Tucker et al v. Wright Medical Technology, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Gregory K. Tucker and Rebecca Tucker
Defendant: Wright Medical Technology, Inc. and Wright Medical Group, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2011cv03086
Filed: June 22, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE, STIPULATION AND ORDER re 154 Stipulation filed by Gregory K. Tucker, Rebecca Tucker, Wright Medical Technology, Inc. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 6/12/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2013)
May 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER re Joint Settlement and Compliance Hearing. The 5/31/2013 Compliance hearing is CONTINUED to Friday, 6/14/2013 09:01 AM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. If a stipulation of dismissal is not filed by 6/12/2013, the parties shall file another joint statement. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/30/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2013)
March 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER VACATING DATES AND SETTING COMPLIANCE HEARING Compliance Hearing is set for Friday, 5/17/2013 09:01 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/20/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2013)
March 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting in part and denying in part 76 Motion for Summary Judgment (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2013) Modified on 3/19/2013 (fs, COURT STAFF).
February 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting in part and denying in part 62 Motion to Exclude Experts; granting in part and denying in part 63 Motion to to Exclude Experts; granting in part and denying in part 67 Motion to Exclude (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2013)
January 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER REGARDING HEARINGS ON JANUARY 15, 2013. Parties are advised that the Motion Hearing set for 1/15/2013 shall begin at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 62 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Kevin Bozic , 63 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Lester Hendrickson , 76 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 67 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Mari Truman . Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 1/11/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2013)
January 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers DENYING 94 MOTION TO PLACE CERTAIN EXHIBITS UNDER SEAL. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2013)
August 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 46 STIPULATION AND ORDER Regarding Limited Discovery After Fact Discovery Cut-Off Date re 45 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Wright Medical Technology, Inc. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 8/15/12. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2012)
February 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER DENYING Transfer of Action to MDL-2329. Signed by MDL Panel Chairman. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2012)
January 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 29 Motion for Administrative Relief To Modify the Court Ordered Deadline for Completion of Mediation; the Court continues the mediation deadline until March 30, 2012. The Court further VAC ATES the current Case Management Conference set for March 19, 2012 and sets a new CMC for April 16, 2012 at 2:00 p.m. All other dates set forth in the Clerk's Notice dated January 20, 2012 (Dkt. No. 28) remain in effect. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2012) Modified on 1/27/2012 (fs, COURT STAFF).
October 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER re 25 Case Management Conference - Initial. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/4/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2011)
September 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION AND ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS (PRIVATE MEDIATION) re 20 Stipulation and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR filed by Wright Medical Technology, Inc., Case referred to Private ADR. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 9/19/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tucker et al v. Wright Medical Technology, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wright Medical Technology, Inc.
Represented By: Michael O. Fawaz
Represented By: Daniel J. Herling
Represented By: Michael V. Kell
Represented By: Martin Hung Quoc Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wright Medical Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory K. Tucker
Represented By: Thomas Miles Gray
Represented By: Joseph Harry Fagundes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Tucker
Represented By: Joseph Harry Fagundes
Represented By: Thomas Miles Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?