Hemenway v. Shinseki
Plaintiff: Brian Hemenway
Defendant: Eric K. Shinseki
Case Number: 4:2011cv00505
Filed: February 2, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 43 Motion to Dismiss. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2012)
June 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER re 43 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Eric K. Shinseki. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 6/21/2012. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2012)
May 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 5/29/2012. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2012)
May 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER discharging Order to Show Cause. Replies due by 5/29/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 5/18/2012. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2012)
May 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 5/10/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 5/3/2012. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2012)
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Expunging 9 Order to Show Cause and scheduling Initial Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 6/9/2011. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2011)
May 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 6/15/2011 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Donna M. Ryu on 5/18/11. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hemenway v. Shinseki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Hemenway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric K. Shinseki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?