Hughes v. Marshall
Petitioner: Nick R. Hughes
Respondent: John Marshall
Case Number: 4:2011cv01185
Filed: March 10, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Luis Obispo
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 AMENDED ORDER re 28 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 7/31/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2013)
May 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Habeas Answer due by 7/22/2013.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 5/21/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2013)
May 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denying 24 Motion to Appoint Counsel (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2013)
December 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 16 Motion to Set Aside Judgment (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2012)
January 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 1/27/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2012)
December 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denying 9 Motion to Dismiss (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2011)
April 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Nick R. Hughes, ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 4/20/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hughes v. Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Nick R. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?