Dean v. Contra Costa County Superior Court, Martinez
Plaintiff: Richard Oneal Dean
Defendant: Contra Costa County Superior Court, Martinez
Case Number: 4:2011cv01098
Filed: March 8, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 2/21/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2013)
September 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER re 29 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Tim Allen, David Hall. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 9/21/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2012)
February 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER re 1 Complaint, filed by Richard Oneal Dean. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 2/28/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2012)
October 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re 1 Complaint, filed by Richard Oneal Dean. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 10/28/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dean v. Contra Costa County Superior Court, Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Oneal Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Contra Costa County Superior Court, Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?