Gary Siebert v. Gene Security Network, Inc
Plaintiff: Gary Siebert
Defendant: Gene Security Network, Inc
Miscellaneous: United States of America ex rel.
Case Number: 4:2011cv01987
Filed: April 22, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying 244 Motion for New Trial. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2015)
February 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER re 235 Notice filed by Gary Siebert. Motion Hearing set for 4/16/2015 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 11, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2015)
January 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER DIRECTING JURY COMMISSIONER TO FURNISH LUNCH DURING DELIBERATION. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 29, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2015)
January 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 208 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 201 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Electronic Equipment in the Jury Room filed by Gene Security Network, Inc.. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 27, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2015)
January 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER RE DEPOSITION TESTIMONY OF MICHELLE BULLS AND MICHELLE BULLS' DECLARATION re 147 Exhibit List filed by Gary Siebert, 181 Objection filed by Gene Security Network, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 24, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2015)
January 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER RE PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS IN LIMINE by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting in part and denying in part 136 Motion in Limine. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2015)
January 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING AND DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4 by Judge Jon S. Tigar; denying 164 Motion in Limine; 136 MOTION in Limine. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2015)
January 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 169 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 158 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Delivery of Exhibit Binders filed by Gene Security Network, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 12, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2015)
January 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO BIFURCATE AND PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NUMBER ONE by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying 135 Motion to Bifurcate; denying 136 Motion in Limine. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2015)
December 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER re 132 Granting MOTION for Extension of Time to File (Administrative Motion) filed by Gary Siebert, Motion terminated. Signed by Judge William H. Alsup on 12/23/14. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2014)
December 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DENYING MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting in part and denying in part 109 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 110 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2014)
November 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR SANCTIONS by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying 96 Motion for Sanctions. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2014)
October 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER STRIKING EMAILS TO COURT. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on October 6, 2014. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2014)
September 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER VACATING MOTION HEARING re 96 MOTION for Sanctions FOR BAD FAITH CONDUCT filed by Gary Siebert. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 15, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2014)
July 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 95 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 94 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 83 MOTION for Summary Judgment to Reset Deadlines for Summary Judgment Briefing filed by Gene Security Network, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 24, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2014)
July 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 91 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 90 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 83 MOTION for Summary Judgment TO EXTEND TIME FOR BRIEFING filed by Gene Security Network, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 10, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2014)
October 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER GRANTING IN PART, DENYING IN PART MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTERCLAIMS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION by Judge Jon S. Tigar, granting in part and denying in part 54 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 55 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2013)
June 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying 28 Motion to Dismiss. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2013)
February 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/14/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/21/2013 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 2/5/13. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gary Siebert v. Gene Security Network, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: United States of America ex rel.
Represented By: Melanie Lea Proctor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Siebert
Represented By: Stephen R. Jaffe
Represented By: Kathryn Sara Landman
Represented By: Laura M. Mazza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gene Security Network, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?