Marks v. Askew et al
Plaintiff: Leslie Patrice Barnes Marks
Defendant: Fidelity National Title Company, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Trevnor Askew, TRA Partners, LLC, Greentree Servicing, LLC and New Century Liquidating Trust
Case Number: 4:2011cv03851
Filed: August 5, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331(a) Fed. Question: Real Property
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER re 119 Notice of Appeal, filed by Leslie Patrice Barnes Marks. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 2/28/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2013)
February 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER re 124 USCA Order,. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 2/13/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2013)
January 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 83 Motion for Leave to File (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2012)
January 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER DENYING 32 Objection filed by Leslie Patrice Barnes Marks, 53 Objection filed by Leslie Patrice Barnes Marks. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 1/9/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2012)
October 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denying 20 Motion for Reconsideration (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marks v. Askew et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity National Title Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trevnor Askew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRA Partners, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greentree Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Century Liquidating Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Patrice Barnes Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?