Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Indymac Bank FSB v. Warren et al
Plaintiff: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Indymac Bank FSB
Defendant: Judith A. Warren and Patricia L. Dennis
Case Number: 4:2011cv03260
Filed: July 1, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 97 Stipulation. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2014)
June 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 88 Stipulation to Continue Pretrial Conference and Date to File Pretrial Documents. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2013)
March 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING ( 47 , 55 ) CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT.(This Order also Grants 81 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal). (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2013)
January 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE JOINT STATUS REPORT. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/24/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2013)
November 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 76 NOTICE OF REFERENCE, ORDER, TIME AND PLACE OF HEARING re 74 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Judith A. Warren. Telephonic Motion Hearing set for 11/28/2012 at 11:30 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/27/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2012)
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Discovery purposes re 74 Joint Discovery Letter Brief. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 11/13/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2012)
October 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING DEFENDANTS 64 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE OPPOSITION BRIEF (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2012)
June 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Granting 37 Proposed Order re 35 . Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/5/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2012)
June 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Granting 34 Proposed Order Re 33 Request to Appear by CourtCall for June 28, 2012 Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/1/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2012)
January 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Granting 30 Proposed Order. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/20/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2012)
October 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING PLAINTIFF'S 13 MOTION TO STRIKE. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2011)
October 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER RESCHEDULING OCTOBER 18, 2011 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on October 14, 2011. (cwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2011)
October 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Granting 22 Stipulation for Protective Order for Standard Litigation. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/13/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2011)
September 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Granting 14 Stipulation Selecting Private ADR. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/27/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Indymac Bank FSB v. Warren et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judith A. Warren
Represented By: Steve W. Dollar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia L. Dennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Indymac Bank FSB
Represented By: Vanessa Hindley Widener
Represented By: Jennifer Muse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?