Local Search Association v. City & County of San Francisco et al
Plaintiff: Local Search Association
Defendant: City & County of San Francisco, Board of Supervisors of the City & County of San Francisco and Edwin M. Lee
Case Number: 4:2011cv02776
Filed: June 7, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 204 CONSENT JUDGMENT in favor of Local Search Association against City & County of San Francisco. ***Civil Case Terminated.*** Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 9/18/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2013)
March 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER REOPENING CASE Case Management Conference set for 6/4/2013 02:30 PM. VIA TELEPHONE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 3/6/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2013)
March 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER CONDITIONALLY DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 3/5/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2013)
February 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong DENYING 186 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and REFERRING case to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu for a MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE to take place within (45) forty-five-days of this Order. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 01/31/13 (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2013)
November 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT 182 MOTION to Have Case Management Conference Proceedings Transcribed by a Court Reporter filed by Local Search Association, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 182 MOTION to Have Case Management Conference Proceed ings Transcribed by a Court Reporter . Motion to dismiss due by 12/10/13. Responses due by 1/2/2013. Replies due by 1/16/2013. Motion Hearing set for 1/29/2013 01:00 PM before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 11/7/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2012)
May 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER STAYING CASE, ***Civil Case Terminated.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 5/1/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2012)
April 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 151 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2012)
February 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 48 Corrected MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Motion Hearing set for 3/6/2012 01:00 PM before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 2/10/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2012)
January 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 48 Corrected MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Motion Hearing set for 2/7/2012 01:00 PM before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 1/3/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2012)
November 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 110 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2011)
November 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 96 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2011)
October 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 102 STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER re 99 Stipulation, filed by City & County of San Francisco, Local Search Association, Board of Supervisors of the City & County of San Francisco, Edwin M. Lee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 10/27/11. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2011)
October 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 69 Notice of Reference and Order re Discovery Procedures. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 10/18/2011. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2011)
October 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 66 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 64 Stipulation, filed by City & County of San Francisco, Local Search Association, Board of Supervisors of the City & County of San Francisco, Edwin M. Lee. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 10/6/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2011)
September 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 51 STIPULATION AND ORDER, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 48 Corrected MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Responses due by 10/11/2011. Replies due by 11/1/2011.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 9/6/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Local Search Association v. City & County of San Francisco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Local Search Association
Represented By: Eugene Volokh
Represented By: Edward D. Johnson
Represented By: Donald M. Falk
Represented By: Rena Chng
Represented By: Jason Adam Wrubleski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City & County of San Francisco
Represented By: Francesca Gessner
Represented By: Christine Van Aken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Supervisors of the City & County of San Francisco
Represented By: Francesca Gessner
Represented By: Christine Van Aken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edwin M. Lee
Represented By: Francesca Gessner
Represented By: Christine Van Aken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?