Silverman v. The City and County of San Francisco et al
Plaintiff: Jacob Silverman
Defendant: The City and County of San Francisco, Police Supervisory Defendant, Seth Riskin, Vien Lam, Oliver Lim, Yuen, M. Marquez, Sheriff Supervisory Does, Michael Hennesey, Jonah Pecot, John Garcia, Ian Ysip, Kenneth Chin, Julio Gotchez, Juan P. Muniz, David Basconcillo, Bernardo Bienvenidos, Christopher Krol, Paul Timpano, Kenya Crawford, Roy Tamamkuk, Edward Gutierrez, Larry Dorsey, Graciani Valderrama, Matthew Wong, Sheriff Medical Does and Sheriff Supervisory Medical Does
Case Number: 4:2011cv01615
Filed: April 1, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong re: ( 134 , 135 , 136 , 137 ). (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2013)
July 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 7/25/2013.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 7/11/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2013)
June 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denying 122 Motion to Appoint Counsel (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2013)
June 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER, Motions terminated: 120 MOTION to Continue Dispositive Motion Hearing Date; Require Service of Plaintiff's Motions, and Set A Case Management Conference filed by Juan P. Muniz, M. Marquez, Kenya Crawford, Kenneth Chin, Julio Gotchez, The City and County of San Francisco, David Basconcillo, Bernardo Bienvenidos, Vien Lam, Ian Ysip, Matthew Wong, Christopher Krol, Yuen, Paul Timpano, Seth Riskin, John Garcia, 123 MOTION to Continue filed by Jacob Silverman. Motions due by 8/20/2013. Case Management Conference set for 7/10/2013 03:15 PM.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 6/10/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2013)
April 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 106 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Geri Lynn Green terminated (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2013)
April 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 118 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING MOTION CUTOFF DEADLINE, Set/Reset Deadlines as to Motion Hearing set for 7/9/2013 01:00 PM before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 4/3/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2013)
March 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG terminating 110 Stipulation; granting 115 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2013)
March 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER re 106 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Jacob Silverman. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 3/12/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2013)
December 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denying 81 Motion to Continue; denying 90 Motion to Stay; denying 91 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2012)
August 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting 74 Stipulation to Continue Settlement Conference filed by Jacob Silverman. Settlement Conference reset for 9/11/2012 01:30 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 8/20/2012. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2012)
June 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER RE: DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 6/5/2012. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Silverman v. The City and County of San Francisco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Silverman
Represented By: Julien Thomas Swanson
Represented By: Geri Lynn Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City and County of San Francisco
Represented By: Margaret W. Baumgartner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Supervisory Defendant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seth Riskin
Represented By: Margaret W. Baumgartner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vien Lam
Represented By: Margaret W. Baumgartner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oliver Lim
Represented By: Margaret W. Baumgartner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yuen
Represented By: Margaret W. Baumgartner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Marquez
Represented By: Margaret W. Baumgartner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Supervisory Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Hennesey
Represented By: Margaret W. Baumgartner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonah Pecot
Represented By: Margaret W. Baumgartner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Garcia
Represented By: Margaret W. Baumgartner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ian Ysip
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Chin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julio Gotchez
Represented By: Margaret W. Baumgartner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan P. Muniz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Basconcillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernardo Bienvenidos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Krol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Timpano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenya Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy Tamamkuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Gutierrez
Represented By: Margaret W. Baumgartner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Dorsey
Represented By: Margaret W. Baumgartner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Graciani Valderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Wong
Represented By: Margaret W. Baumgartner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Medical Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Supervisory Medical Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?