Facebook, Inc. v. Cyber2Media, Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Facebook, Inc.
Defendant: Cyber2Media, Inc., Daniel Negari, Cleanser Products, Counter Balance Enterprises Ltd., FB Promotions/Freebie Promos, Mackrooner Ltd. Inc., Newgate Services Ltd., Pioneer Enterprises Ltd., Rabbit Gogo Media LLC, SMTM Enterprises Ltd., YourTick, Zilt, Jacob Daniels, Jerry Hui, Ryan Johnson, Eric Jordan, Karrie-Lee Karreman, June Kimchi, Tim Meyers, Ankit Pandey, S. Pace, Elise Petri, Mark Risi, John Souza and Michael Suggs
Case Number: 4:2011cv03619
Filed: July 22, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2011 Filing 9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Cyber2Media, Inc.. (Newman, Derek) (Filed on 8/16/2011)
August 16, 2011 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Facebook, Inc.. Service waived by Eric Jordan waiver sent on 7/22/2011, answer due 9/20/2011. (Hennessy, Brian) (Filed on 8/16/2011)
August 16, 2011 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Facebook, Inc.. Service waived by FB Promotions/Freebie Promos waiver sent on 7/22/2011, answer due 9/20/2011; Rabbit Gogo Media LLC waiver sent on 7/22/2011, answer due 9/20/2011; Michael Suggs waiver sent on 7/22/2011, answer due 9/20/2011. (Hennessy, Brian) (Filed on 8/16/2011)
August 15, 2011 Filing 10 MOTION of Randall Moeller for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 44611007451.) filed by Cyber2Media, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2011)
July 26, 2011 Filing 6 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding trademark infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2011) Modified on 7/26/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
July 22, 2011 Filing 5 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 10/27/2011. Case Management Conference set for 11/3/2011 02:00 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2011)
July 22, 2011 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Cleanser Products, Counter Balance Enterprises Ltd., Cyber2Media, Inc., Jacob Daniels, FB Promotions/Freebie Promos, Jerry Hui, Ryan Johnson, Eric Jordan, Karrie-Lee Karreman, June Kimchi, Mackrooner Ltd. Inc., Tim Meyers, Daniel Negari, Newgate Services Ltd., S. Pace, Ankit Pandey, Elise Petri, Pioneer Enterprises Ltd., Rabbit Gogo Media LLC, Mark Risi, SMTM Enterprises Ltd., John Souza, Michael Suggs, YourTick, Zilt. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2011)
July 22, 2011 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Facebook, Inc. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2011) (vlk, COURT STAFF).
July 22, 2011 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Facebook, Inc. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2011) (vlk, COURT STAFF).
July 22, 2011 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2011)
July 22, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cleanser Products, Counter Balance Enterprises Ltd., Cyber2Media, Inc., Jacob Daniels, FB Promotions/Freebie Promos, Jerry Hui, Ryan Johnson, Eric Jordan, Karrie-Lee Karreman, June Kimchi, Mackrooner Ltd. Inc., Tim Meyers, Daniel Negari, Newgate Services Ltd., S. Pace, Ankit Pandey, Elise Petri, Pioneer Enterprises Ltd., Rabbit Gogo Media LLC, Mark Risi, SMTM Enterprises Ltd., John Souza, Michael Suggs, YourTick, Zilt ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 54611010092.) filed by Facebook, Inc.. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/27/2011: # 1 Complaint Part 2, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet) (vlk, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Facebook, Inc. v. Cyber2Media, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Facebook, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Patrick Hennessy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cyber2Media, Inc.
Represented By: Randall Moeller
Represented By: Derek Alan Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Negari
Represented By: Randall Moeller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleanser Products
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Counter Balance Enterprises Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FB Promotions/Freebie Promos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mackrooner Ltd. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newgate Services Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pioneer Enterprises Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rabbit Gogo Media LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SMTM Enterprises Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YourTick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zilt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Hui
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karrie-Lee Karreman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: June Kimchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Meyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ankit Pandey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Pace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elise Petri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Risi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Souza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Suggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?