Estate of Jimmy Ray Hatfield et al v. County of Lake et al
Plaintiff: Estate of Jimmy Ray Hatfield, R. H., K. H., Judy Hatfield and William Hatfield
Defendant: William T. Durkin, Jr., William T. Durkin, Jr., M.D., Inc., County of Lake, Lake County Sheriff's Department, Rodney Mitchell, Jason Findley, Jeremy Wichlaz, Ryan West, Michael Hartman, Mari Gallardo, Roberta Bruck, Janice Mills, Yvette Padilla, Lake County Department of Mental Health, Kristy Kelly, Patricia Trujillo, City of Clearlake, Clearlake Police Department, Allan McClain, Timothy Hobbs, Rodd Joseph, Lauren Vance, Travis Lenz, Tyler Paulsen, California Forensic Medical Group, Inc., Robin Briggs, KC Grigsby, F. Antonio, Adventist Health Clearlake Hospital, Inc. and Lisa Denny
Case Number: 4:2011cv02396
Filed: May 16, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Lake
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Presiding Judge: Nandor J. Vadas
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 252 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING ENTIRE CASE, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 9/24/14. (nahS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2014)
June 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER scheduling a case management conference. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 6/27/2014. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2014)
June 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER re status of claims against Dr. Durkin. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 6/17/2014. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2014)
April 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER re 227 Letter filed by William T. Durkin, Jr.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/28/2014. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2014)
January 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re 221 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Tyler Paulsen, Rodd Joseph, Timothy Hobbs, Travis Lenz, Allan McClain, City of Clearlake, Lauren Vance. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/17/14. (nahS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2014)
October 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 219 2nd REVISED CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER re 218 Case Management Conference - Further. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/21/13. (nahS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2013)
September 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting in part and denying in part 205 Motion for Summary Judgment and setting case management conference. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2013)
March 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER EXCUSING CITY OF CLEARLAKE POLICE DEPARTMENT AND ALLOWING TELEPHONE APPEARANCE AT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/18/2013. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2013)
January 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 194 Amendment to request to appear by telephone at settlement conference. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2013)
January 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEYS re 189 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Jeremy Wichlaz, County of Lake, Janice Mills, Yvette Padilla, Rodney Mitchell, Mari Gallardo, Jason Findley, Lake County Sheriff's Department, Michael Hartman, Ryan West, Roberta Bruck. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/3/13. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2013)
November 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER by Judge Hamilton denying 168 Motion to Dismiss (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2012)
August 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting 123 Motion for Leave to File; denying 126 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 128 Motion to Dismiss (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2012)
June 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 111 Motion to Appear by Telephone (rmm2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2012)
June 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO APPEAR BY PHONE AT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE re 97 Proposed Order filed by William T. Durkin, Jr.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/7/2012. (rmm2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2012)
June 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 104 Motion to Appear by Telephone (rmm2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2012)
May 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting in part and denying in part 72 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 76 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 85 Motion to Dismiss (pjhlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2012)
May 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER by Magistrate Maria-Elena James granting 101 Motion to appear by phone at settlement conference. (rmm2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2012)
April 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 90 NOTICE and ORDER Continuing Hearing Date. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 4/24/2012. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2012)
April 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re 80 Notice of Substitution of Counsel, filed by Kristy Kelly, Patricia Trujillo, Lake County Department of Mental Health. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 4/17/12. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2012)
March 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER Granting 58 Proposed Order filed by KC Grigsby, Robin Briggs, California Forensic Medical Group, Inc., F. Antonio. Parties appearing by phone must contact Brenda Tolbert, at 415-522-4708, 48 hours prior to hearing with a local/toll-free number. Signed by Judge Chief Magistrate Judge MARIA-ELENA JAMES on 3/6/12. (bjtS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2012)
March 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER Granting re 59 Letter filed by Tyler Paulsen, Rodd Joseph, Timothy Hobbs, Travis Lenz, Allan McClain, City of Clearlake, Lauren Vance. Parties appearing by phone shall contact Courtroom Deputy, Brenda Tolbert at 415-522-4708 and provide a local or toll-free number at at least 48 hours prior to the hearing. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge MARIA-ELENA JAMES on 3/5/12. (bjtS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2012) Modified on 3/5/2012 (bjtS, COURT STAFF).
March 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER Granting 60 Letter filed by Kristy Kelly, Jeremy Wichlaz, County of Lake, Patricia Trujillo, Janice Mills, Yvette Padilla, Rodney Mitchell, Mari Gallardo, Jason Findley, Lake County Sheriff's Department, Michael Hartman, Ryan West, Lake County Department of Mental Health, Roberta Bruck. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge MARIA-ELENA JAMES on 3/2/12. (bjtS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2012)
February 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER Granting Telephonic Request. re 59 Letter filed by Tyler Paulsen, Rodd Joseph, Timothy Hobbs, Travis Lenz, Allan McClain, City of Clearlake, Lauren Vance. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/29/12. (bjtS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2012)
January 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER by Judge Hamilton Granting 29 Motion to Dismiss (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2012)
January 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 48 Stipulation,, filed by Lisa Denny, Kristy Kelly, County of Lake, Estate of Jimmy Ray Hatfield, Yvette Padilla, Adventist Health Clearlake Hospital, Inc., Mari Gallardo, William T. Durkin, Jr., Robin Briggs, Judy Hatfield, Ryan West, Michael Hartman, R. H., F. Antonio, Jeremy Wichlaz, Patricia Trujillo, California Forensic Medical Group, Inc., K. H., Janice Mills, Rodney Mitchell, Jason Findley, Lake County Sheriff's Department, Roberta Bruck, Lake County Department of Mental Health Settlement Conference Continued to 3/9/2012 10:00 AM. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge MARIA-ELENA JAMES on 1/3/12. (bjtS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2012)
October 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER re 37 Case Management Conference - Initial. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/4/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2011)
August 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 20 Stipulation, filed by Kristy Kelly, Jeremy Wichlaz, County of Lake, Patricia Trujillo, Janice Mills, Yvette Padilla, Rodney Mitchell, Mari Gallardo, Jason Findley, Lake Count y Sheriff's Department, Michael Hartman, Ryan West, Lake County Department of Mental Health, Roberta Bruck. Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/22/2011. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/29/2011 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 8/12/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2011)
May 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/18/2011. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/25/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 5/24/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estate of Jimmy Ray Hatfield et al v. County of Lake et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William T. Durkin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William T. Durkin, Jr., M.D., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Lake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lake County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodney Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Findley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Wichlaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Hartman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mari Gallardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roberta Bruck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janice Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yvette Padilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lake County Department of Mental Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristy Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Trujillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Clearlake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clearlake Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allan McClain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodd Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lauren Vance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis Lenz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyler Paulsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Forensic Medical Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin Briggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KC Grigsby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. Antonio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adventist Health Clearlake Hospital, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Denny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Jimmy Ray Hatfield
Represented By: Michael D. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. H.
Represented By: Michael D. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K. H.
Represented By: Michael D. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Hatfield
Represented By: Michael D. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Hatfield
Represented By: Michael D. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?