Praetorian Insurance Company v. Qiao et al
Plaintiff: Praetorian Insurance Company
Defendant: Min Qiao, Zhe Zhang, Chowyu Zhang, The Floor Store, Inc. and James L. Cline
Case Number: 4:2010cv05314
Filed: November 23, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER OF DISMISSAL, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 3/30/12. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2012)
July 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE EXTENSION OF EARLY NEUTRAL EVALUATION (ENE) DEADLINE re 29 Stipulation filed by Praetorian Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 7/20/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2011)
June 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER RE: ATTENDANCE. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 6/23/2011. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2011)
April 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER re 24 Case Management Conference - Initial. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 4/12/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2011)
March 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge Hamilton Denying 10 Motion to Dismiss (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2011)
February 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE and ORDER Continuing Hearing Date. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 2/25/2011. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2011)
February 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/31/2011. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/7/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 2/1/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Praetorian Insurance Company v. Qiao et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Praetorian Insurance Company
Represented By: John P Cotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Min Qiao
Represented By: Lori Ann Sebransky
Represented By: Ralph Astor Lombardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zhe Zhang
Represented By: Lori Ann Sebransky
Represented By: Ralph Astor Lombardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chowyu Zhang
Represented By: Ralph Astor Lombardi
Represented By: Lori Ann Sebransky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Floor Store, Inc.
Represented By: Ralph Astor Lombardi
Represented By: Lori Ann Sebransky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James L. Cline
Represented By: Ralph Astor Lombardi
Represented By: Lori Ann Sebransky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?