Gallagher et al v. Sherman & Feller et al
Plaintiff: Rosemex Lab-Vent, Inc., Autoenergie, Inc., Michael Gallagher, Michel Pitre, Mecar Metal, Inc. and Rosemex, Inc.
Defendant: Sherman & Feller and Ray Sherman
Case Number: 4:2011cv01293
Filed: March 17, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 12/23/2011. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2011)
December 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 20 Motion for Settlement.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2011)
December 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting Request For Order Shortening Time to Notice and Hear Joint Motion for Good Faith Settlement Determination by Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 12/05/2011. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2011) Modified on 12/5/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gallagher et al v. Sherman & Feller et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosemex Lab-Vent, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory Jay Brod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Autoenergie, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory Jay Brod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Gallagher
Represented By: Gregory Jay Brod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michel Pitre
Represented By: Gregory Jay Brod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mecar Metal, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory Jay Brod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosemex, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory Jay Brod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherman & Feller
Represented By: Stephen John Squillario
Represented By: David W. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Sherman
Represented By: David W. Evans
Represented By: Stephen John Squillario
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?