Carducci v. Wachovia Bank et al

Plaintiff: Celeste Carducci
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wachovia Bank and Wells Fargo & Company
Case Number: 4:2011cv00181
Filed: January 12, 2011
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 29, 2012 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND CERTIFYING CLASS FOR SETTLEMENT PURPOSES re 42 MOTION for Settlement filed by Wachovia Bank, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo & Company. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 2/29/12. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2012)
December 2, 2011 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING DECEMBER 8, 2011 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTING HEARING ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL re 42 MOTION for Settlement filed by Wachovia Bank, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo & Company. Motion Hearing set for 1/18/2012 09:00 AM before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 12/2/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2011)
August 1, 2011 40 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING THE HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 39 Stipulation filed by Wachovia Bank, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Celeste Carducci, Wells Fargo & Company. Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/29/2011. Case Management Conference set for 10/6/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 8/1/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2011)
July 15, 2011 38 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER MOVING SEPTEMBER 1, 2011 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO AUGUST 25, 2011 re 37 Stipulation filed by Wachovia Bank, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Celeste Carducci, Wells Fargo & Company. Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/18/2011. Case Management Conference set for 8/25/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 7/15/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2011)
June 24, 2011 31 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS re 29 Stipulation filed by Wachovia Bank, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo & Company. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 6/24/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2011)
June 20, 2011 28 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING JUNE 23, 2011 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO JUNE 30, 2011 re 27 Stipulation filed by Wachovia Bank, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Celeste Carducci, Wells Fargo & Company. Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/23/2011. Case Management Conference set for 6/30/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 6/20/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
April 18, 2011 26 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE APRIL 27, 2011 HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS re 25 Stipulation filed by Wachovia Bank, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo & Company. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 4/18/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2011)
March 11, 2011 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING HEARING DATE. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 3/11/2011. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2011)
January 26, 2011 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/14/2011. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/21/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/26/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2011)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carducci v. Wachovia Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Alicia Anne Adornato
Represented By: Karen A. Braje
Represented By: Jack R. Nelson
Represented By: David J. de Jesus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wachovia Bank
Represented By: Alicia Anne Adornato
Represented By: Karen A. Braje
Represented By: Jack R. Nelson
Represented By: David J. de Jesus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo & Company
Represented By: Alicia Anne Adornato
Represented By: Karen A. Braje
Represented By: Jack R. Nelson
Represented By: David J. de Jesus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Celeste Carducci
Represented By: Steven Richard Weinmann
Represented By: Jonathan Ellsworth Davis
Represented By: Robert Stephen Arns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?