Pimental v. Google, Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff alleged that Defendants Google, Inc. and Slide, Inc. released a group texting service called Disco, which made unsolicited text calls to the wireless telephone numbers of the class in violation of 47 U.S.C. § 227.

Plaintiff: Nicole Pimental
Defendant: Google, Inc. and Slide, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2011cv02585
Filed: May 27, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines as to Deadline to File Motion for Class Certification is 8/14/2012. Responses due by 9/14/2012. Replies due by 9/28/2012. Motion Hearing set for 10/16/2012 02:00 PM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2012)
May 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER MODIFYING PRETRIAL SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/10/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2012)
May 10, 2012 Filing 71 Minute Entry: Telephone Conference HELD (Date Filed: 5/10/2012). (Court Reporter NOT REPORTED.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/10/2012)
April 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 64 Motion to Stay. The 5/1/12 hearing date is VACATED. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2012)
April 16, 2012 Filing 69 Request for Judicial Notice re 64 Motion to Stay Litigation Based on Recently Filed FCC Petition, filed by Google, Inc., Slide, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 8, # 2 Exhibit 9)(Related document(s) 68 ) (Reiten, Joshua) (Filed on 4/16/2012) Modified on 4/17/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 16, 2012 Filing 68 Reply Memorandum re 64 Motion to Stay Litigation Based on Recently Filed FCC Petition, filed by Google, Inc., Slide, Inc.. (Reiten, Joshua) (Filed on 4/16/2012) Modified on 4/17/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 9, 2012 Filing 67 Memorandum in Opposition re 64 Motion to Stay Litigation Based on Recently Filed FCC Petition, filed by Jessica Franklin, Nicole Pimental. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Dore, Christopher) (Filed on 4/9/2012) Modified on 4/10/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 66 [MODIFIED] STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 62 . Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/27/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2012)
March 26, 2012 Filing 65 Request for Judicial Notice re 64 MOTION to Stay Litigation Based on Recently Filed FCC Petition filed byGoogle, Inc., Slide, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(Related document(s) 64 ) (Reiten, Joshua) (Filed on 3/26/2012)
March 26, 2012 Filing 64 MOTION to Stay Litigation Based on Recently Filed FCC Petition filed by Google, Inc., Slide, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/1/2012 02:00 PM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 4/9/2012. Replies due by 4/16/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reiten, Joshua) (Filed on 3/26/2012)
March 26, 2012 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua A. Reiten (Reiten, Joshua) (Filed on 3/26/2012)
March 22, 2012 Filing 62 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER, filed by Google, Inc., Slide, Inc., Jessica Franklin, Nicole Pimental. (Wilson, Bobbie) (Filed on 3/22/2012) Modified on 3/23/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 16, 2012 Filing 61 ANSWER to Consolidated Complaint, filed by Google, Inc., Slide, Inc.. (Wilson, Bobbie) (Filed on 3/16/2012) Modified on 3/19/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 12, 2012 Filing 60 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Jessica Franklin, Google, Inc., Nicole Pimental, Slide, Inc.. (Dore, Christopher) (Filed on 3/12/2012)
March 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 29 Motion to Dismiss. The Temporary Stay of Discovery, Document No. 56, is VACATED. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2012)
February 29, 2012 Filing 58 Order Setting Settlement Conference: Settlement Conference set for 9/4/2012 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 2/29/12. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2012)
February 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR TEMPORARY STAY OF DISCOVERY by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 34 Motion to Stay (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2012)
February 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER re Certification pursuant to 28 U.S.C.A. section 2403(a) and FRCP 5.1 39 filed by Jessica Franklin, Nicole Pimental. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/13/2012. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2012)
February 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 54 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byGoogle, Inc., Slide, Inc.. (Related document(s) 29 ) (Wilson, Bobbie) (Filed on 2/10/2012)
February 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 2/9/2012 before Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers (Date Filed: 2/9/2012). (Court Reporter Kathy Sullivan.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/9/2012)
January 27, 2012 Filing 53 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Jessica Franklin, Google, Inc., Nicole Pimental, Slide, Inc.. (Balabanian, Rafey) (Filed on 1/27/2012)
January 20, 2012 Filing 52 Renotice motion hearing re 29 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed byGoogle, Inc., Slide, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 3/6/2012 02:00 PM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (Related document(s) 29 ) (Wilson, Bobbie) (Filed on 1/20/2012)
January 20, 2012 Filing 51 CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 2/9/2012 09:00 AM. Referred to Magistrate Judge for Settlement Conference to be completed no later than 11/30/2012. Dispositive Motions heard by 10/30/2012. Jury Selection set for 2/19/2013 08:30 AM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. 3 to 5 Day Jury Trial set for 2/19/2013 08:30 AM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Pretrial Conference set for 2/1/2013 09:00 AM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers in a designated Courtroom in the Oakland Courthouse. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2012)
January 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Judge Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers, on 01/18/12. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2012) Modified on 1/19/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 48 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 12/12/11 (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2011) Modified on 12/14/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 7, 2011 Filing 48 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Jessica Franklin, Nicole Pimental. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Balabanian, Rafey) (Filed on 12/7/2011)
December 6, 2011 Filing 47 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion re 46 Motion to Strike, filed by Google, Inc., Slide, Inc. (Wilson, Bobbie) (Filed on 12/6/2011) Modified on 12/7/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 2, 2011 Filing 46 MOTION to Strike 40 Memorandum in Opposition, filed by Google, Inc., Slide, Inc.. Responses due by 12/6/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Wilson, Bobbie) (Filed on 12/2/2011) Modified on 12/5/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 2, 2011 Filing 45 Reply Memorandum re 29 MOtion to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Google, Inc., Slide, Inc.. (Wilson, Bobbie) (Filed on 12/2/2011) Modified on 12/5/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 42 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Rafey Balabanian (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2011)
November 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 41 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Christopher Dore (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2011)
November 17, 2011 Filing 42 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Rafey Balabanian ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 44611007928.) filed by Jessica Franklin, Nicole Pimental. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2011)
November 17, 2011 Filing 41 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Christopher Dore ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 44611007927.) filed by Jessica Franklin, Nicole Pimental. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2011)
November 11, 2011 Filing 40 Memorandum in Oppositon re 29 Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Jessica Franklin, Nicole Pimental. (Reis, Sean) (Filed on 11/11/2011) Modified on 11/14/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 3, 2011 Filing 39 NOTICE by Jessica Franklin, Nicole Pimental OF CERTIFICATION PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C.A. § 2403(A) AND FED R. CIV. P. 5.1 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reis, Sean) (Filed on 11/3/2011)
November 1, 2011 Filing 38 Letter to Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong re Defendants' Administrative Motion to Stay Discovery, filed by Bobbie J. Wilson, dated 11/1/11. (Wilson, Bobbie) (Filed on 11/1/2011) Modified on 11/2/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 31, 2011 Filing 37 Memorandum in Opposition re 34 Motion to Stay Discovery filed by Jessica Franklin, Nicole Pimental. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reis, Sean) (Filed on 10/31/2011) Modified on 11/1/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 35 Stipulation. Plaintiffs Opposition due 11/11/11; Defendants' Reply due 12/2/11. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 10/28/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2011) Modified on 11/1/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 28, 2011 Filing 35 STIPULATION to Extend Briefing Schedule re 29 Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint, filed by Jessica Franklin, Nicole Pimental, Google, Inc., Slide, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reis, Sean) (Filed on 10/28/2011) Modified on 11/1/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 27, 2011 ADR Remark: The further ADR Phone Conference scheduled for 11/10/11 has been taken off calendar. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2011)
October 26, 2011 Filing 34 MOTION to Stay Discovery, filed by Google, Inc., Slide, Inc.. Responses due by 10/31/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Wilson, Bobbie) (Filed on 10/26/2011) Modified on 10/27/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 33 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 6/22/2012. Motions due by 10/30/2012. Pretrial Conference set for 1/22/2013 01:00 PM before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. Jury Selection set for 2/14/2013 08:30 AM before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. Jury Trial set for 2/14/2013 08:30 AM before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 10/19/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2011)
October 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 28 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Stefan Coleman (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2011)
October 14, 2011 Filing 30 Request for Judicial Notice re 29 Motion to Dismiss filed by Google, Inc., Slide, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8)(Related document(s) 29 ) (Wilson, Bobbie) (Filed on 10/14/2011) Modified on 10/17/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 14, 2011 Filing 29 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Google, Inc., Slide, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/28/2012 01:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. Responses due by 10/28/2011. Replies due by 11/4/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Wilson, Bobbie) (Filed on 10/14/2011) Modified on 10/17/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 12, 2011 Filing 32 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 10/12/2011 before Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong. Motion for Class Certification Hearing set for 07/17/12 at 1:00 PM; Motion papers due by 05/08/12; Opposition due by 06/05/12; Reply due by 06/19/12; Last date to amend pleadings or add parties 02/14/12; General Discovery cut-off; Dispositive motion to be heard by 10/30/12; Pretrial Conference Continued to 01/22/13 at 1:00 PM; Jury Trial Continued to 02/14/13 at 8:30 AM. Case referred to Magistrate Judge for MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE to be held during the month of November 2012. (Date Filed: 10/12/2011). (Court Reporter: Not Reported) (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/12/2011) Modified on 10/19/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 11, 2011 Filing 28 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Stefan Coleman ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 44611007744.) filed by Jessica Franklin. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2011)
October 6, 2011 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by GDB on 10/6/11. A further ADR Phone Conference has been scheduled for 11/10/11 at 10:00 a.m. Pacific time. Please note that the call-in information remains the same. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2011)
October 5, 2011 Filing 27 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Further), filed by Nicole Pimental, Jessica Franklin, Google, Inc., Slide, Inc.. (Dore, Christopher) (Filed on 10/5/2011) Modified on 10/6/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 26, 2011 Filing 26 ADR Clerks Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on 10/6/11 at 10:30 a.m. Pacific time. Please take note that at the appointed time, all parties shall call 218-339-2500 and use access code 1057593 to join the call. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2011)
September 22, 2011 Cases associated: Create association to 4:11-cv-03333-SBA. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2011)
September 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER CONSOLIDATING RELATED CASES: C-11-2585-SBA and C-11-3333-SBA and Appointing Edelson McGuire LLC and interim lead counsel for Plaintiffs and the Class and Weiss & Lurie as liason counsel re 23 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 9/22/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2011) Modified on 9/23/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/23/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 14, 2011 Filing 24 CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Google, Inc., Slide, Inc.. Filed by Nicole Pimental, Jessica Franklin. (Reis, Sean) (Filed on 9/14/2011) Modified on 9/15/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 14, 2011 Filing 23 STIPULATION to Consolidate Related Cases, Appoint Interim Lead Counsel, and Authorize Filing of Consolidated Class Action Complaint, filed by Google, Inc., Nicole Pimental, Slide, Inc., Jessica Franklin. (Reis, Sean) (Filed on 9/14/2011) Modified on 9/15/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 20 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Debra R. Bernard (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2011)
September 8, 2011 Filing 21 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 9/8/2011 before Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong (Date Filed: 9/8/2011). Case Management Conference set for 10/12/2011 02:30 PM., via Telephone. (Court Reporter: Not Reported) Stipulation for Consolidation to filed by 09/14/11; Amended Consolidated Complaint due by 09/14/11; Defendants Answer to Consolidated Complaint due 09/30/11; Joint CMC Statement due (10) ten-days prior to CMC. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/8/2011) Modified on 9/12/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 8, 2011 Filing 19 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d), filed by Google, Inc., Slide, Inc. (Wilson, Bobbie) (Filed on 9/8/2011) Modified on 9/9/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 7, 2011 Filing 20 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Debra R. Bernard ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611064381.) filed by Google, Inc., Slide, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2011)
September 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 17 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Scott D. Owens (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2011)
August 31, 2011 Filing 16 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options, filed by Google, Inc., Slide, Inc. (Wilson, Bobbie) (Filed on 8/31/2011) Modified on 9/1/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 31, 2011 Filing 15 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT, filed by Google, Inc., Slide, Inc., Nicole Pimental. (Wilson, Bobbie) (Filed on 8/31/2011) Modified on 9/1/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 30, 2011 Filing 14 Statement of Corporate Disclosure Statement, filed by Slide, Inc.. (Wilson, Bobbie) (Filed on 8/30/2011) Modified on 9/1/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 30, 2011 Filing 13 Statement of Corporate Disclosure Statement, filed by Google, Inc.. (Wilson, Bobbie) (Filed on 8/30/2011) Modified on 9/1/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 30, 2011 Filing 12 Certificate of Interested Entities by Slide, Inc. (Wilson, Bobbie) (Filed on 8/30/2011)
August 30, 2011 Filing 11 Certificate of Interested Entities by Google, Inc. (Wilson, Bobbie) (Filed on 8/30/2011)
August 29, 2011 Filing 17 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Scott D. Owens ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611064067.), filed by Nicole Pimental. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2011)
August 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASES: Case Management Conference set for 9/8/2011 03:30 PM., via Telephone. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 8/22/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2011) Modified on 8/22/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/19/11. (kk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2011)
August 17, 2011 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2011)
August 17, 2011 Filing 7 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Nicole Pimental. (Reis, Sean) (Filed on 8/17/2011)
August 16, 2011 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF re: Consent or Declination to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2011)
June 24, 2011 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Google, Inc., Slide, Inc.. Filed byNicole Pimental. (Reis, Sean) (Filed on 6/24/2011)
May 27, 2011 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Google, Inc., Slide, Inc.. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2011) (vlk, COURT STAFF).
May 27, 2011 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Bret L. Lusskin (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2011) (vlk, COURT STAFF).
May 27, 2011 Filing 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 8/31/2011. Case Management Conference set for 9/7/2011 01:30 PM. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/2/2011: # 1 Standing Order) (vlk, COURT STAFF).
May 27, 2011 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2011)
May 27, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Google, Inc., Slide, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611060360.). Filed byBret L. Lusskin. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/2/2011: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (vlk, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pimental v. Google, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Slide, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Pimental
Represented By: Sean Patrick Reis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?