IO Group, Inc v. J.W. Featured Case
Plaintiff: IO Group, Inc
Defendant: J.W.
Case Number: 4:2010cv05821
Filed: December 21, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2011 Filing 26 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice by IO Group, Inc (Sperlein, D.) (Filed on 3/15/2011)
February 10, 2011 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE TO PRO SE DEFENDANT J.W. of 24 Supplemental Order Re: Defendant's Motion for Protective Order (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2011).
February 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER 22 Re Defendant's Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 02/10/2011. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2011)
January 24, 2011 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE TO DEFENDANT J.W. re 22 Order Denying Motion to Quash; Granting a Limited Protective Order; and Denying Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Without Prejudice (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2011)
January 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING a Limited Protective Order 4 , DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 5 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, and DENYING 6 Motion to Quash. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 1/24/2011. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2011)
January 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PLEASE DISREGARD DOCKET ENTRY 21. ORDER SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DONNA M. RYU ON JANUARY 24, 2011 INSTEAD OF JANUARY 20, 2011. SEE DOCKET ENTRY 22 ORDER GRANTING a Limited Protective Order 4 , DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 5 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, and DENYING 6 Motion to Quash. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 1/24/2011. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2011) Modified on 1/24/2011 (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF).
January 3, 2011 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE TO J.W. re 19 Proposed Order, 18 Declaration in Support, 17 Memorandum in Opposition (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2011)
December 30, 2010 Filing 19 Proposed Order re 4 MOTION for Protective Order, 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, 6 MOTION to Quash by IO Group, Inc. (Sperlein, D.) (Filed on 12/30/2010)
December 30, 2010 Filing 18 Declaration of D. Gill Sperlein in Support of 17 Memorandum in Opposition filed byIO Group, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A., # 2 Exhibit B., # 3 Exhibit C.)(Related document(s) 17 ) (Sperlein, D.) (Filed on 12/30/2010)
December 30, 2010 Filing 17 Memorandum in Opposition re 4 MOTION for Protective Order, 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, 6 MOTION to Quash filed byIO Group, Inc. (Sperlein, D.) (Filed on 12/30/2010)
December 22, 2010 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE TO DEFENDANT J.W. re 14 Order Setting Initial Case Management Conference and ADR Deadlines, 15 Clerk's Notice re: Assignment of Case Number (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2010)
December 21, 2010 Filing 15 CLERKS NOTICE re: assignment of case number (kk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2010)
December 21, 2010 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2010)
December 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 3/23/2011. Case Management Conference set for 3/30/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland.. Signed by Judge Donna M. Ryu on 12/21/10. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(kk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2010)
December 21, 2010 Filing 13 NOTICE re: Order Complaince by J.W. (originally filed in 4:10cv4382). (kk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2010)
December 21, 2010 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by IO Group, Inc (originally filed in 4:10cv4382) (kk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2010)
December 21, 2010 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re 10 Order (Originally filed in 4:10cv4382) (kk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2010)
December 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER staying complainace with Subpoena. Signed by Judge Donna M. Ryu on 11/29/10 in 4:10cv4382. (kk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2010)
December 21, 2010 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 4 MOTION for Protective Order, 6 MOTION to Quash, 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Motion Hearing set for 1/27/2011 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. (kk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2010)
December 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re: severing JW from 4:10cv4382. Signed by Judge Donna M. Ryu on 12/15/10. (kk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2010)
December 21, 2010 Filing 8 CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by J.W. (Originally filed in 4:10cv4382). (kk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2010)
December 21, 2010 Filing 7 Declaration in Support of 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, 6 MOTION to Quash filed byJ.W. (originally filed in 4:10cv4382). (Related document(s) 5 , 6 ) (kk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2010)
December 21, 2010 Filing 6 MOTION to Quash filed by J.W. (Originally filed in 4:10cv4382). (kk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2010)
December 21, 2010 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by J.W. (originally filed in 4:10cv4382). (kk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2010)
December 21, 2010 Filing 4 MOTION for Protective Order filed by J.W. (originally filed 4:10cv4382). (kk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2010)
December 21, 2010 Filing 3 CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by IO Group, Inc.(originally filed in 4:10cv4382). (kk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2010)
December 21, 2010 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against J.W.. Filed by IO Group, Inc. (Document from 4:10cv4382) (kk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2010)
December 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ORDER severing J.W. claims from 4:10cv-4382-DMR. Signed by Judge Donna M. Ryu on 12/21/10. (kk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IO Group, Inc v. J.W.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IO Group, Inc
Represented By: D. Gill Sperlein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.W.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?