Meras Engineering Inc. et al v. CH2O, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jay Sughroue, Meras Engineering Inc. and Rich Bernier
Defendant: CH2O, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2011cv00389
Filed: January 26, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 54 Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; and Denying as Moot 58 Defendant's Motion to Stay. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2013)
September 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 80 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE TRIAL OF BOTH CASES ON SAME TRIAL DATE filed by Chad Walrod, Meras Engineering Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/27/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2012)
September 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 73 STIPULATION AND ORDER re (72 in 3:11-cv-00389-EMC) re (54) MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Rich Bernier, Jay Sughroue, Meras Engineering Inc. Responses due by 9/21/2012. Replies due by 10/5/2012. Hearing: 10/26/12. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/6/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2012) Modified on 9/6/2012 (bpf, COURT STAFF).
August 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 67 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/23/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2012)
August 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER relating cases re 59 and describing procedural background. The court relates the cases, which means both cases are transferred to Judge Chen. This disposes of ECF No. 59. The court also vacates the September 6, 2012 hearing on the motion t o stay. The parties should re-notice the motion to stay and the pending summary judgment motion before Judge Chen. The parties should meet and confer about scheduling and consult Judge Chen's online line calendar and scheduling notes before setting any dates. They also should raise scheduling issues at the case management conference in the high-numbered case now set for September 14, 2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 8/21/2012. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2012)
July 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER RE ATTENDANCE granting Tony McNamara and Peter Petrich request from appearing in person at 7/19/2011 mediation; Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 7/15/2011. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2011)
April 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER CONTINUING MAY 5, 2011 ORAL ARGUMENT TO MAY 26, 2011; DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Beeler on 4/28/11. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2011)
April 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING 23 Stipulation and Proposed Order selecting Mediation filed by Rich Bernier, CH2O, Inc., Jay Sughroue, Meras Engineering Inc.. Signed by Judge Beeler on 4/21/11. (lblc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2011)
March 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING 13 Stipulation filed by Rich Bernier, CH2O, Inc., Jay Sughroue, Meras Engineering Inc.; DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS CONTINUED TO MAY 5, 2011 AT 11:00 A.M. IN COURTROOM 4. Signed by Judge Beeler on 3/31/11. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meras Engineering Inc. et al v. CH2O, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay Sughroue
Represented By: Kimberly Corcoran
Represented By: Dawn M. Ross
Represented By: Philip J. Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meras Engineering Inc.
Represented By: Philip J. Terry
Represented By: Dawn M. Ross
Represented By: Kimberly Corcoran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rich Bernier
Represented By: Kimberly Corcoran
Represented By: Dawn M. Ross
Represented By: Philip J. Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CH2O, Inc.
Represented By: Peter Thomas Petrich
Represented By: James Alan Neal Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?