Lucas et al v. Hertz Corporation
Plaintiff: Kathleen M. Lucas and Dan Martin
Defendant: Hertz Corporation
Case Number: 4:2011cv01581
Filed: March 31, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER (1) TO SHOW CAUSE AND (2) SETTING A FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Show Cause Response due by 6/7/2013. Case Management Statement due by 7/25/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/1/2013 11:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 5/31/2013. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2013)
February 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER STAYING CASE and VACATING February 28, 2013 case management conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 2/25/2013. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2013)
January 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER regarding Defendant's motion for summary judgment. In light of the apparent settlement between Ms. Lucas and Hertz, the court DIRECTS Hertz, by 3:00 p.m. on January 30, 2013, to either withdraw its motion for summary judgment or file a letter stating why it believes its motion is not moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 1/29/2013. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2013)
January 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 88 Motion Excusing Personal Attendance at Settlement Conference (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2013)
December 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER SETTING Further Case Management Conference and CONTINUING Last Day for Hearing Dispositive Motions. The court SETS a Further Case Management Conference for Thursday, December 13, 2012 at 10:30 a.m., during which time the court will disc uss this matter with the parties. Lead counsel for Plaintiff (Cynthia McGuinn) and Defendant Hertz (John Ranucci) are ORDERED to appear in person. Also, the court once again CONTINUES the last day for hearing dispositive motions, this time f rom January 17, 2013 to February 21, 2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/13/2012 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 12/7/2012. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2012)
October 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER DENYING 59 Plaintiff's Motion for Certification of Order for Interlocutory Appeal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 10/21/2012. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2012)
September 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER REGARDING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on September 25, 2012. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2012)
August 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER DENYING 60 Plaintiff's Administrative Motion to Shorten Time, DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration, and SETTING HEARING DATE AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE for Plaintiff's Motion for Certification of Order for Interlocutory Ap peal. The court will hear Plaintiff's motion on October 4, 2012, not on September 20, 2012. Hertz shall have until August 31, 2012 (a one-week extension of time) to file an opposition, and Mr. Martin shall have until September 7, 2012 to file a reply. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 8/22/2012. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2012)
June 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER GRANTING 37 Defendant's Second Motion to Compel Arbitration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 6/21/2012.(lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2012)
April 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 21 DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 4/27/2012.(lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2012)
December 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 18 modifying case management deadlines. ADR completion date is now 4/2/2012. Non expert discovery completion date is now 10/15/2012. Expert discovery completion date is now 10/31/2012. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 12/2/2011. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2011)
August 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING 10 Stipulation and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR filed by Hertz Corporation. Signed by Judge Beeler on 8/3/11. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lucas et al v. Hertz Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen M. Lucas
Represented By: Cynthia Bernet McGuinn
Represented By: Miles Baker Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Martin
Represented By: Miles Baker Cooper
Represented By: Cynthia Bernet McGuinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hertz Corporation
Represented By: John W. Ranucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?