Cobb v. Consunji et al
Plaintiff: Jason E. Cobb
Defendant: Cristina Consunji, Chris Glasser, Terry Johnson, Cass Kalinski, Jeff Monk and Vanita Nemali
Case Number: 4:2011cv02496
Filed: May 23, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 59 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu DENYING 53 Plaintiff's Request for Reconsideration. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2012)
December 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu GRANTING 41 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and DISMISSING Plaintiff's Amended Complaint With Prejudice.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2011)
December 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Taking 41 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Under Submission Without Oral Argument. Motion Hearing and Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/8/2011 VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 12/5/2011. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2011)
November 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Continuing Initial Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 12/1/2011. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/8/2011 11:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 11/18/2011. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2011)
October 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER re 35 Stipulation. Case Management Statement due by 11/23/2011. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/30/2011 01:30 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 10/04/2011. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2011)
September 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Setting Initial Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 11/16/2011. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/23/2011 01:30 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 09/27/2011. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2011)
September 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Taking 5 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Under Submission Without Oral Argument. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 09/13/2011. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2011)
August 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 8/19/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 08/04/2011. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cobb v. Consunji et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cristina Consunji
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Glasser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cass Kalinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Monk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanita Nemali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason E. Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?