Operating Engineers' Pension Trust Fund et al v. Western Power & Equipment Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Operating Engineers' Pension Trust Fund, F. G. Crosthwaite and Russell E. Burns
Defendant: Western Power & Equipment Corp., Case Dealer Holding Company, LLC, CNH America, LLC, Arizona Pacific Materials, LLC, Arizona Pacific Materials II LLC, Charles Dean McLain, Robert Rubin and Rubin Family Irrevocable Stock Trust
Case Number: 4:2010cv04460
Filed: October 1, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1451
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER of Reference to Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 1/6/2012. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2012)
October 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 118 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING MEDIATION AND OTHER DEADLINES re 116 Stipulation, filed by F. G. Crosthwaite, Russell E. Burns, Operating Engineers' Pension Trust Fund. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/11/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2011)
September 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 112 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER re 111 Case Management Conference - Initial. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 9/6/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2011)
June 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting in part and denying in part 67 Motion to Dismiss (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2011)
May 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 91 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR ARIZONA PACIFIC MATERIALS, LLC TO RESPOND TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT re 84 Stipulation filed by Arizona Pacific Materials II LLC. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 5/31/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2011)
May 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 73 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEAN RUBIN, THE RUBIN FAMILY IRREVOCABLE TRUST AND DEAN MCLAIN TO RESPOND TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT re 71 MOTION STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED ORDER] TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEAN RUBIN, THE RUBIN FAMILY IRREVOCA BLE TRUST, AND DEAN MCLAIN TO RESPOND TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT MOTION STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED ORDER] TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEAN RUBIN, THE RUBIN FAMILY IRREVOCABLE TRUST, AND DEAN MCLAIN TO RESPOND TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by F. G. Crosthwaite, Russell E. Burns, Operating Engineers' Pension Trust Fund. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 5/10/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2011)
May 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 69 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FROM ARIZONA PACIFIC MATERIALS II TO RESPOND TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT re 68 Stipulation filed by Arizona Pacific Materials II LLC. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 5/3/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2011)
March 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER by Judge Hamilton Granting in Part and Denying in Part 26 Motion to Dismiss (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2011)
March 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 63 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND RELATED DEADLINES re 60 MOTION to Continue STIPULATION REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND RELATED DEADLINES; AND [PROPOSED] ORDER MOTION to Continue STIPULATION REGARDIN G CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND RELATED DEADLINES; AND [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by F. G. Crosthwaite, Russell E. Burns, Operating Engineers' Pension Trust Fund. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 3/24/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2011)
February 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER GRANTING 42 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Steven L. Brenneman. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 2/8/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2011)
December 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/31/2011. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/7/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 12/28/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2010)
December 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 BRIEFING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 12/15/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2010)
November 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 11/22/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2010)
November 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER on re 12 Parties' Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 11/5/2010. (ahy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Operating Engineers' Pension Trust Fund et al v. Western Power & Equipment Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Operating Engineers' Pension Trust Fund
Represented By: Shaamini Babu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: F. G. Crosthwaite
Represented By: Shaamini Babu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell E. Burns
Represented By: Shaamini Babu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Power & Equipment Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Case Dealer Holding Company, LLC
Represented By: Sandra Jean McMullan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CNH America, LLC
Represented By: Sandra Jean McMullan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona Pacific Materials, LLC
Represented By: M. Michael Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona Pacific Materials II LLC
Represented By: M. Michael Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Dean McLain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rubin Family Irrevocable Stock Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?