Yates v. Bacco et al
Plaintiff: Craig Yates
Defendant: Bacco, Vi Pa, Inc., Antone Metaxas and Illdeko Metaxas
Case Number: 4:2011cv01573
Filed: March 31, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER RE: ATTENDANCE AT MEDIATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/27/2014. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2014)
April 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 98 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 97 Stipulation.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2014)
March 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 95 JUDGMENT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 03/31/14. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2014)
March 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 94 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 03/17/14. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2014)
August 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 81 PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 08/12/13. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2013)
May 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 76 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 74 Motion to Continue. The pretrial conference is hereby continued to July 17, 2013 at 3:00 p.m. and the one-day bench trial is continued to August 15, 2013 at 11:00 a.m. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2013)
April 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 73 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 71 Motion to Continue Trial Date . The pretrial conference will be June 12, 2013 at 3 p.m. Trial will be held on July 2, 2013 at 8:30 a.m.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2013)
April 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER Pretrial Conference previously scheduled for April 24, 2013 has been reset to May 1, 2013 at 3:00 p.m. The bench trial previously scheduled for May 6, 2013 has been reset to May 14, 2013 at 9:00 a.m. This order does not affect the ot her deadlines set forth in the Case Management and Pretrial Order [Docket No. 22]. In other words, the deadline for filing objections to exhibits, deposition excerpts or other discovery, and oppositions to motions in limine is April 15, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 04/10/13. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2013)
April 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER REGARDING SETTLEMENT UPDATE. Plaintiff shall submit update by 4/5/2013. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 4/2/13. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2013)
January 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION 51 . Further Settlement Conference continued to 2/26/2013 09:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 1/17/13. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2013)
August 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Case Management Statement due by 10/24/2012. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/31/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland.Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 8/28/2012. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2012)
June 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 6/15/2012. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2012)
June 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 6/11/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 6/8/2012. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2012)
May 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 5/2/12. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yates v. Bacco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Yates
Represented By: Thomas E. Frankovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bacco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vi Pa, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antone Metaxas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illdeko Metaxas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?