Northern California River Watch v. Oakland Maritime Support Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Northern California River Watch, Teamsters Local 70 and East Bay Alliance for a Sustainable Economy
Defendant: Oakland Maritime Support Services, Inc., William Aboudi, Jorge Gonzalez Rivera, City of Oakland, Redevelopment Agency of the City of Oakland and Community and Economic Development Agency
Case Number: 4:2010cv03912
Filed: August 31, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1365
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 130 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2014)
March 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER REGARDING SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/10/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2014)
February 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE STIPULATION OR STATUS REPORT. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/19/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2014)
February 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT. Granting 125 Stipulation.(finding as moot 106 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ; terminating 122 Stipulation) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
January 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER Granting 122 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference For Approximately 30 Days. Case Management Statement due by 2/19/2014. Case Management Conference set for 2/26/2014 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/16/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2014)
October 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 118 Stipulation to CONSENT TO AMEND COMPLAINT TO ADD CITY OF OAKLAND AS A DEFENDANT (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2013)
August 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER VACATING TRIAL-RELATED DATES AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 10/23/2013. Case Management Conference set for 10/30/2013 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/12/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2013)
October 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION 97 . Order to Show Cause is VACATED. Settlement Conference set for 11/15/2012 09:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 10/29/12. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2012)
October 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER VACATING Settlement Conference and setting Order to Show Cause Hearing for 10/30/2012 09:30 AM. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 10/26/12. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2012)
October 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 93 Stipulation Requesting a settlement conference and to Extend Disovery Deadlines and Set Mediation. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2012)
February 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER Granting 84 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and Extend Trial Date. Case Management Statement due by 11/1/2012. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/8/2012 02:00 PM. Motion Hearing set for 11/8/2012 02: 00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Jury Trial set for 3/5/2013 08:30 AM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Jury Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/20/2013 02:00 PM. Jury Selection set for 3/4/2013 08:30 AM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Jury Trial (5 day)set for 3/4/2013 08:30 AM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/28/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2012)
November 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER RE PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL AND MOTION FOR SANCTIONS (Dkt. Nos. 49 and 52.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 11/17/2011. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2011)
November 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting 76 STIPULATION REGARDING RULE 34 REQUEST FOR ENTRY UPON LAND FOR INSPECTION AND STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by Northern California River Watch, East Bay Alliance for a Sustainable Economy, Teamsters Local 70. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 11/9/2011. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2011)
October 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER RE: PLAINTIFFS MOTIONS TO COMPEL AND FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT REDEVELOPMENT AGENCY OF THE CITY OF OAKLAND (Dkt. Nos. 49 & 52). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 10/6/2011. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2011)
September 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS OAKLAND MARITIME SUPPORT SERVICES, INC., AND WILLIAM ABOUDIS MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME RE: PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 9/30/2011. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2011)
August 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL AND MOTION FOR SANCTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 8/31/2011. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2011)
August 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Discovery Purposes re 49 MOTION to Compel Inspection of Land and Responses to Requests for Production and 52 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/30/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2011)
June 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Granting 47 Stipulation for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/7/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2011)
February 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING 13 DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2011)
December 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Granting re 27 Stipulation to Reschedule CMC. Case Management Statement due by 2/22/2011. Case Management Conference set for 3/8/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/13/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Northern California River Watch v. Oakland Maritime Support Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northern California River Watch
Represented By: Douglas Jonathan Chermak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teamsters Local 70
Represented By: Douglas Jonathan Chermak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: East Bay Alliance for a Sustainable Economy
Represented By: Douglas Jonathan Chermak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oakland Maritime Support Services, Inc.
Represented By: Jay Ian Aboudi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Aboudi
Represented By: Jay Ian Aboudi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jorge Gonzalez Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Oakland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Redevelopment Agency of the City of Oakland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Community and Economic Development Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?