Morrow v. City of Oakland et al
Plaintiff: Frank Morrow, Jr.
Defendant: Jo Anne Sommerville, Sean Whent, Chris Shannon, Donna Hoppenhauer, John Russo, Anthony Batts, Howard Jordan, Jeffrey Israel, Wayne Tucker, Donald Jeffries and City of Oakland
Case Number: 4:2011cv02351
Filed: May 12, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER GRANTING 185 DEFENDANTS' AMENDED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 12/19/2013. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2013)
October 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER CONTINUING THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The court finds good cause to continue the case management conference for one week to 11:00 a.m. on October 17, 2013. If he prefers, Mr. Morrow may appear at it by telephone. To do so, he should make arrangements with the courtroom deputy Lashanda Scott (415-522-3140) by October 14, 2013. Defendants also may appear at it by telephone, but if they do, they should appear through CourtCall. The parties are directed to meet and confer regardin g scheduling and submit proposals for it in their case management conference statement, which they shall file by October 11, 2013. Defendants still shall file the joint statement of undisputed facts and motion for summary judgment by October 11, 2013. Case Management Statement due by 10/11/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/17/2013 11:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 10/4/2013. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2013)
April 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER DIRECTING Plaintiff not to file any more proposed joint statements of undisputed facts. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 4/8/2013. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2013)
March 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 134 Defendants' administrative motion re joint statement of undisputed facts. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 3/6/2013.(lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2013)
November 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 113 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER following the November 26, 2012 Further Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 11/28/2012. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2012)
November 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER for supplemental information (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 11/26/2012)
April 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER (1) DIRECTING Defendants to File Reply Brief and (2) CONTINUING Hearings on 39 Defendants' motion to dismiss and 46 Plaintiff's motion to stay. The court ORDERS as follows: 1. Defendants shall file a reply to Mr. Morrows oppositi on by May 14, 2012. 2. The hearings on Defendants' motion to dismiss Mr. Morrow's Second Amended Complaint and Mr. Morrow's motion to stay are continued to June 7, 2012 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, United States Di strict Court, 450 Golden Gate Avenue, San Francisco, California, 94102. Motion Hearing set for 6/7/2012 11:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 4/27/2012. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2012)
December 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER (1) GRANTING 20 Defendants' Motion to Adjust Briefing Schedule and (2) CONTINUING Hearing on 12 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. See order for details. Plaintiff's opposition is now due by 1/3/2012. Defendants' reply is now due by 1/10/2012. Motion hearing now set for 2/2/2012. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 12/23/2011. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morrow v. City of Oakland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jo Anne Sommerville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Whent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Shannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Hoppenhauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Russo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Batts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Israel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Jeffries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Oakland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Morrow, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?