The Regents of the University of California v. Blue Cross of Idaho Health Service, Inc.

Plaintiff: The Regents of the University of California
Defendant: Blue Cross of Idaho Health Service, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2011cv03622
Filed: July 22, 2011
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 20, 2013 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING ACTION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 12/20/2013. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
December 18, 2013 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUIRING STATUS UPATE BY THURSDAY DECEMBER 19, 2013 AT 5 P.M. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 12/18/2013. (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2013)
July 11, 2013 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Re 37 Status Report filed by The Regents of the University of California. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 7/11/2013. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2013)
January 9, 2013 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Requiring Status Update by July 11, 2013. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2013)
January 17, 2012 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING CASE to Private ADR. Signed by Judge Beeler on 1/13/2012. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2012)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Regents of the University of California v. Blue Cross of Idaho Health Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Regents of the University of California
Represented By: Richard Alan Lovich
Represented By: Christopher Joseph Hapak
Represented By: Barry Sullivan
Represented By: Melanie Joy Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross of Idaho Health Service, Inc.
Represented By: Dan J. Hofmeister, Jr
Represented By: Eric Conrad Schaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?