Melanson v. Johnson
Plaintiff: Roy A. Melanson
Defendant: Mary Johnson
Case Number: 4:2011cv00446
Filed: January 31, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Napa
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 JUDGMENT, ***Civil Case Terminated.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 3/25/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2013)
February 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER re 31 Letter filed by Roy A. Melanson. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 2/15/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2013)
February 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denying 21 Motion to Appoint Counsel (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2012)
October 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF SERVICE re 1 Complaint filed by Roy A. Melanson. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 10/225/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Melanson v. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy A. Melanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?