Jones et al v. City of Oakland et al
Plaintiff: D.S.J., Estate of Derrick Jones, Nellie Jones and Frank Jones
Defendant: City of Oakland, Eriberto Perez-Angeles and Omar Daza-Quiroz
Case Number: 4:2011cv03470
Filed: July 14, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/23/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2013)
October 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER RE: SECOND CONTINUANCE OF COMPLIANCE HEARING FOR FILING OF AMENDED PETITION FOR MINOR'S COMPROMISE. The 10/11/2013 Compliance Hearing is CONTINUED TO Friday, October 25, 2013 at 9:01 AM.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/10/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2013)
September 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER CONTINUING COMPLIANCE HEARING RE: FILING OF PETITION FOR MINOR'S COMPROMISE. Pending Petitions DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to resubmitting re 39 Amended Ex Parte Application and [PROPOSED] ORDER TO APPOINT G.A.L. & COMPROMISE MINOR'S CLAIM filed by D.S.J. Compliance Hearing set 9/27/13 is CONTINUED to 10/11/2013 at 9:01am. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 9/25/2013. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2013)
August 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER SETTING COMPLIANCE HEARING RE: FILING OF PETITION FOR MINOR'S COMPROMISE. Compliance Hearing is set for Friday, 9/27/2013 09:01 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 8/20/2013. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2013)
November 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for Monday 12/17/2012 02:00 PM. Show Cause Response due by 12/3/2012. Case Management Conference set 12/3/2012 is CONTINUED to Monday, 12/17/2012 at 2:00pm. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 11/28/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2012)
January 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER Case Management Conference set for Monday, 12/3/2012 02:00 PM. REFERRED to ADR for Mediation to occur by 6/1/2012. Dispositive Motions to be heard by 12/4/2012. Jury Selection set for Monday, 3/11/2013 08:30 AM bef ore Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. 7 Day Jury Trial set for Monday, 3/11/2013 08:30 AM before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, 2/22/2013 09:00 AM before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers in a designated courtroom in the Oakland Courthouse.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 1/31/2012. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones et al v. City of Oakland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D.S.J.
Represented By: Adante Pointer
Represented By: John L. Burris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Derrick Jones
Represented By: John L. Burris
Represented By: Adante Pointer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nellie Jones
Represented By: Adante Pointer
Represented By: John L. Burris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Jones
Represented By: Adante Pointer
Represented By: John L. Burris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Oakland
Represented By: William Edmond Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eriberto Perez-Angeles
Represented By: William Edmond Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omar Daza-Quiroz
Represented By: William Edmond Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?