Slojewski v. Allstate Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Sylwester Slojewski
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2011cv03614
Filed: July 22, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER OF DISMISSAL, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 4/10/13. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2013)
March 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER RE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION re 52 Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 03/18/2013. (nclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2013)
February 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER re 52 MOTION for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 2/19/2013. (nclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2013)
February 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting in part and denying in part 28 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2013)
November 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER of reference to Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 11/29/2012. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2012)
November 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER re 19 Case Management Conference - Initial. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 11/21/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2011)
November 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION AND ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS (ENE) re 16 Stipulation and Proposed Order selecting Early Neutral Evaluation filed by Allstate Insurance Company, Case referred to early neutral evaluation. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 11/16/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Slojewski v. Allstate Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylwester Slojewski
Represented By: Peter Nicholas Hadiaris, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Megan Lynn Barker
Represented By: Michael A. Barnes
Represented By: Sonia Renee Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?