J&J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Cornell et al
Plaintiff: J&J Sports Productions, Inc.
Defendant: Ricci Cornell and Corzac, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2010cv05460
Filed: December 2, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CONDITIONAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/19/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2011)
March 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting 13 Stipulation Continuing the Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 4/19/2011. Case Management Conference set for 4/26/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/25/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2011)
February 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE CONSENT/DECLINATION FORM BY FEBRUARY 18, 2011. Signed by Judge Beeler on 2/8/2011. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J&J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Cornell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J&J Sports Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Peter Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricci Cornell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corzac, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?