Marilley v. McCamman et al
Plaintiff: Kevin Marilley
Defendant: Jack Baylis, Richard B. Rogers, Michael Sutton, Daniel W. Richards, Jonh McCamman, Kevin Hunting, Donald Koch and Jim Kellogg
Case Number: 4:2011cv02418
Filed: May 18, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 339 ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' PARTICIPATION IN THE APRIL 9, 2014 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Re 336 Letter, filed by Salvatore Papetti, Kevin Marilley, Savior Papetti. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 4/4/2014. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2014)
February 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 329 ORDER for Plaintiffs to File Response to 328 Letter filed by Charlton H. Bonham. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 02/25/2014. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2014)
November 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 286 FINAL JUDGMENT on Plaintiffs' Count I. Case stayed as to Plaintiffs' Count II. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 11/07/2013. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2013)
October 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 280 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 201 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 205 Motion for Summary Judgment; finding as moot 215 Motion for Sanctions; finding as moot 216 Motion to Exclude; denying 218 Motion to Strike; finding as moot 219 Motion to Strike; denying 227 Motion to Strike. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2013)
March 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER Vacating 4/24/13 Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 03/29/2013. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2013)
March 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 137 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu re 118 Discovery Letter Brief.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2013)
March 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER Resetting Hearing on Motions, re 134 Letter filed by Charlton H. Bonham. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 03/05/2013. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2013)
February 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER Re Briefing on Plaintiffs' Rebuttal Expert Report. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 02/22/2013. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2013)
February 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER re 127 Letter filed by Charlton H. Bonham re Schedule for Summary Judgment and Daubert Motions AS AMENDED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 02/21/2013. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2013)
January 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 4/17/2013. Case Management Conference set for 4/24/2013 01:30 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 01/17/2013. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2013)
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 113 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 112 Stipulation.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2012)
September 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 102 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 94 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2012)
June 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER, as modified by the Court, re 91 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE AMENDED SCHEDULE filed by Salvatore Papetti, Kevin Marilley, Savior Papetti. Discovery due by 9/17/2012. Plaintiffs' Motion for summary judgment due by 11 /29/2012. Defendant's opposition/cross Motion due by 1/7/2013. Reply/opposition to cross-motion due by 2/7/2013. Reply ISO cross-motion due by 3/7/2013. Motion Hearing set for 3/28/2013 11:00 AM. Pretrial Conference set for 6/19/2013 03:00 PM. 4-day Bench Trial set for 7/1/2013 08:30 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 6/15/2012. (hlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2012)
April 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER RE: TELEPHONIC MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 4/30/2012. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2012)
March 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER RE: TELEPHONIC MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 3/29/2012. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2012)
March 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 84 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 66 Motion to Certify Class.(dmrlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2012)
January 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER Continuing Further Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 2/16/2012. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/23/2012 11:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 01/25/2012. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2012)
January 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 73 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 72 Stipulation Regarding Modification of Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date for Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2012)
January 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER re 65 Stipulation GRANTING Plaintiffs Leave to File a Fourth Amended Complaint. The proposed Fourth Amended Complaint attached as Exhibit A to the Stipulation 65 shall be deemed filed as of the date of this Order. As stipulated, Defendants shall have 7 days following entry of this Order to respond to the Fourth Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 01/06/2012. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2012)
January 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER re 63 Stipulation Concerning the Authenticity of Certain Documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 01/03/2012. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2012)
December 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 57 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 12/01/2011. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2011)
November 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Regarding Substitution of Defendant Charlton H. Bonham and Dismissal of Defendant Kevin Hunting. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 11/09/2011. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2011)
November 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting in part and denying in part 16 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2011)
October 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER to File Supplemental Briefing re 16 MOTION to Dismiss. Supplemental briefing due 10/31/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 10/25/2011. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2011)
October 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying 27 Motion for Preliminary Injunction.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2011)
August 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER re 22 granting in part Stipulation filed by Kevin Marilley. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 8/31/2011. (dmrlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marilley v. McCamman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Baylis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard B. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Sutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel W. Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonh McCamman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Hunting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Koch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Kellogg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Marilley
Represented By: Stuart George Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?