Athena Feminine Technologies Inc. v. Wilkes et al
Plaintiff: Athena Feminine Technologies Inc.
Defendant: Derek Wilkes, Ursula Wilkes, Pelfit Technologies LLC, Dragon Ventures LTD., Morton Cordell, Simon Fan, King Chamption (Hong Kong) LTD and Yielding Limited Hong Kong
Case Number: 4:2010cv04868
Filed: October 27, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER CONDITIONALLY DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 7/22/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2013)
April 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denying 150 Motion for Leave to File (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2013)
March 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 157 Ex Parte Application (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2013)
February 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denying 138 Motion for Leave to File (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2013)
November 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER re Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 11/21/2012. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2012)
November 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 124 STIPULATION AND ORDER, Motions terminated: 121 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 117 Order on Stipulation,, filed by Athena Feminine Technologies Inc., Pelfit Technologies LLC, Morton Cordell, Derek Wilkes, Silk Road Associates LLC. Case Management Conference set for 3/14/2013 10:00 AM. Claims Construction Hearing set for 3/14/2013 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 11/13/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2012)
October 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER Re Settlement Discussions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 10/09/2012. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2012)
September 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER Re Settlement Discussions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 09/18/2012. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2012)
September 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER Re Settlement Discussions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 09/07/2012. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2012)
August 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 116 Stipulation Setting Deadlines for Claim Construction Hearing. Claim Construction Hearing and Case Management Conference set for 02/27/13 at 10:00 AM. Joint Case Management Statements due by 02/20/ 13. Joint Claim Construction Statements to be served by 11/12/12; Opening Briefs and Evidence to filed/served by 12/6/12; Opposition Brief and Evidence to be filed/served by 12/20/12; Reply Brief to filed/served by 02/06/13. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 08/28/12 (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2012)
July 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 113 STIPULATION AND ORDER: Resetting Further Settlement Conference from 7/30/2012 11:00 AM to 8/24/2012 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu re 112 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Setting Settlement Conference re 110 Order filed by Athena Feminine Technologies Inc., Pelfit Technologies LLC, Morton Cordell, Derek Wilkes, Silk Road Associates LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 7/25/12. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2012)
June 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 109 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 108 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal With Prejudice filed by Simon Fan, King Champion (Hong Kong) LTD, King Champion (Hong Kong) LTD, King Champion (Hong Kong) LTD, Simon Fan and King Champion (Hong Kong) LTD terminated.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 6/12/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2012)
June 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER SETTING DEADLINE TO SUBMIT UPDATE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 6/4/2012. (hlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2012)
May 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER Granting Request for Extension of Time to Submit Update. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 5/22/2012. (hlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2012) Modified on 5/22/2012 (hlkS, COURT STAFF).
April 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denying 83 Motion to Stay (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2012)
December 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER Re Personal Attendance at Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 12/12/2011. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2011)
November 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 77 NOTICE OF REFERENCE AND ORDER RE DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/2/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2011)
September 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 71 STIPULATION AND ORDER Case Management Conference set for 1/11/2012 03:45 PM. VIA TELEPHONE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 9/28/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2011)
September 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting in part and denying in part 41 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 43 Motion to Dismiss (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Athena Feminine Technologies Inc. v. Wilkes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Athena Feminine Technologies Inc.
Represented By: Steven C. Finley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derek Wilkes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ursula Wilkes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pelfit Technologies LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dragon Ventures LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morton Cordell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simon Fan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: King Chamption (Hong Kong) LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yielding Limited Hong Kong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?