Scheiber v. Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company
Plaintiff: Andrew M. Scheiber
Defendant: Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company
Case Number: 4:2010cv05838
Filed: December 22, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER VACATING PENDING DATES AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 29 Notice (Other) filed by Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company. Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/24/2012. Case Management Conference set for 5/31/2012 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 3/20/12. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2012)
November 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING MEDIATION COMPLETION DATE AND RELATED DATES re 27 Stipulation filed by Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 11/21/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2011)
May 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING REST PERIOD COUNTS FROM THE SECOND CAUSE OF ACTION re 20 Stipulation filed by Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 5/25/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2011)
March 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS (PRIVATE MEDIATION) re 13 Stipulation and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR filed by Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company, Case referred to Private ADR. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 3/28/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2011)
January 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/14/2011. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/21/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/19/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scheiber v. Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew M. Scheiber
Represented By: Michael L. Carver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company
Represented By: Tomomi Katherine Glover
Represented By: Michelle B. Heverly
Represented By: Jeremy Alan Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?