Calix v. Apple Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff Daniel Calix alleged that Defendant Apple Inc. violated the Louisiana Unfair Trade Practices Act, La R.S. 51:1401 and breached its warranty by using liquid submersion indicators on Apple's iPhone, iPhone 3G, iPhone 3GS and iPod Touch to determine whether liquids have entered a device even though Apple allegedly knows that the liquid submersion indicators are not a reliable indicator of damage due to submersion, but still uses them to void its express warranty and its AppleCare Protection Plan.

Plaintiff: Daniel Calix
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Case Number: 4:2010cv05895
Filed: December 27, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2010 Filing 23 CLERKS NOTICE Re: Receipt of Case Transferred in from the Middle District of Louisiana, Case No. 10-676-BAJ-SCR. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2010)
December 27, 2010 Filing 22 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 3/30/2011. Case Management Conference set for 4/6/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2010)
December 27, 2010 Filing 21 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Middle; Case Number 3:10-cv-00676. Case File Electronically transfered, copy of Transfer Order and Docket Sheet received. Modified on 12/28/2010 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
December 27, 2010 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2010)
December 17, 2010 Filing 20 Order Transferring Case to the Northern District of California.. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 12/16/2010. (CMM)
December 15, 2010 Filing 19 NOTICE of No Opposition and Consent to Transfer by Daniel Calix re 13 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California (Jones, Christopher) Modified on 12/15/2010 to edit text. (CMM)
December 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 RULING and ORDER granting 15 Motion to Stay and this matter is stayed with the exception of the motion to transfer until the Court issues a ruling on the motion to transfer.. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 12/08/10. (PAH)
December 3, 2010 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Apple Inc., filed by Daniel Calix.(PAH)
December 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting 14 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by Daniel Calix. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 12/3/2010. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(Riedlinger, Stephen)
December 3, 2010 Filing 15 Consent MOTION to Stay by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Attachment Proposed Order)(Moore, Douglas)
December 3, 2010 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Daniel Calix. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Proposed Pleading;)(Brady, Scott)
December 3, 2010 MOTION(S) REFERRED: 14 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (PJH)
December 1, 2010 Filing 13 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Declaration in Support, # 3 Declaration of Counsel, # 4 Exhibit A, # 5 Exhibit B, # 6 Exhibit C, # 7 Exhibit D)(Moore, Douglas)
December 1, 2010 Filing 12 RULING Pltfs 8 Motion for Reconsideration and his 9 Second MOTION for Extension of Time Deadline for Filing Motion for Class Certification Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 23.1(B) are denied as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 12/1/2010. (JDL)
December 1, 2010 Filing 11 Ex Parte MOTION to Continue Hearing on 10 Class Certification and Incorporated Memorandum in Support by Daniel Calix. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Jones, Christopher) Modified on 12/1/2010 to edit text. (CMM)
December 1, 2010 Filing 10 MOTION to Certify Class by Daniel Calix. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(Jones, Christopher)
November 29, 2010 Filing 9 Second MOTION for Extension of Time Deadline for Filing Motion for Class Certification Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 23.1(B) by Daniel Calix. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Jones, Christopher)
November 29, 2010 Filing 8 MOTION for Reconsideration of 5 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Deadline for Filing Motion for Class Certification Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 23.1(B) and Incorporated Memorandum in Support by Daniel Calix. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit)(Jones, Christopher)
November 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by Daniel Calix re 6 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit)(Jones, Christopher)
November 29, 2010 MOTION(S) REFERRED: 8 MOTION for Reconsideration of 5 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Deadline for Filing Motion for Class Certification Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 23.1(B) and Incorporated Memorandum in Support MOTION for Reconsideration of 5 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Deadline for Filing Motion for Class Certification Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 23.1(B) and Incorporated Memorandum in Support. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (NLT)
November 19, 2010 Filing 6 RULING denying 5 MOTION to Extend Deadline for Filing Motion for Class Certification Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 23.1(B). Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 11/19/10. (BP)
November 19, 2010 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Deadline for Filing Motion for Class Certification Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 23.1(B) and Incorporated Memorandum in Support by Daniel Calix. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Brady, Scott)
October 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4 90 DAY CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 1/13/2011 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger. Status Report due by 12/30/2010.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 10/18/2010. (CMM)
October 14, 2010 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Apple Inc.. (Urquhart, Quentin)
October 8, 2010 Filing 2 Letter to MDL Panel notifying panel of possible MDL case (JDL, )
October 7, 2010 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 18th JDC Parish of West Baton Rouge, Case Number 38819. (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 053N-609174), filed by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Petition and Citation, # 3 Declaration, # 4 Exhibit A, # 5 Exhibit B, # 6 Exhibit C, # 7 Exhibit D)(Urquhart, Quentin) (Attachment 3 replaced on 10/8/2010) (JDL, ) Modified on 10/8/2010 to replace Declaration. (JDL, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Calix v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Calix
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Douglas J. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?