Boggs et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, NA et al

Plaintiff: Douglas J. Boggs and Michelle A. Moquin
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, NA, Wachovia Mortgage, World Savings, NDEX West LLC and Golden W Sav. Assoc. Services Co.
Case Number: 4:2011cv02346
Filed: May 12, 2011
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 14, 2012 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REMANDING CASE., ***Civil Case Terminated.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 6/13/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2012)
May 25, 2012 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 6/8/2012.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 5/25/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2012)
February 21, 2012 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denying 79 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 81 Motion for Preliminary Injunction (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2012)
December 8, 2011 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 61 Stipulation,, filed by Wells Fargo Bank, NA, Michelle A. Moquin, Wachovia Mortgage, Douglas J. Boggs, World Savings, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 61 Stipulation,, 56 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint, 57 MOTION to Strike 54 Second Amended Complaint (Portions of) MOTION to Strike 54 Second Amended Complaint (Portions of). Responses due by 12/30/2011. Replies due by 1/6/2012.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 12/7/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2011)
October 24, 2011 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denying 44 Motion to Appear by Telephone; denying 45 Motion to Appear by Telephone; granting 7 Motion to Dismiss (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2011)
September 27, 2011 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING HEARING re 7 Motion to Dismiss Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 10/24/2011 01:00 PM before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 9/26/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2011) Modified on 9/28/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boggs et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, NA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas J. Boggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle A. Moquin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, NA
Represented By: Frederick James Hickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wachovia Mortgage
Represented By: Frederick James Hickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: World Savings
Represented By: Frederick James Hickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NDEX West LLC
Represented By: Deepika Singh Saluja
Represented By: Masumi Jagdish Patel
Represented By: Edward A. Treder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden W Sav. Assoc. Services Co.
Represented By: Frederick James Hickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?