Young v. Chapman, et al.
Plaintiff: Eddie L. Young
Defendant: C. J. Chapman, A. D. Risenhoover, D. A. Stiles and D. E. Mount
Case Number: 4:2011cv01083
Filed: March 8, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Del Norte
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 239 Report of Pro Se Prisoner Early Settlement Proceeding. Matter not settled and returned to presiding judge. Signed by Judge Robert M. Illman on 5/17/2019. (glmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2019)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 202 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting 200 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. (lblc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2018)
May 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER OS SERVICE OF AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 5/29/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2013)
March 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denying 19 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying 31 Motion TO APPOINT COUNSEL; denying 31 Motion to Appoint Counsel (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2012)
January 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER re 20 Letter. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 1/27/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2012)
November 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF SERVICE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 11/7/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. Chapman, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie L. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. J. Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. D. Risenhoover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. A. Stiles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. E. Mount
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?