Fireman's Fund Insurance Company v. Hartford Fire Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Fireman's Fund Insurance Company
Defendant: Hartford Fire Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2011cv01789
Filed: April 12, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER. ***Civil Case Terminated***. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 9/29/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2014)
December 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 88 SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY AND ORDER: That Jeffrey A. Charlston Substitutes as Counsel for Fireman's Fund Ins., Co., in place of Keith A. Turner. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 12/20/12. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2012)
December 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER re 43 Stipulation, filed by Simpson Strong-Tie Company, Inc., Honolulu Wood Treating LLC, Simpson Manufacturing Company, Inc.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 12/2/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2011)
October 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER re 32 Stipulation, filed by Simpson Strong-Tie Company, Inc., Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Honolulu Wood Treating LLC, Simpson Manufacturing Company, Inc.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 10/7/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2011)
September 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 19 Motion for Leave to File (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fireman's Fund Insurance Company v. Hartford Fire Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Ramiro Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fireman's Fund Insurance Company
Represented By: Keith Allan Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?