving, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2010cv03839
Filed: August 27, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 31 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Order Dismissing Action For Sixty (60) Days, Or In The Alternative, Plaintiffs' Request To Reopen Case; Proposed Order filed by Buena Vista Grading & Paving, Inc., The Board of Trustees. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 2/6/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2012)
December 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 12/6/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2011)
October 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER CONDITIONALLY DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 10/18/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2011)
December 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 12/13/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Board of Trustees v. Buena Vista Grading & Paving, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Board of Trustees
Represented By: Ezekiel D. Carder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buena Vista Grading & Paving, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?