EVANS et al v. LINDEN RESEARCH, INC. et al
Plaintiff: CARL EVANS, Donald Spencer, VALERIE SPENCER and Cindy Carter
Defendant: Linden Research, Inc. and PHILIP ROSEDALE
Case Number: 4:2011cv01078
Filed: March 8, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 139 JUDGMENT, ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 05/07/2014. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2014)
April 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER to Submit Proposed Final Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 04/30/2014. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2014)
April 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER by Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 129 Motion for Settlement; granting in part 130 Motion for Attorney Fees. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2014)
October 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER by Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 113 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2013)
October 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER to Submit Executed Revised Settlement Agreement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 10/23/2013. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2013)
October 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER to Submit Additional Information in Support of Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 10/01/13. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2013)
May 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER: Updated Case Management Statement due by 6/20/2013. Further Case Management Conference previously set on 6/12/2013 01:30 PM has been continued to 6/27/2013 11:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 5/31/13. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2013)
November 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER Setting Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 12/12/2012. Case Management Conference set for 12/19/2012 01:30 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 11/21/2012. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2012)
November 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 107 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu re 96 Motion to Certify Class.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2012)
April 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER on 87 Joint Discovery Letter re: Plaintiffs' motion to compel discovery responses. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 4/25/2012. (hlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2012)
February 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting in part and denying in part 74 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and granting 75 Motion for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2012)
February 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER RE BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON PLAINTIFFS CLASS CERTIFICATION MOTION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 02/09/2012. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2012)
January 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER re 72 Joint Discovery Letter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 01/12/2012. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2012)
November 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER re 70 Stipulation to Extend Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 11/16/2011. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2011)
November 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 69 STIPULATION AND ORDER granting motion for leave to withdraw attorneys Laurence Z. Shiekman and Matthew D. Janssen as attorneys of record for Defendants re 68 Stipulation filed by PHILIP ROSEDALE, Linden Research, Inc., Attorney Matthew D. Janssen and LAURENCE Z. SHIEKMAN terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 11/4/11. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2011)
October 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 67 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 66 Stipulation filed by PHILIP ROSEDALE, Linden Research, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 10/25/11. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2011)
October 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 65 STIPULATION AND ORDER to extend the 10/20/11 fact discovery cutoff for the purpose of scheduling and taking the depositions of Carl Evans, Donald Spencer, Valerie Spencer, and possibly a witness for Defendants at times that work for the witnesses. T his extension will not alter the date of any event or any deadline already fixed by Court Order re 64 Stipulation filed by PHILIP ROSEDALE, Linden Research, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 10/20/11. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2011).
August 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE RYU FOR ALL PURPOSES. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/1/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EVANS et al v. LINDEN RESEARCH, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARL EVANS
Represented By: ROBERT A. BRACKEN
Represented By: Paul William Chandler
Represented By: JASON A. ARCHINACO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Spencer
Represented By: Paul William Chandler
Represented By: ROBERT A. BRACKEN
Represented By: JASON A. ARCHINACO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VALERIE SPENCER
Represented By: JASON A. ARCHINACO
Represented By: ROBERT A. BRACKEN
Represented By: Paul William Chandler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindy Carter
Represented By: JASON A. ARCHINACO
Represented By: ROBERT A. BRACKEN
Represented By: Paul William Chandler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linden Research, Inc.
Represented By: Johanna Calabria
Represented By: Matthew D. Janssen
Represented By: MICHAEL H. PAGE
Represented By: Michael Henry Page
Represented By: LAURENCE Z. SHIEKMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILIP ROSEDALE
Represented By: Johanna Calabria
Represented By: Matthew D. Janssen
Represented By: MICHAEL H. PAGE
Represented By: Michael Henry Page
Represented By: LAURENCE Z. SHIEKMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?