DFSB Kollective Co., Ltd. et al v. John Does 1 through 10
Plaintiff: Roxta Music, Spot/Monky Global, DFSB Kollective Co., Ltd., Nega Network, Jungle Entertainment, Foundation Records, Woolim Entertainment, Aftermoon Music Entertainment, Inc. and Paragon Music Corp.
Defendant: John Does 1 through 10
Case Number: 4:2011cv01051
Filed: March 7, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Aftermoon Music Entertainment, Inc., DFSB Kollective Co., Ltd., Foundation Records, Jungle Entertainment, Nega Network, Paragon Music Corp., Roxta Music, Spot/Monky Global, Woolim Entertainment against Bing Yang, Indrawati Yang. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2013)
May 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: 28 . Response due by 6/4/2012. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 5/21/12. (nclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2012)
February 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER RE 26 DEFAULT. Case Management Statement due by 5/16/2012. Case Management Conference set for 5/23/2012 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/24/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2012)
January 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Granting 20 MOTION to Continue CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 3/28/2012. Case Management Conference set for 4/4/2012 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/3/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2012)
August 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting 14 MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 12/27/2011. Case Management Conference set for 1/3/2012 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/31/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DFSB Kollective Co., Ltd. et al v. John Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roxta Music
Represented By: J. Andrew Coombs
Represented By: Nicole Lynn Drey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spot/Monky Global
Represented By: J. Andrew Coombs
Represented By: Nicole Lynn Drey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DFSB Kollective Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Nicole Lynn Drey
Represented By: J. Andrew Coombs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nega Network
Represented By: Nicole Lynn Drey
Represented By: J. Andrew Coombs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jungle Entertainment
Represented By: Nicole Lynn Drey
Represented By: J. Andrew Coombs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Foundation Records
Represented By: Nicole Lynn Drey
Represented By: J. Andrew Coombs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Woolim Entertainment
Represented By: J. Andrew Coombs
Represented By: Nicole Lynn Drey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aftermoon Music Entertainment, Inc.
Represented By: J. Andrew Coombs
Represented By: Nicole Lynn Drey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paragon Music Corp.
Represented By: J. Andrew Coombs
Represented By: Nicole Lynn Drey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?