Via Technologies, Inc. et al v. Vizio, Inc.
Plaintiff: Via Technologies Inc.
Defendant: Vizio, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2011cv00077
Filed: January 7, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1121
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 THIRD STIPULATION AND ORDER FURTHER EXTENDING DATE FOR COMPLETION OF MEDIATION re 31 Stipulation filed by Vizio, Inc., Via Technologies Inc., Via Technologies, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/17/12. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2012)
December 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 SECOND JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER FURTHER EXTENDING DATE FOR COMPLETION OF MEDIATION re 29 Stipulation filed by Vizio, Inc., Via Technologies Inc., Via Technologies, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 12/16/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2011)
November 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION AND ORDER FURTHER EXTENDING DATE FOR COMPLETION OF MEDIATION re 27 Stipulation filed by Vizio, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 11/16/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2011)
October 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING DATE FOR COMPLETION OF MEDIATION re 25 Stipulation filed by Vizio, Inc., Via Technologies Inc., Via Technologies, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/25/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2011)
July 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER re 19 Case Management Conference - Initial. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 7/6/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
May 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 12 Stipulation, filed by Vizio, Inc. Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/23/2011. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/30/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 5/2/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Via Technologies, Inc. et al v. Vizio, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Via Technologies Inc.
Represented By: Sebastian Elan Kaplan
Represented By: J. David Hadden
Represented By: Tyler Griffin Newby
Represented By: Jedediah Wakefield
Represented By: J. David Hadden
Represented By: Sebastian Elan Kaplan
Represented By: Tyler Griffin Newby
Represented By: Jedediah Wakefield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vizio, Inc.
Represented By: David N. Makous
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?