Windermere Holdings, LLC v. U.S. Wall Decor, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Windermere Holdings, LLC
Defendant: U.S. Wall Decor, LLC, Kinkade Events, LLC, Albert R. Scarlata and Nick R. Bomleny
Case Number: 4:2010cv03955
Filed: September 2, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Orange
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER REGARDING 84 PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND AND ORDER FOLLOWING SEPTEMBER 1, 2011 HEARING. Signed by Judge Beeler on 9/1/11. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2011)
August 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER SETTING FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE FOR SEPTEMBER 1, 2011. Signed by Judge Beeler on 8/25/11. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2011)
August 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER GRANTING 69 DEFENDANTS MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL.(lblc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2011)
July 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER REGARDING EXTENSION OF TIME TO COMPLETE MEDIATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 7/5/2011. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2011)
May 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER GRANTING 67 Stipulation, filed by Kinkade Events, LLC, Windermere Holdings, LLC, Nick R. Bomleny, Thomas Kinkade, Albert R. Scarlata, U.S. Wall Decor, LLC. Signed by Judge Beeler on 5/26/11. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2011)
April 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER GRANTING 57 Stipulation, filed by Kinkade Events, LLC, Windermere Holdings, LLC, Nick R. Bomleny, Thomas Kinkade, Albert R. Scarlata, U.S. Wall Decor, LLC. Signed by Judge Beeler on 4/25/11. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2011)
March 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER GRANTING 50 Stipulation, filed by Kinkade Events, LLC, Windermere Holdings, LLC, Nick R. Bomleny, Albert R. Scarlata, U.S. Wall Decor, LLC. Signed by Judge Beeler on 3/15/11. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2011)
March 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER. Signed by Judge Laporte on 3/8/11. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2011)
January 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER by Judge Beeler denying 25 Ex Parte Application (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2011)
December 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER CONTINUING JANUARY 6, 2011 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO FEBRUARY 24, 2011. Signed by Judge Beeler on 12/28/10. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2010)
December 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE CONSENT/DECLINATION FORM BY DECEMBER 30, 2010.. Signed by Judge Beeler on 12/21/10. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2010)
December 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING 15 Stipulation and Proposed Order selecting Early Neutral Evaluation filed by Windermere Holdings, LLC. Signed by Judge Beeler on 12/17/10. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Windermere Holdings, LLC v. U.S. Wall Decor, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Windermere Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Kobulnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Wall Decor, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kinkade Events, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert R. Scarlata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nick R. Bomleny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?