Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas et al v. First Republic Bank et al
Plaintiff: Wilmington Trust Company, Board of Administration of the Water and Power Employees' Retirement Plan, incorrectly named as "Los Angeles Department of Water and Power Employees Retirement Plan-LCV" and "Water, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York and Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas
Defendant: Robert D. Nelson, Bernadette Fingleton, Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Florence S. Bradshaw, SDG&E Qualified Nuclear Decom, PG&E Postretirment Medical Plan TR, Jacqueline E. Autry, zoological Society of San Diego, a California, Iris B. Mahoney, Nicholas H. Werthman, Antoinette B. Brumbaugh, Charley Chunyu Lu & Biying Zhang Commercial Property, Betty K Zlatchin, Virginia Lanfranki, Lisa Pritzker, Claude Rosenberg, Charley Chunyu Lu, Durham J. Monsma, Biying Zhang, Melissa A Monson, Enzo S. Ricciardelli, California Ironworkers Field Pension Trust, Mark Allen Itkin, Patricia Kaszton, Irene M. McNulty, Janice Fay Johnson Ochs, Alfred V. Tjarks Jr., James H. Eckhouse, Trudy V. Dunaway, Board of Trustees of Leland Stanford Jr University, Robert J. Brookes, Francis G. Duggan, Quinn Martin Dolan, Catherine A. Verdusco, Joe Youssry Kelada, Eric I. Chang, Tommie L. Cordero, Lori Ann Talarico, William F. Thomas, First Republic Bank, Mark I. Seiden, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc, Carl Zlatchin Profit, Varda Rabin, Robert Ramsey, Irene Baron, Rodolfo V. Gil, The Whittier Trust Company, Barbro Osher, RWB, Robbie E. Monsma, Louise Rosenberg, Archdiocese of Los Angeles Lay Employee Pension Plan, E. Donald Heymann, Joseph M. Fee, Melissa Ma, Carol Rhoads, Water and Power Employee's Ret. Disab. & Death Benefit Ins. Plan, Warren B. Williamson, Herbert Anthony Clark, Jr., Derek M. Dalton, Kaiser Foundation Health, Mark Domas, Marlowe G. Merkel, State of California - Mid Cap Value, Carpenters Pension Trust for Northern California, Verna R. Harrah, Sherry P. Broder, John A. Orb, Wedbush Morgan Securities, Inc., Judy C. Webb, William Kaszton, Sacramento County Emp Ret System, Stephen D. Carver, Los Angeles Department of Water and Power Employees Retirement Plan-LCV, Richard Askin, Karen Hammond, S Keating Rhoads, Crowell Weedon & Co., Despina Haigler, Javad Rassouli, Richard S. Arnold, George J. Peckham, Catholic Healthcare West CHW, State of California, Department of Personnel Administration, Savings Plus Plan, Lois L. Flick, Michael Plonski, Rabin Worldwide, Inc., Randy Steiner, Bernard Osher, Omar F. Johnson Jr., Herbert G. Lau Profit Sharing QRP Participation, John Pritzker, Camilla Chandler Frost, Sherry Broder, Nancy D. Ramage, George William Buck, John A. Orb Jr., Debra A. Gastler, Warren J. Eide, Susan H. Shane, City National Bank, Kaiser Foundation Health Plans and Hospital, Lucile M. Dunn, Helen Grossman, Mark A. Hughes, Karen E. Dalton, Susan Babcock, Chandis Securities Company, Enrique Hernandez, Jr., Ynez Viole O'Neill, James A. Friedberg, Paul Theodore Hammond, T.Rowe Price, Betty Beaird, Sacramento County Ret Association, Thomas F Friedberg, Union Bank of California N.A.,, John W. Stewart II, Irving Rabin, Directors Guild of America, Paul M. Mahoney, Roger Goodan, Eric Morris, Jonathan Gary Keith, John M. Altman, Betty Ann Altman, Chase L. Leavitt, Roman Catholic Archbishop LA, Lolita K. Wagner, Frances L. Cey, Joanne Desherow Sanger, Leonard F. Hill, Rena Shapiro, Camilla Chandler Family Foundation, Alfred V. Tjarks, Nancy L. Mac Donald, Monumental Life Insurance Company, Whittier Trust Company, Laurie H. Weaver, Southern California UFCWU & FE Joint Pension Trust Fund, Spencer W. Beard, Nancy Lobdell, Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, Nedra Plonski, Everything Medical, Inc., Nancy Fay Johnson, Will K. Weinstein, Doheney Eye Institute, Robert C. Lobdell, Peter A. Young, Starbuck, Tisdale & Associates, SC Edison Nuclear Facilities, Alfred W. Merkel, Jeanette M. Duggan, Mary Kathleen McNulty, Aegon/Transamerica Series Trust T Rowe Price Equity Income, Vern M. Strickler, William J. Bell, Danica F. Hughes, Omers Pension Fund, William D. Mac Donald, Lawrence H Burks, John Lanfranki, Miriam A. Pawel, Qualified CPUC Decom Master TR, Richard Haigler, Jeffrey Chandler, Ronald C. Cey, Donald Baron, Sharron R. Beard, Wayne F. McNulty, Douglas B. Stewart, Diane Buchanan Wilsey, Carol Askin, Jill E. Berube, Daniel H. Renberg, Renee H. Miller, John E. Flick, Jeffrey J. Appleby, Imogene S. Peckham, Remdel Brothers, SA Funds Investment Trust, Michael W. Dunaway, Catholic Health West CHW, Kevin Stone, Bernard Shapiro, San Pasqual Fiduciary Trust Co., Transamerica Partners Mid Cap Value, Archdiocese of Los Angeles, Thomas F. Friedberg, Teamsters Separate Account, Gelert R. Ramage, Jr., Directors Guild of America Producer Pension Trust, William Stinehart Jr., Bank of The West, Jill E. Eckhouse and Transamerica Partners Mid Cap Value F/K/A Div. Investors Portfolios
Interested Party: Estate of Robert D. Nelson
Case Number: 4:2011cv02634
Filed: June 2, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2011 Filing 336 NOTICE of December 28, 2011 Order in MDL Proceeding In Re: Tribune Company Fraudulent Conveyance Litigation by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 12/28/11 Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 12/29/2011) Modified on 12/30/2011 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
December 20, 2011 Filing 335 NOTICE by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company re #333 Order Transferring Case, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Transfer Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 12/20/2011)
December 20, 2011 Filing 334 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company of Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support thereof; [Proposed] Third Amended Complaint; and [Proposed] Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 12/20/2011)
December 20, 2011 Case electronically transferred to the U.S. District Court, Southern District of New York, opened as 1:11-cv-09572. Counsel notified (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2011) Modified on 1/3/2012 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
December 20, 2011 Filing 333 TRANSFER ORDER MDL-2296: Transferring case to the U.S. District Court, Southern District of New York. Signed by The Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, on 12/20/2011. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2011)
December 19, 2011 Filing 332 MOTION for Leave to File [Proposed] Third Amended Complaint filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Third Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit A to [Proposed] Third Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit B to [Proposed] Third Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit C to [Proposed] Third Amended Complaint, #5 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint)(DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 12/19/2011)
December 15, 2011 Filing 331 Certificate of Interested Entities by Transamerica Partners Mid Cap Value, Transamerica Partners Mid Cap Value F/K/A Div. Investors Portfolios (DiPerna, Mark) (Filed on 12/15/2011)
December 15, 2011 Filing 330 Certificate of Interested Entities by Aegon/Transamerica Series Trust T Rowe Price Equity Income (DiPerna, Mark) (Filed on 12/15/2011)
December 15, 2011 Filing 329 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark P DiPerna (DiPerna, Mark) (Filed on 12/15/2011)
December 9, 2011 Filing 328 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc Jeffrey Schneider on behalf of JOANNE DESHEROW SANGER, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS A TRUSTEE OF THE U/A DTA 03/29/04 JOANNE DESHEROW SANGER LIVTR (Schneider, Marc) (Filed on 12/9/2011)
December 5, 2011 Filing 327 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Peter A. Young (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 12/5/2011)
December 5, 2011 Filing 326 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Transamerica Partners Mid Cap Value F/K/A Div. Investors Portfolios served on 11/18/2011, answer due 12/9/2011. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 12/5/2011)
December 5, 2011 Filing 325 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Transamerica Partners Mid Cap Value served on 11/18/2011, answer due 12/9/2011. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 12/5/2011)
December 5, 2011 Filing 324 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Aegon/Transamerica Series Trust T Rowe Price Equity Income served on 9/18/2011, answer due 10/11/2011. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 12/5/2011)
December 5, 2011 Filing 323 *** FILED IN ERROR. REFER TO DOCUMENT #327 . *** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Peter A. Young served on 9/18/2011, answer due 10/11/2011. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 12/5/2011) Modified on 12/5/2011 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
December 5, 2011 Filing 322 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. E. Donald Heymann served on 9/18/2011, answer due 10/11/2011. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 12/5/2011)
December 5, 2011 Filing 321 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. John A. Orb Jr. served on 9/18/2011, answer due 10/11/2011. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 12/5/2011)
December 5, 2011 Filing 320 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Robert Ramsey served on 9/18/2011, answer due 10/11/2011. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 12/5/2011)
December 5, 2011 Filing 319 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Sherry P. Broder(an individual) served on 9/18/2011, answer due 10/11/2011. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 12/5/2011)
December 5, 2011 Filing 318 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Francis G. Duggan served on 9/18/2011, answer due 10/11/2011. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 12/5/2011)
November 30, 2011 Filing 317 NOTICE of Appearance by Ellen Kaufman Wolf on behalf of Bernard and Rena Shapiro (Wolf, Ellen) (Filed on 11/30/2011)
November 22, 2011 Filing 316 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeanne Ellen Irving (Irving, Jeanne) (Filed on 11/22/2011)
November 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 315 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #309 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Jeffrey J. Mayer. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2011)
November 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 314 ORDER by Judge Hamilton Denying #301 #312 Request for Permission to E-file (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/22/2011: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (nah, COURT STAFF).
November 17, 2011 Receipt in the amount of $305.00 for #309 Application for Pro hac vice, receipt no. 34611067083. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2011)
November 16, 2011 Filing 313 Answer to Second Amended Complaint byPeter A. Young. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2011) Modified on 11/22/2011 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
November 14, 2011 Filing 312 MOTION For Permission to Efile filed by Peter A. Young. Responses due by 11/28/2011. Replies due by 12/5/2011. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2011)
November 14, 2011 Filing 311 Letter from Peter Young dated 11/9/2011 re: efiling requirements. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2011)
November 14, 2011 Filing 310 NOTICE of Appearance of Jeffrey J. Mayer filed by E. Donald Heymann (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for #309 Pro Hac Vice application)(Baskin, Lawrence) (Filed on 11/14/2011) Modified on 11/15/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
November 14, 2011 Filing 309 Motion of Jeffrey J. Mayer for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice by E. Donald Heymann. (Baskin, Lawrence) (Filed on 11/14/2011) Modified on 11/15/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF). FILING FEE PAID in the amount of $305.00, receipt no. 34611067083 Modified on 11/21/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
November 7, 2011 Filing 308 NOTICE of Appearance Nancy L. Mac Donald, William D. Mac Donald (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2011)
November 7, 2011 Filing 307 Letter from Nancy MacDonald dated 10/11/2011 re: Notice of Appearance. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2011)
November 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 306 ORDER RE EFILING REQUIREMENTS FOR PRO SE DEFENDANTS re #301 MOTION For Permission to Efile filed by Peter A. Young. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 11/2/11. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2011)
October 31, 2011 Filing 305 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence Allen Baskin obo E. Donald Heymann, indv and as Trustee of E. Donald Heymann Trust (Baskin, Lawrence) (Filed on 10/31/2011)
October 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 304 ORDER GRANTING DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT MELISSA MA re #295 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, filed by Wilmington Trust Company, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/25/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2011)
October 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 303 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #300 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Deborah Jill Newman. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2011)
October 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 302 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #299 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Alan J. Stone. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2011)
October 24, 2011 Filing 301 MOTION For Permission to Efile filed by Peter A. Young. Responses due by 11/7/2011. Replies due by 11/14/2011. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2011)
October 19, 2011 Filing 300 MOTION of Deborah Jill Newman for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 44611007784.) filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2011)
October 19, 2011 Filing 299 MOTION of Alan J. Stone for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 44611007787.) filed by Union Bank of California N.A.,. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2011)
October 19, 2011 Filing 298 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Hoke Bergman by Defendants John Pritzker and Lisa Pritzker (Bergman, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/19/2011)
October 18, 2011 Filing 297 Notice of Withdrawal of #288 Joinder to Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Paul M. Mahoney(individually and as a Trustee of the Iris B. Mahoney REV TR U/A/D 04/10/98). (Mahoney, Paul) (Filed on 10/18/2011) Modified on 10/19/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
October 18, 2011 Filing 296 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF #286 OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Debra A. Gastler, Mark Allen Itkin, Nancy Lobdell, Renee H. Miller, Durham J. Monsma, Robbie E. Monsma, William F. Thomas (Neubauer, Mark) (Filed on 10/18/2011) Modified on 10/19/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
October 18, 2011 Filing 295 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Melissa Ma by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company (Attachments: #1 Stipulated Agreement to Voluntary Dismissal of Melissa Ma)(DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 10/18/2011)
October 14, 2011 Filing 294 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lucile M. Dunn (Hodge, Stanley) (Filed on 10/14/2011)
October 14, 2011 Filing 293 NOTICE of Appearance by Stanley William Hodge (Hodge, Stanley) (Filed on 10/14/2011)
October 14, 2011 Filing 292 NOTICE of Appearance by Stanley William Hodge (Hodge, Stanley) (Filed on 10/14/2011)
October 13, 2011 Filing 291 Certificate of Interested Entities by Union Bank of California N.A., identifying Corporate Parent Union Bank, N.A., Other Affiliate UnionbanCal Corporation, Other Affiliate Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ for Union Bank of California N.A.,. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Saelao, Rebecca) (Filed on 10/13/2011)
October 13, 2011 Filing 290 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca Snavely Saelao (Attachments: #1 Certificte of Service)(Saelao, Rebecca) (Filed on 10/13/2011)
October 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 289 ORDER by Judge Hamilton Granting #263 Plaintiff's Request to E-File (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/13/2011: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (nah, COURT STAFF).
October 12, 2011 Filing 288 Joinder to #286 Opposition filed by Defendants to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Paul M. Mahoney(individually and as a Trustee of U/W/O Paul P Mahoney DTD 12/28/1978). (Mahoney, Paul) (Filed on 10/12/2011) Modified on 10/13/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
October 12, 2011 Filing 287 Joinder to #286 Opposition filed by Defendants to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Iris B. Mahoney. (Mahoney, Paul) (Filed on 10/12/2011) Modified on 10/13/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
October 11, 2011 Filing 286 RESPONSE (re #256 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint ) filed byDebra A. Gastler, Mark Allen Itkin, Nancy Lobdell, Renee H. Miller, Durham J. Monsma, Robbie E. Monsma, William F. Thomas. (Neubauer, Mark) (Filed on 10/11/2011)
October 11, 2011 Filing 285 Statement of Non-Opposition to #256 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by First Republic Bank. (Schneider, Walter) (Filed on 10/11/2011) Modified on 10/12/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
October 11, 2011 Filing 284 Statement of Non-Opposition re #256 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed byState of California, Department of Personnel Administration, Savings Plus Plan. (Related document(s) #256 ) (Cu, John) (Filed on 10/11/2011)
October 7, 2011 Filing 283 Letter from Warren J. Eide dated 10/4/2011 re efiling requirements. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/7/2011: #1 Envelope) (vlk, COURT STAFF).
October 7, 2011 Filing 282 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #280 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , Exhibit A to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint and Future Documents Containing Such Information by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 10/7/2011)
October 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 281 ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO SET PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR A NOVEMBER HEARING DATE by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton denying #257 Motion for Hearing (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2011)
October 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 280 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #260 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2011)
October 7, 2011 Filing 279 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Hoke Bergman for Defendant Verna R. Harrah (Bergman, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/7/2011)
October 6, 2011 Filing 278 Certificate of Interested Entities by PG&E Postretirment Medical Plan TR (Firestein, Michael) (Filed on 10/6/2011)
October 6, 2011 Filing 277 Certificate of Interested Entities by Charles Schwab & Co., Inc (DiPerna, Mark) (Filed on 10/6/2011)
October 6, 2011 Filing 276 Certificate of Interested Entities by Monumental Life Insurance Company (DiPerna, Mark) (Filed on 10/6/2011)
October 6, 2011 Filing 275 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark P DiPerna for CHARLES SCHWAB & CO., INC. (DiPerna, Mark) (Filed on 10/6/2011)
October 6, 2011 Filing 274 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark P DiPerna for MONUMENTAL LIFE INSURANCE CO. (DiPerna, Mark) (Filed on 10/6/2011)
October 4, 2011 Filing 273 NOTICE of Appearance by Ellen Greenstone APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL for Defendant Miriam A. Pawel (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Greenstone, Ellen) (Filed on 10/4/2011)
October 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #253 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Hal Neier. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2011)
October 3, 2011 Filing 271 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company re #264 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief to Extend Time for Service of Summons and Complaint (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 10/3/2011)
October 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #252 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Amy C. Brown. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2011)
October 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #251 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Ricardo Solano, Jr. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2011)
September 30, 2011 Filing 268 Certificate of Interested Entities by Crowell Weedon & Co. (Glos, Christopher) (Filed on 9/30/2011)
September 30, 2011 Filing 267 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Darin Glos on behalf of Defendant Crowell, Weedon & Co. (Glos, Christopher) (Filed on 9/30/2011)
September 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ORDER RE E-FILING REQUIREMENTS FOR PRO SE PLAINTIFFS re #263 MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing filed by Warren J. Eide. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 9/30/11. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2011)
September 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 265 ORDER GRANTING CHANGE IN PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL re #258 Notice of Change In Counsel filed by Wilmington Trust Company, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 9/30/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2011)
September 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #232 Motion (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2011)
September 29, 2011 Filing 263 MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing filed by Warren J. Eide. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Envelope)(cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2011)
September 29, 2011 Filing 262 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company re #257 MOTION for Hearing re #256 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint MOTION FOR NOVEMBER HEARING DATE MOTION for Hearing re #256 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint MOTION FOR NOVEMBER HEARING DATE, #256 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint, #260 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Amended Exhibit A to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint and Future Documents Containing Confidential Shareholder Information, #258 Notice of Change In Counsel, #261 MOTION for Leave to File to File Amended Complaint Against Defendants Richard and Despina Haigler (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 9/29/2011)
September 29, 2011 Filing 261 MOTION for Leave to File to File Amended Complaint Against Defendants Richard and Despina Haigler filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 9/29/2011)
September 28, 2011 Filing 260 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Amended Exhibit A to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint and Future Documents Containing Confidential Shareholder Information filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 9/28/2011)
September 28, 2011 Filing 259 NOTICE of Appearance of Michael Allen Firestein as Counsel, filed by PG&E Postretirement Medical Plan TR (Firestein, Michael) (Filed on 9/28/2011) Modified on 9/30/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 27, 2011 Filing 258 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Julia Ingrid DeBeers as Against Defendants SDG&E Qualified Nuclear Decom and SDG&E Qualified Nuclear Decommissioning Trust Partnership and [Proposed] Order (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 9/27/2011)
September 27, 2011 Filing 257 MOTION for Hearing re #256 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint MOTION FOR NOVEMBER HEARING DATE filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 9/27/2011)
September 27, 2011 Filing 256 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Julia I. De Beers, #2 [Proposed] Second Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit A to Second Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit B to Second Amended Complaint, #5 Exhibit C to Second Amended Complaint, #6 Proposed Order)(DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 9/27/2011)
September 27, 2011 Filing 255 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Omar F. Johnson Jr. re #254 Notice of Appearance NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND REQUEST FOR SPECIAL NOTICE (Schafer, John) (Filed on 9/27/2011)
September 27, 2011 Filing 254 NOTICE of Appearance by John Paulo Schafer NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND REQUEST FOR SPECIAL NOTICE (Schafer, John) (Filed on 9/27/2011)
September 26, 2011 Filing 253 MOTION of Hal Neier for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 44611007646.) filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2011)
September 26, 2011 Filing 252 MOTION of Amy Brown for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 44611007645.) filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2011)
September 26, 2011 Filing 251 MOTION of Ricardo Solano Jr. for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 44611007644.) filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2011)
September 21, 2011 Filing 250 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company Personal Service on Defendant City National Bank (Larsen, Melodie) (Filed on 9/21/2011)
September 21, 2011 Filing 249 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company Personal Service on Defendant Union Bank of California N.A. (Larsen, Melodie) (Filed on 9/21/2011)
September 20, 2011 Filing 248 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Service waived by Alfred V. Tjarks waiver sent on 9/16/2011, answer due 11/15/2011; Alfred V. Tjarks Jr. waiver sent on 9/16/2011, answer due 11/15/2011. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 9/20/2011)
September 15, 2011 Filing 247 RESPONSE to and joinder in opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Transfer For Coordinated Pretrial Proceedings in MDL Case No. 2296 by Carol Askin, Richard Askin. (Kohlbrand, Richard) (Filed on 9/15/2011)
September 14, 2011 Filing 246 NOTICE of Appearance filed by James A. Friedberg (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2011)
September 14, 2011 Filing 245 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Franklin Friedberg individually and as co-trustee of the Administrative Trust Under the Herman R. Friedberg Revocable Trust (Friedberg, Thomas) (Filed on 9/14/2011)
September 13, 2011 Filing 244 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company re #242 Renotice motion hearing, Moved from October 19, 2011 to November 9, 2011 (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 9/13/2011)
September 13, 2011 Filing 243 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Lee Marcus of Defendants ALFRED V. TJARKS, AN INDIVIDUAL AND ALFRED V. TJARKS JR., AS TRUSTEE OF THE ALFRED V. TJARKS RETIREMENT PLAN DTD 02/18/85 (Marcus, Jeffrey) (Filed on 9/13/2011)
September 12, 2011 Filing 242 Renotice motion hearing re #232 MOTION to Extend Time for Service of Summons and Complaint Moved From October 19, 2011 to November 9, 2011 filed byDeutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Motion Hearing set for 11/9/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. (Related document(s) #232 ) (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 9/12/2011)
September 12, 2011 Filing 241 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company re #232 MOTION to Extend Time for Service of Summons and Complaint (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 9/12/2011)
September 12, 2011 Filing 240 NOTICE of Appearance by Claudia Angelica Quiroz NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF CLAUDIA A. QUIROZ (Quiroz, Claudia) (Filed on 9/12/2011)
September 12, 2011 Filing 239 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Paul Brezine, Esq (Brezine, Adam) (Filed on 9/12/2011)
September 12, 2011 Filing 238 Certificate of Interested Entities by SA Funds Investment Trust identifying Corporate Parent SA Funds Investment Trust for SA Funds Investment Trust. DEFENDANT SA FUNDS-INVESTMENT TRUST'S CERTIFICATION OF INTERESTED ENTITIES OR PERSONS (Quiroz, Claudia) (Filed on 9/12/2011)
September 12, 2011 Filing 237 NOTICE of Appearance by Claudia Angelica Quiroz NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF EDWARD P. SANGSTER (Quiroz, Claudia) (Filed on 9/12/2011)
September 12, 2011 Filing 236 Certificate of Interested Entities by Board of Administration of the Water and Power Employees' Retirement Plan, incorrectly named as "Los Angeles Department of Water and Power Employees Retirement Plan-LCV" and "Water identifying Corporate Parent Tribune Company for Board of Administration of the Water and Power Employees' Retirement Plan, incorrectly named as "Los Angeles Department of Water and Power Employees Retirement Plan-LCV" and "Water. (Loeb, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/12/2011)
September 12, 2011 Filing 235 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Alan Loeb for Defendant Board of Administration of the Water and Power Employees' Retirement Plan, incorrectly named as "Los Angeles Department of Water and Power Employees Retirement Plan-LCV" and "Water and Power Employee's Ret. Disab. & Death Benefits Ins. Plan" (Loeb, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/12/2011)
September 12, 2011 Filing 234 NOTICE of Appearance by Sabina Clorfeine (Clorfeine, Sabina) (Filed on 9/12/2011)
September 12, 2011 Filing 233 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Joseph Olecki (Olecki, Michael) (Filed on 9/12/2011)
September 9, 2011 Filing 232 MOTION to Extend Time for Service of Summons and Complaint filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Motion Hearing set for 10/19/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Responses due by 9/23/2011. Replies due by 9/30/2011. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 9/9/2011)
September 9, 2011 Filing 231 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael L Klein for Catherine Verdusco individually and as the Trustee of the Benjamin Verdusco and Francesca Verdusco Trusts (Klein, Michael) (Filed on 9/9/2011)
September 9, 2011 Filing 230 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael L Klein for Jeffrey Appleby individually and as Trustee of the Christopher Appleby, Felicity Appleby and James Polk Trusts (Klein, Michael) (Filed on 9/9/2011)
September 9, 2011 Filing 229 NOTICE of Appearance by John Lance Erikson, Jr (Defendant Wedbush Securities Inc., formerly known as Wedbush Morgan Securities, Inc.) (Erikson, John) (Filed on 9/9/2011)
September 9, 2011 Filing 228 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark A. Neubauer on behalf of Defendant Mark Allen Itkin (Neubauer, Mark) (Filed on 9/9/2011)
September 8, 2011 Filing 227 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard John Kohlbrand for Carol Askin and Richard Askin (Kohlbrand, Richard) (Filed on 9/8/2011) Modified on 9/9/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
September 8, 2011 Filing 226 FILED IN ERROR. SEE DOCUMENT #227 FOR CORRECT ENTRY.NOTICE of Appearance by Richard John Kohlbrand for Carol Askin (Kohlbrand, Richard) (Filed on 9/8/2011) Modified on 9/9/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
September 8, 2011 Filing 225 FILED IN ERROR. SEE DOCUMENT #227 FOR CORRECT ENTRY.NOTICE of Appearance by Richard John Kohlbrand (Kohlbrand, Richard) (Filed on 9/8/2011) Modified on 9/9/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
September 8, 2011 Filing 224 FILED IN ERROR. SEE DOCUMENT #227 FOR CORRECT ENTRY.NOTICE of Appearance by Richard John Kohlbrand (Kohlbrand, Richard) (Filed on 9/8/2011) Modified on 9/9/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
September 8, 2011 Filing 223 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc Jeffrey Schneider on behalf of Rodolfo V. Gil (Schneider, Marc) (Filed on 9/8/2011)
September 8, 2011 Filing 222 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony P. Fritz for Mary Kathllen McNulty, individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of Wayne McNulty (Deceased) (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Fritz, Anthony) (Filed on 9/8/2011)
September 8, 2011 Filing 221 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Jens Frederick Smith (Smith, Michael) (Filed on 9/8/2011)
September 8, 2011 Filing 220 Certificate of Interested Entities by First Republic Bank (Schneider, Walter) (Filed on 9/8/2011)
September 8, 2011 Filing 219 NOTICE of Appearance by Walter Raymond Schneider by First Republic Bank (Schneider, Walter) (Filed on 9/8/2011)
September 8, 2011 Filing 218 CLERKS NOTICE re: Failure to E-File and/or Failure to Register as an E-Filer (document #217 ) (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2011)
September 8, 2011 Filing 217 NOTICE of Appearance filed by Javad Rassouli (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2011) (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
September 8, 2011 Filing 216 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas James Van Brunt on behalf of Whittier Trust Company (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Van Brunt, Nicholas) (Filed on 9/8/2011)
September 8, 2011 Filing 215 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Michael Mahoney as Trustee U/W/O Paul P. Mahoney DTD 12/28/1978 (Mahoney, Paul) (Filed on 9/8/2011)
September 8, 2011 Filing 214 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Michael Mahoney Individually and as Trustee (Mahoney, Paul) (Filed on 9/8/2011)
September 7, 2011 Filing 213 NOTICE of Appearance by John T. Cu on behalf of State of California, Department of Personnel Administration, Savings Plus Plan (Cu, John) (Filed on 9/7/2011)
September 7, 2011 Filing 211 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark A. Neubauer on behalf of Defendants Durham J. Monsma, Robbie E. Monsma, Debra A. Gastler, Nancy Lobdell, Renee H. Miller, and William F. Thomas (Neubauer, Mark) (Filed on 9/7/2011)
September 6, 2011 Filing 212 NOTICE of Appearance by Danica F. Hughes, Mark A. Hughes (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2011)
September 6, 2011 Filing 210 NOTICE of Appearance by Donna Lynn Kirchner (Kirchner, Donna) (Filed on 9/6/2011)
September 2, 2011 Filing 209 Pro Se NOTICE of Appearance S Keating Rhoads (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2011)
September 2, 2011 Filing 208 Pro Se NOTICE of Appearance Carol Rhoads (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2011)
September 2, 2011 Filing 206 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Julian Newman (Newman, Stephen) (Filed on 9/2/2011)
September 2, 2011 Filing 205 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Hoke Bergman for Will K. Weinstein and Diane Buchanan Wilsey (Bergman, Jeffrey) (Filed on 9/2/2011)
September 2, 2011 Filing 204 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company re #195 Notice of Appearance (Larsen, Melodie) (Filed on 9/2/2011)
September 1, 2011 Filing 207 Pro Se NOTICE of Appearance by Warren J. Eide (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/4/2017: #1 Pro Se NOTICE of Appearance by Warren J. Eide) (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
September 1, 2011 Filing 203 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Barbro Osher served on 6/25/2011, answer due 7/18/2011; Bernard Osher served on 6/25/2011, answer due 7/18/2011. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 9/1/2011)
August 31, 2011 Filing 202 NOTICE of Appearance by Wayne T. Lamprey for Joseph Fee (Lamprey, Wayne) (Filed on 8/31/2011)
August 31, 2011 Filing 201 NOTICE of Appearance by James Wade Poindexter by Florence S. Bradshaw (Poindexter, James) (Filed on 8/31/2011)
August 31, 2011 Filing 200 NOTICE of Appearance by James Wade Poindexter By Defendants Richard S. Arnold and San Pasqual Fiduciary Trust Company (Poindexter, James) (Filed on 8/31/2011)
August 30, 2011 Filing 199 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc Jeffrey Schneider on behalf of Imogene S. Peckham, Individually and as a Trustee of U/AD 0714-2000 FBO THE 2000 Peckham Family Trust (Schneider, Marc) (Filed on 8/30/2011)
August 30, 2011 Filing 198 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc Jeffrey Schneider on behalf of George J. Peckham, individually and as a Trustee of U/AD 07-14-2000 1-B0 THE 2000 Peckham Family Trust (Schneider, Marc) (Filed on 8/30/2011)
August 30, 2011 Filing 197 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc Jeffrey Schneider on behalf of Spencer W. Beard (Schneider, Marc) (Filed on 8/30/2011)
August 30, 2011 Filing 196 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc Jeffrey Schneider on behalf of Sharron R. Beard (Schneider, Marc) (Filed on 8/30/2011)
August 30, 2011 Filing 195 NOTICE of Appearance by Melodie Kay Larsen and Allan E. Ceran (Larsen, Melodie) (Filed on 8/30/2011)
August 29, 2011 Filing 194 NOTICE of Appearance by Raja M.G. Sekaran (Sekaran, Raja) (Filed on 8/29/2011)
August 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER RE NOTICE OF CHANGE IN COUNSEL AS TO SOME DEFENDANTS re #184 Notice of Change In Counsel filed by Wilmington Trust Company, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 8/29/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2011)
August 25, 2011 Filing 192 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Omar F. Johnson Jr. served on 8/22/2011, answer due 9/12/2011. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 8/25/2011)
August 25, 2011 Filing 191 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Chase L. Leavitt served on 8/17/2011, answer due 9/7/2011. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 8/25/2011)
August 25, 2011 Filing 190 CLERKS NOTICE re: Failure to E-File document #189 . (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2011)
August 25, 2011 Filing 188 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company re #185 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, AMENDED (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 8/25/2011)
August 25, 2011 Filing 187 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company re #184 Notice of Change In Counsel AMENDED (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 8/25/2011)
August 25, 2011 Filing 186 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company re #183 Stipulation, AMENDED (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 8/25/2011)
August 24, 2011 Filing 185 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Aegon/Transamerica Series Trust T Rowe Price Equity Income, Betty Ann Altman, John M. Altman, Jeffrey J. Appleby, Archdiocese of Los Angeles, Archdiocese of Los Angeles Lay Employee Pension Plan, Richard S. Arnold, Carol Askin, Richard Askin, Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Jacqueline E. Autry, Susan Babcock, Bank of The West, Donald Baron, Irene Baron, Betty Beaird, Sharron R. Beard, Spencer W. Beard, William J. Bell, Jill E. Berube, Board of Trustees of Leland Stanford Jr University, Florence S. Bradshaw, Sherry Broder(individually and as a Trustee of Sherry P. Broder U/A DTD 1/1/94), Sherry P. Broder(an individual), Robert J. Brookes, Antoinette B. Brumbaugh, George William Buck, Lawrence H Burks, California Ironworkers Field Pension Trust, Camilla Chandler Family Foundation, Carpenters Pension Trust for Northern California, Stephen D. Carver, Catholic Health West CHW, Catholic Healthcare West CHW, Frances L. Cey, Ronald C. Cey, Chandis Securities Company, Jeffrey Chandler, Eric I. Chang, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc, Charley Chunyu Lu & Biying Zhang Commercial Property, City National Bank, Herbert Anthony Clark, Jr., Tommie L. Cordero, Crowell Weedon & Co., Derek M. Dalton, Karen E. Dalton, Directors Guild of America, Directors Guild of America Producer Pension Trust, Doheney Eye Institute, Quinn Martin Dolan, Mark Domas, Francis G. Duggan, Jeanette M. Duggan, Michael W. Dunaway, Trudy V. Dunaway, Lucile M. Dunn, James H. Eckhouse, Jill E. Eckhouse, Warren J. Eide, Everything Medical, Inc., Joseph M. Fee, Bernadette Fingleton, First Republic Bank, John E. Flick, Lois L. Flick, James A. Friedberg, Thomas F. Friedberg, Camilla Chandler Frost, Debra A. Gastler, Rodolfo V. Gil, Roger Goodan, Helen Grossman, Karen Hammond, Paul Theodore Hammond, Verna R. Harrah, Herbert G. Lau Profit Sharing QRP Participation, Enrique Hernandez, Jr., E. Donald Heymann, Leonard F. Hill, Danica F. Hughes, Mark A. Hughes, Mark Allen Itkin, Nancy Fay Johnson, Omar F. Johnson Jr., Kaiser Foundation Health, Kaiser Foundation Health Plans and Hospital, Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, Patricia Kaszton, William Kaszton, Jonathan Gary Keith, Joe Youssry Kelada, John Lanfranki, Virginia Lanfranki, Chase L. Leavitt, Nancy Lobdell, Robert C. Lobdell, Los Angeles Department of Water and Power Employees Retirement Plan-LCV, Charley Chunyu Lu, Melissa Ma, Nancy L. Mac Donald, William D. Mac Donald, Iris B. Mahoney, Paul M. Mahoney(individually and as a Trustee of the Iris B. Mahoney REV TR U/A/D 04/10/98), Paul M. Mahoney(individually and as a Trustee of U/W/O Paul P Mahoney DTD 12/28/1978), Irene M. McNulty, Mary Kathleen McNulty, Wayne F. McNulty, Alfred W. Merkel, Marlowe G. Merkel, Renee H. Miller, Durham J. Monsma, Robbie E. Monsma, Melissa A Monson, Monumental Life Insurance Company, Eric Morris, Robert D. Nelson, Ynez Viole O'Neill, Janice Fay Johnson Ochs, Omers Pension Fund, John A. Orb, John A. Orb Jr., Barbro Osher, Bernard Osher, PG&E Postretirment Medical Plan TR, Miriam A. Pawel, George J. Peckham, Imogene S. Peckham, Michael Plonski, Nedra Plonski, John Pritzker, Lisa Pritzker, Carl Zlatchin Profit, Qualified CPUC Decom Master TR, RWB, Irving Rabin, Varda Rabin, Rabin Worldwide, Inc., Nancy D. Ramage, Gelert R. Ramage, Jr., Robert Ramsey, Javad Rassouli, Remdel Brothers, Daniel H. Renberg, Carol Rhoads, S Keating Rhoads, Enzo S. Ricciardelli, Roman Catholic Archbishop LA, Claude Rosenberg, Louise Rosenberg, SA Funds Investment Trust, SC Edison Nuclear Facilities, SDG&E Qualified Nuclear Decom, Sacramento County Emp Ret System, Sacramento County Ret Association, San Pasqual Fiduciary Trust Co., Joanne Desherow Sanger, Mark I. Seiden, Susan H. Shane, Bernard Shapiro, Rena Shapiro, Southern California UFCWU & FE Joint Pension Trust Fund, Starbuck, Tisdale & Associates, State of California - Mid Cap Value, State of California, Department of Personnel Administration, Savings Plus Plan, Randy Steiner(an individual), Douglas B. Stewart, John W. Stewart II, William Stinehart Jr.(individually and as a Trustee of Chandler Trust No. 1 and Chandler Trust No. 2), William Stinehart Jr.(an individual), Kevin Stone, Vern M. Strickler, T.Rowe Price, Lori Ann Talarico, Teamsters Separate Account, The Whittier Trust Company, William F. Thomas, Alfred V. Tjarks, Alfred V. Tjarks Jr., Transamerica Partners Mid Cap Value, Transamerica Partners Mid Cap Value F/K/A Div. Investors Portfolios, Union Bank of California N.A.,, Catherine A. Verdusco, Lolita K. Wagner, Water and Power Employee's Ret. Disab. & Death Benefit Ins. Plan, Laurie H. Weaver, Judy C. Webb, Wedbush Morgan Securities, Inc., Will K. Weinstein, Nicholas H. Werthman, Warren B. Williamson, Diane Buchanan Wilsey, Peter A. Young, Biying Zhang, Betty K Zlatchin, zoological Society of San Diego, a California. Filed byDeutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 8/24/2011)
August 24, 2011 Filing 184 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Julia Ingrid DeBeers for Some Defendants and [Proposed] Order (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 8/24/2011)
August 24, 2011 Filing 183 STIPULATION Between Plaintiffs and Defendant Lawrence H. Burks Permitting Plaintiffs to File a First Amended Complaint by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 8/24/2011)
August 23, 2011 Filing 189 NOTICE of Appearance filed by Nancy D. Ramage (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2011) (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
August 23, 2011 Filing 182 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc Jeffrey Schneider on behalf of Vern M. Strickler (Schneider, Marc) (Filed on 8/23/2011)
August 23, 2011 Filing 181 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc Jeffrey Schneider on behalf of William Kaszton, Individually and as Trustee of UAD 10/23/97 by Kaszton Family Trust (Schneider, Marc) (Filed on 8/23/2011)
August 23, 2011 Filing 180 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc Jeffrey Schneider on behalf of Patricia Kaszton, Individually and as a Trustee UAD 10/23/97 by Kaszton Family Trust (Schneider, Marc) (Filed on 8/23/2011)
August 17, 2011 Filing 179 NOTICE of Appearance by Pamela Koslyn (Koslyn, Pamela) (Filed on 8/17/2011)
August 17, 2011 Filing 178 NOTICE by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company OF FILING OF MOTION TO TRANSFER BEFORE THE JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION (Attachments: #1 Motion to Transfer, #2 Brief in Support of Motion to Transfer, #3 Declaration of David M. Zensky, #4 Schedule of Actions, #5 Certificate/Proof of Service)(DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 8/17/2011)
August 15, 2011 Filing 177 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremiah Tracy Reynolds and Dale Kinsella of Kinsella Weitzman Iser Kump & Aldisert LLP (Reynolds, Jeremiah) (Filed on 8/15/2011)
August 12, 2011 Filing 176 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company re #175 Order on Motion to Stay (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 8/12/2011)
August 12, 2011 ***Deadlines terminated pursuant to #175 Order on Motion to Stay. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2011)
August 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 175 REVISED ORDER RE PLAINTIFFS' REVISED MOTION FOR STAY AS FURTHER MODIFIED BY THE COURT by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #81 Motion to Stay (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2011)
August 10, 2011 Filing 174 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. John W. Stewart II served on 7/24/2011, answer due 8/15/2011. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 8/10/2011)
August 10, 2011 Filing 173 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Herbert G. Lau Profit Sharing QRP Participation served on 7/21/2011, answer due 8/11/2011. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 8/10/2011)
August 10, 2011 Filing 172 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Diane Buchanan Wilsey served on 7/28/2011, answer due 8/18/2011. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 8/10/2011)
August 10, 2011 Filing 171 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Joanne Desherow Sanger served on 6/19/2011, answer due 7/11/2011; Lolita K. Wagner served on 6/19/2011, answer due 7/11/2011. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 8/10/2011)
August 9, 2011 Filing 170 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Richard S. Arnold served on 6/20/2011, answer due 7/11/2011; Betty Beaird served on 6/20/2011, answer due 7/11/2011; Florence S. Bradshaw served on 6/20/2011, answer due 7/11/2011; George William Buck served on 6/20/2011, answer due 7/11/2011; California Ironworkers Field Pension Trust served on 6/20/2011, answer due 7/11/2011; Camilla Chandler Family Foundation served on 6/20/2011, answer due 7/11/2011; Stephen D. Carver served on 6/20/2011, answer due 7/11/2011; Frances L. Cey served on 6/20/2011, answer due 7/11/2011; Ronald C. Cey served on 6/20/2011, answer due 7/11/2011; Chandis Securities Company served on 6/20/2011, answer due 7/11/2011; Doheney Eye Institute served on 6/20/2011, answer due 7/11/2011; Lucile M. Dunn served on 6/20/2011, answer due 7/11/2011; James A. Friedberg served on 6/20/2011, answer due 7/11/2011; Thomas F. Friedberg served on 6/20/2011, answer due 7/11/2011; Camilla Chandler Frost served on 6/20/2011, answer due 7/11/2011; Rodolfo V. Gil served on 6/20/2011, answer due 7/11/2011; Karen Hammond served on 6/20/2011, answer due 7/11/2011; Paul Theodore Hammond served on 6/20/2011, answer due 7/11/2011; Danica F. Hughes served on 6/20/2011, answer due 7/11/2011; Mark A. Hughes served on 6/20/2011, answer due 7/11/2011; Mark Allen Itkin served on 6/20/2011, answer due 7/11/2011; Durham J. Monsma served on 6/20/2011, answer due 7/11/2011; Robbie E. Monsma served on 6/20/2011, answer due 7/11/2011; Barbro Osher served on 6/20/2011, answer due 7/11/2011; Bernard Osher served on 6/20/2011, answer due 7/11/2011; Miriam A. Pawel served on 6/20/2011, answer due 7/11/2011; San Pasqual Fiduciary Trust Co. served on 6/20/2011, answer due 7/11/2011; Warren B. Williamson served on 6/20/2011, answer due 7/11/2011. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 8/9/2011)
August 5, 2011 Filing 169 NOTICE of Appearance by Walter J.R. Traver for Def. Bank of the West (Traver, Walter) (Filed on 8/5/2011)
August 4, 2011 Filing 168 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Nancy Ramage to Respond to Complaint (Local Rule 6-1(a)) by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 8/4/2011)
August 3, 2011 Filing 167 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Jacqueline E. Autry served on 7/6/2011, answer due 7/27/2011; Leonard F. Hill served on 7/6/2011, answer due 7/27/2011. Janice Fay Johnson served on 7/6/2011, answer due 7/27/2011. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 8/3/2011)
August 3, 2011 Filing 166 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Debra A. Gastler served on 7/5/2011, answer due 7/26/2011. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 8/3/2011)
August 3, 2011 Filing 165 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Charley Chunyu Lu served on 7/2/2011, answer due 7/25/2011; Nancy L. Mac Donald served on 7/2/2011, answer due 7/25/2011; Biying Zhang served on 7/2/2011, answer due 7/25/2011. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 8/3/2011)
August 3, 2011 Filing 164 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Melissa Ma served on 6/29/2011, answer due 7/20/2011; Omers Pension Fund served on 6/29/2011, answer due 7/20/2011; Carl Zlatchin Profit served on 6/29/2011, answer due 7/20/2011; Irving Rabin served on 6/29/2011, answer due 7/20/2011; Varda Rabin served on 6/29/2011, answer due 7/20/2011; Rabin Worldwide, Inc. served on 6/29/2011, answer due 7/20/2011; Claude Rosenberg served on 6/29/2011, answer due 7/20/2011; Louise Rosenberg served on 6/29/2011, answer due 7/20/2011; Bernard Shapiro served on 6/29/2011, answer due 7/20/2011; Rena Shapiro served on 6/29/2011, answer due 7/20/2011; Lori Ann Talarico served on 6/29/2011, answer due 7/20/2011; Betty K Zlatchin served on 6/29/2011, answer due 7/20/2011. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 8/3/2011)
August 3, 2011 Filing 163 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Board of Trustees of Leland Stanford Jr University served on 6/28/2011, answer due 7/19/2011; Nancy Lobdell served on 6/28/2011, answer due 7/19/2011; Mary Kathleen McNulty served on 6/28/2011, answer due 7/19/2011; John Pritzker served on 6/28/2011, answer due 7/19/2011; Lisa Pritzker served on 6/28/2011, answer due 7/19/2011; Catherine A. Verdusco served on 6/28/2011, answer due 7/19/2011. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 8/3/2011)
August 3, 2011 Filing 162 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Trust Company. Antoinette B. Brumbaugh served on 6/27/2011, answer due 7/18/2011; Catholic Healthcare West CHW served on 6/27/2011, answer due 7/18/2011; Melissa A Monson served on 6/27/2011, answer due 7/18/2011; Kevin Stone served on 6/27/2011, answer due 7/18/2011. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 8/3/2011)
August 3, 2011 Filing 161 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. William J. Bell served on 6/24/2011, answer due 7/15/2011; Eric I. Chang served on 6/24/2011, answer due 7/15/2011; Warren J. Eide served on 6/24/2011, answer due 7/15/2011; Joseph M. Fee served on 6/24/2011, answer due 7/15/2011; Despina Haigler served on 6/24/2011, answer due 7/15/2011; Richard Haigler served on 6/24/2011, answer due 7/15/2011; RWB served on 6/24/2011, answer due 7/15/2011; Daniel H. Renberg served on 6/24/2011, answer due 7/15/2011; Mark I. Seiden served on 6/24/2011, answer due 7/15/2011; Susan H. Shane served on 6/24/2011, answer due 7/15/2011. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 8/3/2011)
August 3, 2011 Filing 160 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Betty Ann Altman served on 6/23/2011, answer due 7/14/2011; John M. Altman served on 6/23/2011, answer due 7/14/2011; Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund served on 6/23/2011, answer due 7/14/2011; Quinn Martin Dolan served on 6/23/2011, answer due 7/14/2011; First Republic Bank served on 6/23/2011, answer due 7/14/2011; John E. Flick served on 6/23/2011, answer due 7/14/2011; Lois L. Flick served on 6/23/2011, answer due 7/14/2011; Helen Grossman served on 6/23/2011, answer due 7/14/2011; Kaiser Foundation Health served on 6/23/2011, answer due 7/14/2011; Kaiser Foundation Health Plans and Hospital served on 6/23/2011, answer due 7/14/2011; Kaiser Foundation Hospitals served on 6/23/2011, answer due 7/14/2011; Joe Youssry Kelada served on 6/23/2011, answer due 7/14/2011; Sacramento County Emp Ret System served on 6/23/2011, answer due 7/14/2011; Sacramento County Ret Association served on 6/23/2011, answer due 7/14/2011; Starbuck, Tisdale & Associates served on 6/23/2011, answer due 7/14/2011; State of California - Mid Cap Value served on 6/23/2011, answer due 7/14/2011; Douglas B. Stewart served on 6/23/2011, answer due 7/14/2011; Laurie H. Weaver served on 6/23/2011, answer due 7/14/2011. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 8/3/2011)
August 3, 2011 Filing 159 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Carol Askin served on 6/22/2011, answer due 7/13/2011; Richard Askin served on 6/22/2011, answer due 7/13/2011; Sharron R. Beard served on 6/22/2011, answer due 7/13/2011; Spencer W. Beard served on 6/22/2011, answer due 7/13/2011; Herbert Anthony Clark, Jr. served on 6/22/2011, answer due 7/13/2011. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 8/3/2011)
August 2, 2011 Filing 158 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Derek M. Dalton served on 6/21/2011, answer due 7/12/2011; Karen E. Dalton served on 6/21/2011, answer due 7/12/2011; Mark Domas served on 6/21/2011, answer due 7/12/2011; Michael W. Dunaway served on 6/21/2011, answer due 7/12/2011; Trudy V. Dunaway served on 6/21/2011, answer due 7/12/2011; Everything Medical, Inc. served on 6/21/2011, answer due 7/12/2011; Jonathan Gary Keith served on 6/21/2011, answer due 7/12/2011; Marlowe G. Merkel served on 6/21/2011, answer due 7/12/2011; Carol Rhoads served on 6/21/2011, answer due 7/12/2011; S Keating Rhoads served on 6/21/2011, answer due 7/12/2011. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 8/2/2011)
August 2, 2011 Filing 157 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Jill E. Berube served on 6/18/2011, answer due 7/11/2011; Robert J. Brookes served on 6/18/2011, answer due 7/11/2011; James H. Eckhouse served on 6/18/2011, answer due 7/11/2011; Jill E. Eckhouse served on 6/18/2011, answer due 7/11/2011; Ynez Viole O'Neill served on 6/18/2011, answer due 7/11/2011. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 8/2/2011)
August 2, 2011 Filing 156 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Lawrence H Burks served on 6/17/2011, answer due 7/8/2011; Patricia Kaszton served on 6/17/2011, answer due 7/8/2011; William Kaszton served on 6/17/2011, answer due 7/8/2011; George J. Peckham served on 6/17/2011, answer due 7/8/2011; Imogene S. Peckham served on 6/17/2011, answer due 7/8/2011; Southern California UFCWU & FE Joint Pension Trust Fund served on 6/17/2011, answer due 7/8/2011; Vern M. Strickler served on 6/17/2011, answer due 7/8/2011; T.Rowe Price served on 6/17/2011, answer due 7/8/2011. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 8/2/2011)
August 2, 2011 Filing 155 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Jeffrey J. Appleby served on 6/16/2011, answer due 7/7/2011; Archdiocese of Los Angeles served on 6/16/2011, answer due 7/7/2011; Archdiocese of Los Angeles Lay Employee Pension Plan served on 6/16/2011, answer due 7/7/2011; Bank of The West served on 6/16/2011, answer due 7/7/2011; Donald Baron served on 6/16/2011, answer due 7/7/2011; Irene Baron served on 6/16/2011, answer due 7/7/2011; Charles Schwab & Co., Inc served on 6/16/2011, answer due 7/7/2011; Crowell Weedon & Co. served on 6/16/2011, answer due 7/7/2011; Directors Guild of America served on 6/16/2011, answer due 7/7/2011; Directors Guild of America Producer Pension Trust served on 6/16/2011, answer due 7/7/2011; Verna R. Harrah served on 6/16/2011, answer due 7/7/2011; Los Angeles Department of Water and Power Employees Retirement Plan-LCV served on 6/16/2011, answer due 7/7/2011; Monumental Life Insurance Company served on 6/16/2011, answer due 7/7/2011; Robert D. Nelson served on 6/16/2011, answer due 7/7/2011; Michael Plonski served on 6/16/2011, answer due 7/7/2011; Nedra Plonski served on 6/16/2011, answer due 7/7/2011; Roman Catholic Archbishop LA served on 6/16/2011, answer due 7/7/2011; SDG&E Qualified Nuclear Decom served on 6/16/2011, answer due 7/7/2011; Randy Steiner(an individual) served on 6/16/2011, answer due 7/7/2011; Water and Power Employee's Ret. Disab. & Death Benefit Ins. Plan served on 6/16/2011, answer due 7/7/2011; Wedbush Morgan Securities, Inc. served on 6/16/2011, answer due 7/7/2011; zoological Society of San Diego, a California served on 6/16/2011, answer due 7/7/2011. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 8/2/2011)
August 2, 2011 Filing 154 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company, SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Bernadette Fingleton served on 6/15/2011, answer due 7/6/2011; Iris B. Mahoney served on 6/15/2011, answer due 7/6/2011; Paul M. Mahoney(individually and as a Trustee of the Iris B. Mahoney REV TR U/A/D 04/10/98) served on 6/15/2011, answer due 7/6/2011; Paul M. Mahoney(individually and as a Trustee of U/W/O Paul P Mahoney DTD 12/28/1978) served on 6/15/2011, answer due 7/6/2011; Renee H. Miller served on 6/15/2011, answer due 7/6/2011; Qualified CPUC Decom Master TR served on 6/15/2011, answer due 7/6/2011; SC Edison Nuclear Facilities served on 6/15/2011, answer due 7/6/2011. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 8/2/2011)
August 2, 2011 Filing 153 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Whittier Trust Company to Respond to Complaint (Local Rule 6-1(a)) by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 8/2/2011)
August 2, 2011 Filing 152 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by Lori Ann Talarico. (Bergman, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/2/2011)
July 29, 2011 Filing 151 RESPONSE (re #81 MOTION to Stay [Revised] Defendants' Time to Respond to the Complaint in this Action or Commence Motions Practice, Until the Earlier of (1) October 31, 2011, or (2) Confirmation of a Plan of Reorganization by the United States Bankruptcy Court ) filed by Lawrence H Burks. (Hinds, James) (Filed on 7/29/2011) Modified on 8/1/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
July 29, 2011 Filing 150 Statement of Non-Opposition re #81 MOTION to Stay [Revised] Defendants' Time to Respond to the Complaint in this Action or Commence Motions Practice, Until the Earlier of (1) October 31, 2011, or (2) Confirmation of a Plan of Reorganization by the United States Bankruptcy Court) filed by Joseph M. Fee. (Related document(s) #81 ) (Lamprey, Wayne) (Filed on 7/29/2011) Modified on 8/1/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
July 29, 2011 Filing 149 REPLY (re #81 MOTION to Stay [Revised] Defendants' Time to Respond to the Complaint in this Action or Commence Motions Practice, Until the Earlier of (1) October 31, 2011, or (2) Confirmation of a Plan of Reorganization by the United States Bankruptcy Court ) filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David M. Zensky, #2 Proposed Order [Revised] Re Plaintiffs' Revised Motion to Stay, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 7/29/2011) Modified on 8/1/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/1/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
July 28, 2011 Filing 148 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Javad Rassouli served on 7/18/2011, answer due 8/8/2011. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 7/28/2011)
July 28, 2011 Filing 147 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Nancy D. Ramage served on 7/14/2011, answer due 8/4/2011; Enzo S. Ricciardelli served on 7/14/2011, answer due 8/4/2011. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 7/28/2011)
July 28, 2011 Filing 146 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Carpenters Pension Trust for Northern California served on 6/30/2011, answer due 7/21/2011; PG&E Postretirment Medical Plan TR served on 6/30/2011, answer due 7/21/2011; Will K. Weinstein served on 6/30/2011, answer due 7/21/2011. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 7/28/2011)
July 28, 2011 Filing 145 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Virginia Lanfranki served on 6/26/2011, answer due 7/18/2011. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 7/28/2011)
July 28, 2011 Filing 144 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Eric Morris served on 6/25/2011, answer due 7/18/2011; Nicholas H. Werthman served on 6/25/2011, answer due 7/18/2011. Shannon Morris served on 6/25/11, answer due 7/18/2011 (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 7/28/2011)
July 28, 2011 Filing 143 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. The Whittier Trust Company served on 6/14/2011, answer due 7/5/2011. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 7/28/2011)
July 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE DEADLINE ON PLAINTIFFS' REPLY TO THE ESTATE OF ROBERT D. NELSON'S OPPOSITION TO STAY MOTION TO JULY 29, 2011 re #139 Stipulation, filed by Wilmington Trust Company, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 7/28/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2011)
July 27, 2011 Filing 141 STIPULATION [Amended to Correct Pleading Caption] Stipulation to Extend Defendant Kaiser Foundation Health Plan's Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Kaiser Foundation Health Plans and Hospital. (Anderson, David) (Filed on 7/27/2011)
July 27, 2011 Filing 140 STIPULATION Extending Time for Defendant Kaiser Foundation Health Plan to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Kaiser Foundation Health Plans and Hospital. (Anderson, David) (Filed on 7/27/2011)
July 27, 2011 Filing 139 STIPULATION to Continue Deadline on Plaintiffs' Reply to The Estate of Robert D. Nelson's Opposition to Stay Motion to July 29, 2011 by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 7/27/2011)
July 26, 2011 Filing 138 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Paul Theodore Hammond as a Trustee of U/A/D 02/11/88 FBO Hammond Family Trust, to Respond to Complaint (Local Rule 6-1(a)) by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 7/26/2011)
July 26, 2011 Filing 137 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Lucile Dunn to Respond to Complaint (Local Rule 6-1(a)) by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 7/26/2011)
July 26, 2011 Filing 136 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Crowell Weedon & Co. to Respond to Complaint (Local Rule 6-1(a)) by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 7/26/2011)
July 25, 2011 Filing 135 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Ynez Viole O'Neill. (Kim, Laura) (Filed on 7/25/2011)
July 25, 2011 Filing 134 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Betty Beaird. (Kim, Laura) (Filed on 7/25/2011)
July 22, 2011 Filing 133 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR HERBERT ANTHONY CLARK, JR TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT WITH PROOF OF SERVICE by Herbert Anthony Clark, Jr.. (Curtis, Greta) (Filed on 7/22/2011)
July 22, 2011 Filing 132 RESPONSE (re #81 MOTION to Stay [Revised] Defendants' Time to Respond to the Complaint in this Action or Commence Motions Practice, Until the Earlier of (1) October 31, 2011, or (2) Confirmation of a Plan of Reorganization by the United States Bankruptcy Court ) filed by PG&E Postretirment Medical Plan TR. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Michael A. Firestein in Support of Response, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Firestein Decl. (SLCFC Order), #3 Exhibit Exhibit B to Firestein Decl. (July 15 Transcript))(Firestein, Michael) (Filed on 7/22/2011) Modified on 7/25/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
July 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #126 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Jeffrey Bergman. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2011)
July 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #125 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Mitchell Hurley. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2011)
July 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #124 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Katherine P. Scully. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2011)
July 22, 2011 Filing 128 RESPONSE (re #81 MOTION to Stay [Revised] Defendants' Time to Respond to the Complaint in this Action or Commence Motions Practice, Until the Earlier of (1) October 31, 2011, or (2) Confirmation of a Plan of Reorganization by the United States Bankruptcy Court ) filed by Carpenters Pension Trust for Northern California. (Kirchner, Donna) (Filed on 7/22/2011) Modified on 7/25/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
July 21, 2011 Filing 127 STIPULATION to Extend Time for PG&E Postretirement Medical Plan Trust to Respond to Complaint by PG&E Postretirment Medical Plan TR. (Firestein, Michael) (Filed on 7/21/2011)
July 21, 2011 Filing 123 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendants Irving Rabin, Varda Rabin, and Rabin Worldwide, Inc. to Respond to Complaint by Irving Rabin, Varda Rabin, Rabin Worldwide, Inc.. (Lee, David) (Filed on 7/21/2011)
July 20, 2011 Filing 126 MOTION of Jeffrey H. Bergman for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 44611007305.) filed by Melissa A Monson, Barbro Osher, Bernard Osher, Kevin Stone. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2011)
July 20, 2011 Filing 125 MOTION of Mitchell Hurley for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 44611007303.) filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2011)
July 20, 2011 Filing 124 MOTION of Katherine P. Scully for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 44611007303.) filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2011)
July 20, 2011 Filing 122 STIPULATION to Extend Time for James A. Friedberg and Thomas F. Friedberg to Respond to Complaint (Local Rule 6-1(a)) by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 7/20/2011)
July 20, 2011 Filing 121 RESPONSE (re #81 MOTION to Stay [Revised] Defendants' Time to Respond to the Complaint in this Action or Commence Motions Practice, Until the Earlier of (1) October 31, 2011, or (2) Confirmation of a Plan of Reorganization by the United States Bankruptcy Court ) filed by Estate of Robert D. Nelson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of William C. Pultz, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Giacinti, Philip) (Filed on 7/20/2011) Modified on 7/20/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
July 20, 2011 Filing 120 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by George J. Peckham, Imogene S. Peckham. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 7/20/2011)
July 20, 2011 Filing 119 STIPULATION to Extend Time for George Peckham to Respond to Complaint (Local Rule 6-1(a)) by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 7/20/2011)
July 19, 2011 Filing 118 STIPULATION to Extend Time for George William Buck, Individually and as Trustee of UTA Charles Schwab & Co. Inc. SEP-IRA DTD 4/8/93 to Respond to Complaint (Local Rule 6-1(a)) by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 7/19/2011)
July 19, 2011 Filing 117 CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Laurie H. Weaver.. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 7/19/2011)
July 19, 2011 Filing 116 NOTICE of Appearance by Donna Lynn Kirchner and George M. Kraw (Kirchner, Donna) (Filed on 7/19/2011)
July 18, 2011 Filing 115 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Melissa Monson, Kevin Stone, Bernard Osher, and Barbro Osher to Respond to Complaint by Melissa A Monson, Barbro Osher, Bernard Osher, Kevin Stone. (Lee, David) (Filed on 7/18/2011)
July 18, 2011 Filing 114 See document #115 for corrected entry.STIPULATION to Extend Time for Melissa Monson, Kevin Stone, Bernard Osher, and Barbro Osher to Respond to Complaint by Melissa A Monson. (Lee, David) (Filed on 7/18/2011) Modified on 7/19/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
July 18, 2011 Filing 113 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Imogene S. Peckham to Respond to Complaint by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 7/18/2011)
July 15, 2011 Filing 112 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendant Steven D. Carver to Respond to the Complaint in this Action (Local Rule 6-1(A)) by Stephen D. Carver. (Zamora, Daniel) (Filed on 7/15/2011)
July 15, 2011 Filing 110 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Debra Gastler to Respond to Complaint (Local Rule 6-1(a)) by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 7/15/2011)
July 15, 2011 Filing 109 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Catholic Healthcare West to Respond to Complaint (Local Rule 6-1(a)) by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 7/15/2011)
July 14, 2011 Filing 108 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Omers Pension Fund re #106 Stipulation to Extend Time for Omers/AACP Investors II, L.P. (Sued Herein as "OMERS Pension Fund") (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 7/14/2011)
July 14, 2011 Filing 107 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Melissa Ma re #105 Stipulation To Extend Time for Melisssa Ma to Respond to Complaint (Local Rule 6-1(a)) (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 7/14/2011)
July 14, 2011 Filing 106 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR OMERS/AACP INVESTORS II, L.P. (SUED HEREIN AS "OMERS PENSION FUND") TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT (Local Rule 6-1(a)) by Omers Pension Fund. (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 7/14/2011)
July 14, 2011 Filing 105 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR MELISSA MA TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT (Local Rule 6-1(a)) by Melissa Ma. (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 7/14/2011)
July 14, 2011 Filing 104 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendant Florence S. Bradshaw to Respond to Complaint by Florence S. Bradshaw. (Poindexter, James) (Filed on 7/14/2011)
July 14, 2011 Filing 103 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen Cahill Slaught (Slaught, Kathleen) (Filed on 7/14/2011)
July 14, 2011 Filing 102 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR SA FUNDS INVESTMENT TRUST TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT (L.R. 6-1(a)) by SA Funds Investment Trust. (Quiroz, Claudia) (Filed on 7/14/2011)
July 14, 2011 Filing 101 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by Joseph M. Fee. (Lamprey, Wayne) (Filed on 7/14/2011)
July 14, 2011 Filing 100 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Virginia Lanfranki to Respond to Complaint by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 7/14/2011)
July 13, 2011 Filing 111 ANSWER to Complaint byDespina Haigler, Richard Haigler. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2011)
July 13, 2011 Filing 99 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Service waived by Jeffrey Chandler waiver sent on 6/29/2011, answer due 8/29/2011. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 7/13/2011)
July 13, 2011 Filing 98 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Service waived by Judy C. Webb waiver sent on 6/29/2011, answer due 8/29/2011. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 7/13/2011)
July 13, 2011 Filing 97 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Service waived by Susan Babcock waiver sent on 6/29/2011, answer due 8/29/2011. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 7/13/2011)
July 13, 2011 Filing 96 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Service waived by Roger Goodan waiver sent on 6/29/2011, answer due 8/29/2011. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 7/13/2011)
July 13, 2011 Filing 95 STIPULATION to Extend Time for S. Keating Rhoads and Carol Rhoads to Respond to Complaint by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 7/13/2011)
July 13, 2011 Filing 94 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendant Carpenters Pension Trust Fund for Northern California to Respond to Complaint by Carpenters Pension Trust for Northern California. (Kirchner, Donna) (Filed on 7/13/2011)
July 13, 2011 Filing 92 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by State of California, Department of Personnel Administration, Savings Plus Plan. (Javid, Arman) (Filed on 7/13/2011)
July 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/10/2011. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/17/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 7/13/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2011)
July 12, 2011 Filing 93 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 90 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Sharron R. Beard to Respond to Complaint (Local Rule 6-1(a)) by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 89 STIPULATION To Extend Time For Defendant William Kaszton To Repond To Complaint by William Kaszton. (Schneider, Marc) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 88 STIPULATION To Extend Time For Defendant Patricia Kaszton To Respond To Complaint by Patricia Kaszton. (Schneider, Marc) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 87 STIPULATION To Extend Time for Defendant Vern M. Strickler To Respond to Complaint by Vern M. Strickler. (Schneider, Marc) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 86 CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by California Ironworkers Field Pension Trust.. (Libicki, Stuart) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 85 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company re #81 MOTION to Stay [Revised] Defendants' Time to Respond to the Complaint in this Action or Commence Motions Practice, Until the Earlier of (1) October 31, 2011, or (2) Confirmation of a Plan of Reorganization by the United States Bankruptcy Court MOTION to Stay [Revised] Defendants' Time to Respond to the Complaint in this Action or Commence Motions Practice, Until the Earlier of (1) October 31, 2011, or (2) Confirmation of a Plan of Reorganization by the United States Bankruptcy Court MOTION to Stay [Revised] Defendants' Time to Respond to the Complaint in this Action or Commence Motions Practice, Until the Earlier of (1) October 31, 2011, or (2) Confirmation of a Plan of Reorganization by the United States Bankruptcy Court MOTION to Stay [Revised] Defendants' Time to Respond to the Complaint in this Action or Commence Motions Practice, Until the Earlier of (1) October 31, 2011, or (2) Confirmation of a Plan of Reorganization by the United States Bankruptcy Court (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 84 Duplicate of document #83 . Please Disregard.STIPULATION re #83 Stipulation VERDUSCO IS INCLUDED IN STIPULATION WITH JEFFREY J. APPLEBY by Catherine A. Verdusco. (Klein, Michael) (Filed on 7/11/2011) Modified on 7/11/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
July 11, 2011 Filing 83 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR JEFFREY J. APPLEBY AND CATHERINE A. VERDUSCO TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Jeffrey J. Appleby Catherine A. Verdusco. (Klein, Michael) (Filed on 7/11/2011) Modified on 7/11/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
July 11, 2011 Filing 82 STIPULATION to Extend Time For Monumental Life Insurance Company to Respond to Complaint (Local Rule 6-1(a)) by Monumental Life Insurance Company. (Graham, Douglas) (Filed on 7/11/2011) Modified on 7/11/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
July 8, 2011 Filing 81 MOTION to Stay [Revised] Defendants' Time to Respond to the Complaint in this Action or Commence Motions Practice, Until the Earlier of (1) October 31, 2011, or (2) Confirmation of a Plan of Reorganization by the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware, or (3) Further Order of the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware or This Court; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support thereof filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Motion Hearing set for 8/24/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Responses due by 7/22/2011. Replies due by 7/29/2011. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of David Zensky, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Proposed Order Re Plaintiffs' Revised Motion to Stay)(DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
July 8, 2011 Filing 80 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Stay (Docket No. 38) and Re-Filing of Revised Motion to Stay (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
July 8, 2011 Filing 79 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Nancy Lobdell to Respond to Complaint (Local Rule 6-1(a)) by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
July 8, 2011 Filing 78 STIPULATION to Extend Time for William F. Thomas, Jr. to Respond to Complaint (Local Rule 6-1(a)) by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
July 8, 2011 Filing 77 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Ronald C. Cey & Frances L. Cey, as Trustees of the Cey Living Trust, to Respond to Complaint (Local Rule 6-1(a)) by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
July 8, 2011 Filing 76 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT (Local Rule 6-1(a)) by zoological Society of San Diego, a California. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(DeLaCruz, Alfred) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
July 8, 2011 Filing 75 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. to Respond to Complaint by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
July 8, 2011 Filing 74 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Lawrence H Burks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hinds, James) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
July 8, 2011 Filing 73 Certificate of Interested Entities by Lawrence H Burks (Hinds, James) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
July 8, 2011 Filing 72 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Lawrence H Burks. (Hinds, James) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
July 8, 2011 Filing 71 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand - Separate byLawrence H Burks. (Hinds, James) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
July 7, 2011 Filing 70 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendant Directors Guild of America Pension Trust to Respond to Complaint (Local Rule 6-1(a)) by Directors Guild of America Producer Pension Trust. (Meer, Jonathan) (Filed on 7/7/2011)
July 7, 2011 Filing 69 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Directors Guild of America to Respond to Complaint by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 7/7/2011)
July 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 7/7/11. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2011)
July 7, 2011 Filing 67 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Verna Harrah, individually and as Trustee of the Verna Harrah Trust Special Account DTD 9/5/86 to Respond to Complaint by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 7/7/2011)
July 7, 2011 Filing 66 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Michael Plonski and Nedra Plonski to Respond to Complaint by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Michael Plonski, Nedra Plonski, Wilmington Trust Company. (Cisz, Louis) (Filed on 7/7/2011) Modified on 7/8/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
July 7, 2011 Filing 65 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendants San Pasqual Fiduciary Trust Company and Richard Arnold to Respond to Complaint by San Pasqual Fiduciary Trust Co.. (Poindexter, James) (Filed on 7/7/2011)
July 7, 2011 Filing 64 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESOND TO COMPLAINT by Richard Askin. (Kohlbrand, Richard) (Filed on 7/7/2011)
July 7, 2011 Filing 63 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Carol Askin. (Kohlbrand, Richard) (Filed on 7/7/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 62 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Warren Eide to Respond to Complaint by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 61 STIPULATION to Extend Time for JOANNE DESHEROW SANGER, individually and as a Trustee of the U/A DTA 03/29/04 Joanne Desherow Sanger LIV TR to Respond to Complaint by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 60 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Robert J. Brookes to Respond to Complaint by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 59 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Durham Monsma and Robbie Monsma to Respond to Complaint by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 58 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by California Ironworkers Field Pension Trust. (Libicki, Stuart) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 57 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Southern California UFCWU & FE Joint Pension Trust Fund. (Libicki, Stuart) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 56 STIPULATION To Extend Time For First Republic Bank to Respond to Complaint by First Republic Bank. (Schneider, Walter) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 55 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by John E. Flick, Lois L. Flick. (Attachments: #1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations))(Condren, Alan) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 54 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (Attachments: #1 Cert Serve) (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 ***Deadlines terminated. Initial CMC date of 9/9 before Judge Spero and 8/12 Motion hearing date. NOTE: Response and Replies to Motion to Stay are not terminated and are still in effect. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 5, 2011 Filing 53 Received Stipulation to Extend Time for Marlowe G. Merkel to Respond to Complaint by Marlowe G. Merkel. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2011)
July 5, 2011 Filing 52 STIPULATION to Extend for Mark A. Hughes and Danica F. Hughes to Respond to Complaint by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 7/5/2011)
July 5, 2011 Filing 51 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendant Bank of the West to Respond to Complaint by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 7/5/2011)
July 5, 2011 Filing 50 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by SDG&E Qualified Nuclear Decom. (Clorfeine, Sabina) (Filed on 7/5/2011)
July 5, 2011 Filing 49 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Bernard Shapiro, individually and as a Trustee of FBO Bernard and Rena Shapiro Intervivos Trust A/C #1 DTD 10/15/87 and Rena Shapiro, individually and as a Trustee of FBO Bernard and Rena Shapiro Intervivos Trust A/C DTD 10/15/87 to Response to Complaint by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 7/5/2011)
July 5, 2011 Filing 48 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Service waived by William Stinehart Jr.(individually and as a Trustee of Chandler Trust No. 1 and Chandler Trust No. 2) waiver sent on 6/24/2011, answer due 8/23/2011; William Stinehart Jr.(an individual) waiver sent on 6/24/2011, answer due 8/23/2011. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Authorized Agent to Accept Service of Summons & Complaint)(DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 7/5/2011)
July 5, 2011 Filing 47 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company re #46 Clerks Notice,, Re Consent to Jurisdiction of United States Magistrate Judge (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 7/5/2011)
July 5, 2011 Filing 46 CLERKS NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT TO JURISDICTION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE.. Accordingly, the parties are instructed to sign and file the enclosed consent or declination form within seven (7) calendar days of the date of this notice, indicating whether they consent to the jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge in this matter.If the parties do not consent, the case will be randomly assigned to a District Judge of this court. (Attachments: #1 Cert Serve) (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2011)
June 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER re #36 Stipulation To Extend Time for Rodolfo V. Gil to Respond to Complaint filed by Wilmington Trust Company, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 6/30/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2011)
June 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER re #35 Stipulation To Extend Time for Quinn Martin Dolan to Respond to Complaint filed by Wilmington Trust Company, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 6/30/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2011)
June 30, 2011 Filing 43 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company re #38 MOTION to Stay Defendants Time to Respond to the Complaint in this Action or Commence Motions Practice, until the Earlier of (1) December 31, 2011, or (2) Modification by the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware of Its Existi MOTION to Stay Defendants Time to Respond to the Complaint in this Action or Commence Motions Practice, until the Earlier of (1) December 31, 2011, or (2) Modification by the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware of Its Existi MOTION to Stay Defendants Time to Respond to the Complaint in this Action or Commence Motions Practice, until the Earlier of (1) December 31, 2011, or (2) Modification by the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware of Its Existi MOTION to Stay Defendants Time to Respond to the Complaint in this Action or Commence Motions Practice, until the Earlier of (1) December 31, 2011, or (2) Modification by the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware of Its Existi (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 6/30/2011)
June 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER re #34 Stipulation To Extend Time for Spencer W. Bear to Respond to Complaint filed by Wilmington Trust Company, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 6/30/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2011)
June 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR DFTS MICHAEL W. DUNAWAY AND TRUDY DUNAWAY TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 6/30/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2011)
June 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER re #30 Stipulation To Extend Time filed by William J. Bell to Respond to Complaint. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 6/29/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2011)
June 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER re #29 Stipulation To Extend Time filed by SDG&E Qualified Nuclear Decom to Respond to Complaint. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 6/29/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2011)
June 29, 2011 Filing 38 MOTION to Stay Defendants Time to Respond to the Complaint in this Action or Commence Motions Practice, until the Earlier of (1) December 31, 2011, or (2) Modification by the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware of Its Existing Order Regarding the Need to Stay This Action, or (3) Further Order of This Court; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support thereof filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. Motion Hearing set for 8/12/2011 09:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Responses due by 7/22/2011. Replies due by 7/29/2011. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of David M. Zensky, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Proposed Order Re: Plaintiffs' Motion to Stay)(DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 6/29/2011)
June 29, 2011 Filing 37 CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by William J. Bell.. (Reynolds, Jeremiah) (Filed on 6/29/2011)
June 29, 2011 Filing 36 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR RODOLFO V. GIL TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 6/29/2011)
June 29, 2011 Filing 35 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR QUINN MARTIN DOLAN TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 6/29/2011)
June 29, 2011 Filing 34 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR SPENCER W. BEARD TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 6/29/2011)
June 29, 2011 Filing 33 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by Michael W. Dunaway, Trudy V. Dunaway. (Metzger, Scott) (Filed on 6/29/2011)
June 29, 2011 Filing 32 CLERKS NOTICE To Dft William Bell re: Consent or Declination. Form due 7/13/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2011)
June 29, 2011 Filing 31 CLERKS NOTICE To Dft SDG&E re: Consent or Declination. Form due 7/13/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2011)
June 28, 2011 Filing 30 STIPULATION To Extend Time For William J. Bell to Respond to Complaint (Local Rule 6-1(a)) by William J. Bell. (Reynolds, Jeremiah) (Filed on 6/28/2011)
June 28, 2011 Filing 29 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR SDG&E QUALIFIED NUCLEAR DECOM TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by SDG&E Qualified Nuclear Decom. (Clorfeine, Sabina) (Filed on 6/28/2011)
June 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER re #25 Stipulation To Extend Time for Renee H. Miller To Respond to Complaint filed by Wilmington Trust Company, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 6/28/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2011)
June 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER re #24 Stipulation To Extend Time for Jonathan Gary Keith and Everything Medical Services, Inc., To Respond to Complaint, filed by Wilmington Trust Company, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 6/28/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2011)
June 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR IRIS B. MAHONEY AND PAUL M. MAHONEY TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 6/28/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2011)
June 27, 2011 Filing 25 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR RENEE H. MILLER TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 6/27/2011)
June 27, 2011 Filing 24 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR JONATHAN GARY KEITH AND EVERYTHING MEDICAL SERVICES, INC. TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 6/27/2011)
June 27, 2011 Filing 23 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR IRIS B. MAHONEY AND PAUL M. MAHONEY TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (DeBeers, Julia) (Filed on 6/27/2011)
June 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Order by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero, signed 6/21/11, granting #15 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Angeline Koo.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2011)
June 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Order by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero, signed 6/21/11, granting #14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Jason L. Goldsmith.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2011)
June 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero, signed 6/21/11, granting #13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for James P. Chou.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2011)
June 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero, signed 6/21/11, granting #12 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Stephen M. Baldini.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2011)
June 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero, signed 6/21/11, granting #11 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Daniel H. Golden.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2011)
June 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER, by Judge Joseph C. Spero, signed 6/21/11,granting #10 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for David Zensky. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2011)
June 20, 2011 Filing 16 CLERKS NOTICE To Plaintiff re: Consent or Declination to Proceed before a U.S. Mag. Judge. Form due 7/5/11 (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
June 17, 2011 Filing 15 MOTION for Admission of Attorney Angeline Koo Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 275.00, receipt number 34611061156) filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2011)
June 17, 2011 Filing 14 MOTION for Admission of Attorney Jason L. Goldsmith Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 275.00, receipt number 34611061156) filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2011)
June 17, 2011 Filing 13 MOTION for Admission of Attorney James P. Chou Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 275.00, receipt number 34611061156) filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2011)
June 17, 2011 Filing 12 MOTION for Admission of Attorney Stephen M. Baldini Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 275.00, receipt number 34611061156) filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2011)
June 17, 2011 Filing 11 MOTION for Admission of attorney Daniel H. Golden Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 275.00, receipt number 34611061156) filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2011)
June 17, 2011 Filing 10 MOTION for Admission of Attorney David Zenksky Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 275.00, receipt number 34611061156) filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2011)
June 2, 2011 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (mjj2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2011)
June 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #5 Ex Parte Application (mjj2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2011)
June 2, 2011 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Aegon/Transamerica Series Trust T Rowe Price Equity Income, Betty Ann Altman, John M. Altman, Jeffrey J. Appleby, Archdiocese of Los Angeles, Archdiocese of Los Angeles Lay Employee Pension Plan, Richard S. Arnold, Carol Askin, Richard Askin, Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Jacqueline E. Autry, Susan Babcock, Bank of The West, Donald Baron, Irene Baron, Betty Beaird, Sharron R. Beard, Spencer W. Beard, William J. Bell, Jill E. Berube, Board of Trustees of Leland Stanford Jr University, Florence S. Bradshaw, Sherry Broder(individually and as a Trustee of Sherry P. Broder U/A DTD 1/1/94), Sherry P. Broder(an individual), Robert J. Brookes, Antoinette B. Brumbaugh, George William Buck, Lawrence H Burks, California Ironworkers Field Pension Trust, Camilla Chandler Family Foundation, Carpenters Pension Trust for Northern California, Stephen D. Carver, Catholic Health West CHW, Catholic Healthcare West CHW, Frances L. Cey, Ronald C. Cey, Chandis Securities Company, Jeffrey Chandler, Eric I. Chang, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc, Charley Chunyu Lu & Biying Zhang Commercial Property, City National Bank, Herbert Anthony Clark, Jr., Tommie L. Cordero, Crowell Weedon & Co., Derek M. Dalton, Karen E. Dalton, Directors Guild of America, Directors Guild of America Producer Pension Trust, Doheney Eye Institute, Quinn Martin Dolan, Mark Domas, Francis G. Duggan, Jeanette M. Duggan, Michael W. Dunaway, Trudy V. Dunaway, Lucile M. Dunn, James H. Eckhouse, Jill E. Eckhouse, Warren J. Eide, Everything Medical, Inc., Joseph M. Fee, Bernadette Fingleton, First Republic Bank, John E. Flick, Lois L. Flick, James A. Friedberg, Thomas F. Friedberg, Camilla Chandler Frost, Debra A. Gastler, Rodolfo V. Gil, Roger Goodan, Helen Grossman, Despina Haigler, Richard Haigler, Karen Hammond, Paul Theodore Hammond, Verna R. Harrah, Herbert G. Lau Profit Sharing QRP Participation, Enrique Hernandez, Jr., E. Donald Heymann, Leonard F. Hill, Danica F. Hughes, Mark A. Hughes, Mark Allen Itkin, Nancy Fay Johnson, Omar F. Johnson Jr., Kaiser Foundation Health, Kaiser Foundation Health Plans and Hospital, Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, Patricia Kaszton, William Kaszton, Jonathan Gary Keith, Joe Youssry Kelada, John Lanfranki, Virginia Lanfranki, Chase L. Leavitt, Nancy Lobdell, Robert C. Lobdell, Los Angeles Department of Water and Power Employees Retirement Plan-LCV, Charley Chunyu Lu, Melissa Ma, Nancy L. Mac Donald, William D. Mac Donald, Iris B. Mahoney, Paul M. Mahoney(individually and as a Trustee of the Iris B. Mahoney REV TR U/A/D 04/10/98), Paul M. Mahoney(individually and as a Trustee of U/W/O Paul P Mahoney DTD 12/28/1978), Irene M. McNulty, Mary Kathleen McNulty, Wayne F. McNulty, Alfred W. Merkel, Marlowe G. Merkel, Renee H. Miller, Durham J. Monsma, Robbie E. Monsma, Melissa A Monson, Monumental Life Insurance Company, Eric Morris, Robert D. Nelson, Ynez Viole O'Neill, Janice Fay Johnson Ochs, Omers Pension Fund, John A. Orb, John A. Orb Jr., Barbro Osher, Bernard Osher, PG&E Postretirment Medical Plan TR, Miriam A. Pawel, George J. Peckham, Imogene S. Peckham, Michael Plonski, Nedra Plonski, John Pritzker, Lisa Pritzker, Carl Zlatchin Profit, Qualified CPUC Decom Master TR, RWB, Irving Rabin, Varda Rabin, Rabin Worldwide, Inc., Nancy D. Ramage, Gelert R. Ramage, Jr., Robert Ramsey, Javad Rassouli, Remdel Brothers, Daniel H. Renberg, Carol Rhoads, S Keating Rhoads, Enzo S. Ricciardelli, Roman Catholic Archbishop LA, Claude Rosenberg, Louise Rosenberg, SC Edison Nuclear Facilities, SDG&E Qualified Nuclear Decom, Sacramento County Emp Ret System, Sacramento County Ret Association, San Pasqual Fiduciary Trust Co., Joanne Desherow Sanger, Mark I. Seiden, Susan H. Shane, Bernard Shapiro, Rena Shapiro, Southern California UFCWU & FE Joint Pension Trust Fund, Starbuck, Tisdale & Associates, State of California - Mid Cap Value, Randy Steiner(an individual), Douglas B. Stewart, John W. Stewart II, William Stinehart Jr.(individually and as a Trustee of Chandler Trust No. 1 and Chandler Trust No. 2), William Stinehart Jr.(an individual), Kevin Stone, Vern M. Strickler, T.Rowe Price, Lori Ann Talarico, Teamsters Separate Account, The Whittier Trust Company, William F. Thomas, Alfred V. Tjarks, Alfred V. Tjarks Jr., Transamerica Partners Mid Cap Value, Transamerica Partners Mid Cap Value F/K/A Div. Investors Portfolios, Union Bank of California N.A.,, Catherine A. Verdusco, Lolita K. Wagner, Water and Power Employee's Ret. Disab. & Death Benefit Ins. Plan, Laurie H. Weaver, Judy C. Webb, Wedbush Morgan Securities, Inc., Will K. Weinstein, Nicholas H. Werthman, Warren B. Williamson, Diane Buchanan Wilsey, Peter A. Young, Biying Zhang, Betty K Zlatchin, zoological Society of San Diego, a California. (mjj2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2011)
June 2, 2011 Filing 7 Proposed Order re #5 Ex Parte Application by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (mjj2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2011)
June 2, 2011 Filing 6 Declaration of Julia I. De Beers in Support of #5 Ex Parte Application filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (Related document(s) #5 ) (mjj2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2011)
June 2, 2011 Filing 5 Ex Parte Application for an Order Granting Administrative Relief to File Exhibit A to Plaintiff's Complaint Under Seal filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (mjj2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2011)
June 2, 2011 Filing 4 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action or Proceeding by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company (mjj2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2011) Modified on 6/13/2011 (gba, COURT STAFF). (gba, COURT STAFF).
June 2, 2011 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company identifying Corporate Parent M&T Bank Corporation, Corporate Parent Wilmington Trust Corporation for Wilmington Trust Company; Corporate Parent The Law Debenture Corporation plc for Law Debenture Trust Company of New York; Corporate Parent Taunus Corporation, Corporate Parent Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation, Corporate Parent Deutsche Bank AG for Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas. (mjj2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2011) (gba, COURT STAFF).
June 2, 2011 Filing 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 9/2/2011. Case Management Conference set for 9/9/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order re Case Management Conference, #3 Notice of Rule Discontinuing Service by Mail, #4 Standing Order for all Judges)(mjj2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2011)
June 2, 2011 Filing 1 Class Action COMPLAINT against Aegon/Transamerica Series Trust T Rowe Price Equity Income, Betty Ann Altman, John M. Altman, Jeffrey J. Appleby, Archdiocese of Los Angeles, Archdiocese of Los Angeles Lay Employee Pension Plan, Richard S. Arnold, Carol Askin, Richard Askin, Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Jacqueline E. Autry, Susan Babcock, Bank of The West, Donald Baron, Irene Baron, Betty Beaird, Sharron R. Beard, Spencer W. Beard, William J. Bell, Jill E. Berube, Board of Trustees of Leland Stanford Jr University, Florence S. Bradshaw, Sherry Broder(individually and as a Trustee of Sherry P. Broder U/A DTD 1/1/94), Sherry P. Broder(an individual), Robert J. Brookes, Antoinette B. Brumbaugh, George William Buck, Lawrence H Burks, California Ironworkers Field Pension Trust, Camilla Chandler Family Foundation, Carpenters Pension Trust for Northern California, Stephen D. Carver, Catholic Health West CHW, Catholic Healthcare West CHW, Frances L. Cey, Ronald C. Cey, Chandis Securities Company, Jeffrey Chandler, Eric I. Chang, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc, Charley Chunyu Lu & Biying Zhang Commercial Property, City National Bank, Herbert Anthony Clark, Jr., Tommie L. Cordero, Crowell Weedon & Co., Derek M. Dalton, Karen E. Dalton, Directors Guild of America, Directors Guild of America Producer Pension Trust, Doheney Eye Institute, Quinn Martin Dolan, Mark Domas, Francis G. Duggan, Jeanette M. Duggan, Michael W. Dunaway, Trudy V. Dunaway, Lucile M. Dunn, James H. Eckhouse, Jill E. Eckhouse, Warren J. Eide, Everything Medical, Inc., Joseph M. Fee, Bernadette Fingleton, First Republic Bank, John E. Flick, Lois L. Flick, James A. Friedberg, Thomas F. Friedberg, Camilla Chandler Frost, Debra A. Gastler, Rodolfo V. Gil, Roger Goodan, Helen Grossman, Despina Haigler, Richard Haigler, Karen Hammond, Paul Theodore Hammond, Verna R. Harrah, Herbert G. Lau Profit Sharing QRP Participation, Enrique Hernandez, Jr., E. Donald Heymann, Leonard F. Hill, Danica F. Hughes, Mark A. Hughes, Mark Allen Itkin, Nancy Fay Johnson, Omar F. Johnson Jr., Kaiser Foundation Health, Kaiser Foundation Health Plans and Hospital, Kaiser Foundation Hospitals, Patricia Kaszton, William Kaszton, Jonathan Gary Keith, Joe Youssry Kelada, John Lanfranki, Virginia Lanfranki, Chase L. Leavitt, Nancy Lobdell, Robert C. Lobdell, Los Angeles Department of Water and Power Employees Retirement Plan-LCV, Charley Chunyu Lu, Melissa Ma, Nancy L. Mac Donald, William D. Mac Donald, Iris B. Mahoney, Paul M. Mahoney(individually and as a Trustee of the Iris B. Mahoney REV TR U/A/D 04/10/98), Paul M. Mahoney(individually and as a Trustee of U/W/O Paul P Mahoney DTD 12/28/1978), Irene M. McNulty, Mary Kathleen McNulty, Wayne F. McNulty, Alfred W. Merkel, Marlowe G. Merkel, Renee H. Miller, Durham J. Monsma, Robbie E. Monsma, Melissa A Monson, Monumental Life Insurance Company, Eric Morris, Robert D. Nelson, Ynez Viole O'Neill, Janice Fay Johnson Ochs, Omers Pension Fund, John A. Orb, John A. Orb Jr., Barbro Osher, Bernard Osher, PG&E Postretirment Medical Plan TR, Miriam A. Pawel, George J. Peckham, Imogene S. Peckham, Michael Plonski, Nedra Plonski, John Pritzker, Lisa Pritzker, Carl Zlatchin Profit, Qualified CPUC Decom Master TR, RWB, Irving Rabin, Varda Rabin, Rabin Worldwide, Inc., Nancy D. Ramage, Gelert R. Ramage, Jr., Robert Ramsey, Javad Rassouli, Remdel Brothers, Daniel H. Renberg, Carol Rhoads, S Keating Rhoads, Enzo S. Ricciardelli, Roman Catholic Archbishop LA, Claude Rosenberg, Louise Rosenberg, SC Edison Nuclear Facilities, SDG&E Qualified Nuclear Decom, Sacramento County Emp Ret System, Sacramento County Ret Association, San Pasqual Fiduciary Trust Co., Joanne Desherow Sanger, Mark I. Seiden, Susan H. Shane, Bernard Shapiro, Rena Shapiro, Southern California UFCWU & FE Joint Pension Trust Fund, Starbuck, Tisdale & Associates, State of California - Mid Cap Value, Randy Steiner(an individual), Douglas B. Stewart, John W. Stewart II, William Stinehart Jr.(individually and as a Trustee of Chandler Trust No. 1 and Chandler Trust No. 2), William Stinehart Jr.(an individual), Kevin Stone, Vern M. Strickler, T.Rowe Price, Lori Ann Talarico, Teamsters Separate Account, The Whittier Trust Company, William F. Thomas, Alfred V. Tjarks, Alfred V. Tjarks Jr., Transamerica Partners Mid Cap Value, Transamerica Partners Mid Cap Value F/K/A Div. Investors Portfolios, Union Bank of California N.A.,, Catherine A. Verdusco, Lolita K. Wagner, Water and Power Employee's Ret. Disab. & Death Benefit Ins. Plan, Laurie H. Weaver, Judy C. Webb, Wedbush Morgan Securities, Inc., Will K. Weinstein, Nicholas H. Werthman, Warren B. Williamson, Diane Buchanan Wilsey, Peter A. Young, Biying Zhang, Betty K Zlatchin, zoological Society of San Diego, a California ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611060512.). Filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, Wilmington Trust Company. (mjj2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/13/2011: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (gba, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas et al v. First Republic Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert D. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernadette Fingleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florence S. Bradshaw
Represented By: James Wade Poindexter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SDG&E Qualified Nuclear Decom
Represented By: Sabina Clorfeine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PG&E Postretirment Medical Plan TR
Represented By: Michael Allen Firestein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacqueline E. Autry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: zoological Society of San Diego, a California
Represented By: Alfred Michael DeLaCruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iris B. Mahoney
Represented By: Paul Michael Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas H. Werthman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antoinette B. Brumbaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charley Chunyu Lu & Biying Zhang Commercial Property
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betty K Zlatchin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia Lanfranki
Represented By: Michael Jens Frederick Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Pritzker
Represented By: Jeffrey Hoke Bergman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claude Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charley Chunyu Lu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Durham J. Monsma
Represented By: Mark A. Neubauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biying Zhang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa A Monson
Represented By: David C. Lee
Represented By: Jeffrey Hoke Bergman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enzo S. Ricciardelli
Represented By: Michael Joseph Olecki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Ironworkers Field Pension Trust
Represented By: Stuart Libicki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Allen Itkin
Represented By: Mark A. Neubauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Kaszton
Represented By: Marc Jeffrey Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irene M. McNulty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janice Fay Johnson Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfred V. Tjarks Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey Lee Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James H. Eckhouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trudy V. Dunaway
Represented By: Scott Louis Metzger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Trustees of Leland Stanford Jr University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert J. Brookes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francis G. Duggan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quinn Martin Dolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine A. Verdusco
Represented By: Michael L Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Youssry Kelada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric I. Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tommie L. Cordero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Ann Talarico
Represented By: Jeffrey Hoke Bergman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William F. Thomas
Represented By: Mark A. Neubauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Republic Bank
Represented By: Walter Raymond Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark I. Seiden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Schwab & Co., Inc
Represented By: Mark P DiPerna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl Zlatchin Profit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Varda Rabin
Represented By: David C. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Ramsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irene Baron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodolfo V. Gil
Represented By: Marc Jeffrey Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Whittier Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbro Osher
Represented By: David C. Lee
Represented By: Jeffrey Hoke Bergman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RWB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robbie E. Monsma
Represented By: Mark A. Neubauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louise Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Archdiocese of Los Angeles Lay Employee Pension Plan
Represented By: Jeanne Ellen Irving
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Donald Heymann
Represented By: Jeffrey Mayer
Represented By: Lawrence Allen Baskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph M. Fee
Represented By: Wayne T. Lamprey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Ma
Represented By: Bruce A. Ericson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Rhoads
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Water and Power Employee's Ret. Disab. & Death Benefit Ins. Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren B. Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herbert Anthony Clark, Jr.
Represented By: Greta Sedeal Curtis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derek M. Dalton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Foundation Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Domas
Represented By: Pamela Koslyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marlowe G. Merkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California - Mid Cap Value
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carpenters Pension Trust for Northern California
Represented By: George M. Kraw
Represented By: Michael James Korda
Represented By: Donna Lynn Kirchner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verna R. Harrah
Represented By: Jeffrey Hoke Bergman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherry P. Broder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John A. Orb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wedbush Morgan Securities, Inc.
Represented By: John Lance Erikson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judy C. Webb
Represented By: Joel Alan Feuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Kaszton
Represented By: Marc Jeffrey Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sacramento County Emp Ret System
Represented By: Stephen Julian Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen D. Carver
Represented By: Daniel C. Zamora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Los Angeles Department of Water and Power Employees Retirement Plan-LCV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Askin
Represented By: Richard John Kohlbrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S Keating Rhoads
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crowell Weedon & Co.
Represented By: Christopher Darin Glos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Despina Haigler
Represented By: Reginald David Steer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Javad Rassouli
Represented By: Leslie Raymond Horowitz
Represented By: Stephen Eric Hyam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard S. Arnold
Represented By: James Wade Poindexter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George J. Peckham
Represented By: Marc Jeffrey Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catholic Healthcare West CHW
Represented By: Raja M.G. Sekaran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California, Department of Personnel Administration, Savings Plus Plan
Represented By: John T. Cu
Represented By: Arman Javid, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lois L. Flick
Represented By: Alan Daily Condren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Plonski
Represented By: Louis John Cisz, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rabin Worldwide, Inc.
Represented By: David C. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Steiner
Represented By: Jeanne Ellen Irving
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernard Osher
Represented By: David C. Lee
Represented By: Jeffrey Hoke Bergman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omar F. Johnson Jr.
Represented By: John Paulo Schafer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herbert G. Lau Profit Sharing QRP Participation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Pritzker
Represented By: Jeffrey Hoke Bergman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camilla Chandler Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherry Broder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy D. Ramage
Represented By: Miriam Judith Golbert
Represented By: Craig Howard Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George William Buck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John A. Orb Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra A. Gastler
Represented By: Mark A. Neubauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren J. Eide
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan H. Shane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City National Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Foundation Health Plans and Hospital
Represented By: David Bruce Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucile M. Dunn
Represented By: Stanley William Hodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helen Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark A. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen E. Dalton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Babcock
Represented By: Joel Alan Feuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chandis Securities Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enrique Hernandez, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ynez Viole O'Neill
Represented By: Laura Kyung Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James A. Friedberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Theodore Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T.Rowe Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betty Beaird
Represented By: Laura Kyung Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sacramento County Ret Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas F Friedberg
Represented By: Thomas Franklin Friedberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Bank of California N.A.,
Represented By: Alan J. Stone
Represented By: Rebecca Snavely Saelao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John W. Stewart II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irving Rabin
Represented By: David C. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Directors Guild of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul M. Mahoney
Represented By: Paul Michael Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Goodan
Represented By: Joel Alan Feuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Gary Keith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John M. Altman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betty Ann Altman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase L. Leavitt
Represented By: Adam Paul Brezine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roman Catholic Archbishop LA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lolita K. Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frances L. Cey
Represented By: Stephen Alan Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joanne Desherow Sanger
Represented By: Marc Jeffrey Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leonard F. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rena Shapiro
Represented By: Ellen Kaufman Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camilla Chandler Family Foundation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfred V. Tjarks
Represented By: Jeffrey Lee Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy L. Mac Donald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monumental Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Mark P DiPerna
Represented By: Scott H. McNutt
Represented By: Douglas Carr Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whittier Trust Company
Represented By: Nicholas James Van Brunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurie H. Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern California UFCWU & FE Joint Pension Trust Fund
Represented By: Stuart Libicki
Represented By: Kathleen Cahill Slaught
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spencer W. Beard
Represented By: Marc Jeffrey Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Lobdell
Represented By: Mark A. Neubauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Foundation Hospitals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nedra Plonski
Represented By: Louis John Cisz, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Everything Medical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Fay Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Will K. Weinstein
Represented By: Jeffrey Hoke Bergman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doheney Eye Institute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert C. Lobdell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter A. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starbuck, Tisdale & Associates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SC Edison Nuclear Facilities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfred W. Merkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeanette M. Duggan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Kathleen McNulty
Represented By: Anthony P. Fritz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aegon/Transamerica Series Trust T Rowe Price Equity Income
Represented By: Mark P DiPerna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vern M. Strickler
Represented By: Marc Jeffrey Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William J. Bell
Represented By: Jeremiah Tracy Reynolds
Represented By: Dale Kinsella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danica F. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omers Pension Fund
Represented By: Bruce A. Ericson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William D. Mac Donald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence H Burks
Represented By: James Andrew Hinds, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Lanfranki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miriam A. Pawel
Represented By: Ellen Greenstone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qualified CPUC Decom Master TR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Haigler
Represented By: Reginald David Steer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Chandler
Represented By: Joel Alan Feuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald C. Cey
Represented By: Stephen Alan Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Baron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharron R. Beard
Represented By: Marc Jeffrey Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne F. McNulty
Represented By: Anthony P. Fritz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas B. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane Buchanan Wilsey
Represented By: Jeffrey Hoke Bergman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Askin
Represented By: Richard John Kohlbrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jill E. Berube
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel H. Renberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renee H. Miller
Represented By: Mark A. Neubauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John E. Flick
Represented By: Alan Daily Condren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey J. Appleby
Represented By: Michael L Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imogene S. Peckham
Represented By: Marc Jeffrey Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Remdel Brothers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SA Funds Investment Trust
Represented By: Claudia A. Quiroz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael W. Dunaway
Represented By: Scott Louis Metzger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catholic Health West CHW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Stone
Represented By: David C. Lee
Represented By: Jeffrey Hoke Bergman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernard Shapiro
Represented By: Ellen Kaufman Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Pasqual Fiduciary Trust Co.
Represented By: James Wade Poindexter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transamerica Partners Mid Cap Value
Represented By: Mark P DiPerna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Archdiocese of Los Angeles
Represented By: Jeanne Ellen Irving
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas F. Friedberg
Represented By: Thomas Franklin Friedberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teamsters Separate Account
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gelert R. Ramage, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Directors Guild of America Producer Pension Trust
Represented By: Jonathan Douglas Meer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Stinehart Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of The West
Represented By: Walter J.R. Traver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jill E. Eckhouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transamerica Partners Mid Cap Value F/K/A Div. Investors Portfolios
Represented By: Mark P DiPerna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilmington Trust Company
Represented By: Stephen Michael Baldini
Represented By: Hal Neier
Represented By: Reginald David Steer
Represented By: Julia Ingrid DeBeers
Represented By: Daniel H. Golden
Represented By: Robert J. Lack
Represented By: Ricardo Solano, Jr.
Represented By: Katherine P. Scully,
Represented By: Mitchell P. Hurley,
Represented By: Amy C. Brown
Represented By: Angeline Koo
Represented By: Jason L. Goldsmith
Represented By: Allan Edward Ceran
Represented By: David Zensky
Represented By: Deborah Jill Newman,
Represented By: Melodie Kay Larsen
Represented By: James P. Chou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Administration of the Water and Power Employees' Retirement Plan, incorrectly named as "Los Angeles Department of Water and Power Employees Retirement Plan-LCV" and "Water
Represented By: Jonathan Alan Loeb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Law Debenture Trust Company of New York
Represented By: Stephen Michael Baldini
Represented By: Hal Neier
Represented By: Reginald David Steer
Represented By: Julia Ingrid DeBeers
Represented By: Daniel H. Golden
Represented By: Robert J. Lack
Represented By: Ricardo Solano, Jr.
Represented By: Katherine P. Scully,
Represented By: Mitchell P. Hurley,
Represented By: Amy C. Brown
Represented By: Angeline Koo
Represented By: Jason L. Goldsmith
Represented By: Allan Edward Ceran
Represented By: David Zensky
Represented By: Deborah Jill Newman,
Represented By: Melodie Kay Larsen
Represented By: James P. Chou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas
Represented By: Stephen Michael Baldini
Represented By: Hal Neier
Represented By: Reginald David Steer
Represented By: Julia Ingrid DeBeers
Represented By: Daniel H. Golden
Represented By: Robert J. Lack
Represented By: Ricardo Solano, Jr.
Represented By: Katherine P. Scully,
Represented By: Mitchell P. Hurley,
Represented By: Amy C. Brown
Represented By: Angeline Koo
Represented By: Jason L. Goldsmith
Represented By: Allan Edward Ceran
Represented By: David Zensky
Represented By: Deborah Jill Newman,
Represented By: Melodie Kay Larsen
Represented By: James P. Chou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Estate of Robert D. Nelson
Represented By: Philip Joseph Giacinti, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?