Provo Craft and Novelty Inc v. Craft Edge, Inc et al

Plaintiff: Provo Craft and Novelty Inc
Defendant: Craft Edge, Inc and Brandon Kuroda
Case Number: 4:2011cv00297
Filed: January 20, 2011
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2011 Opinion or Order 35 ORDER Granting 34 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/7/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2011)
May 19, 2011 Opinion or Order 33 ORDER Granting 32 Stipulation re Request for Order Changing Time Pending Settlement. Case Management Statement due by 6/14/2011. Case Management Conference set for 6/21/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/19/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2011)
May 11, 2011 Opinion or Order 31 ORDER Granting 29 Stipulation Selecting Mediation.ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/11/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2011)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Provo Craft and Novelty Inc v. Craft Edge, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Provo Craft and Novelty Inc
Represented By: Emily Justine Zelenock
Represented By: Andrew M Grove
Represented By: Nathaniel Bruno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craft Edge, Inc
Represented By: Justin Grant Hulse
Represented By: Patrick Eugene Premo
Represented By: Mitchell Harris Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Kuroda
Represented By: Justin Grant Hulse
Represented By: Patrick Eugene Premo
Represented By: Mitchell Harris Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?