Trustees of the Northern California Tile Industry Pension Trust Fund et al v. Peacock Tile and Marble, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Northern California Tile Industry Pension Trust Fund, Trustees of the Northern California Tile Industry Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Trustees of the Northern California Tile Industry Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund, Trustees of the Northern California Tile Industry Vacation and Holiday Trust Fund and Trustees of the Northern California Tile Industry Labor Management Cooperation Trust Fund
Defendant: Peacock Tile and Marble, Inc. and Christyne Grace Pavone
Case Number: 4:2011cv03859
Filed: August 5, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Labor/Management Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 06/23/14. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2014)
June 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER GRANTING 127 Proposed Order Regarding Plaintiffs Dismissal with Prejudice of Defendant Pavone Tile & Marble Co., Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 06/17/14. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2014)
June 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER DISMISSING DEFENDANT SOUTH BAY CONSTRUCTION INC. WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 06/03/14. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2014)
June 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER DISMISSING DEFENDANT HOMESITE WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 06/02/14. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2014)
May 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 119 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 118 Stipulation.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2014)
December 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 108 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 107 Stipulation.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
November 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference previously scheduled for November 13, 2013 has been CONTINUED to March 19, 2014 at 1:30 p.m. The Case Management Statement is due no later thanMarch 12, 2014. The parties a re reminded that the court has already entered a case management and trial schedule in this case. See Docket 95 . The motion filed by South Bay Construction to appear by telephone for the case management conference 105 is denied as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 11/06/13. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2013)
August 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 103 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 102 Stipulation.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2013)
July 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 100 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying 99 Stipulation .(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2013)
July 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 87 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 84 Motion for Leave to Appear .(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2013)
May 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER: Further Case Management Conference set for 7/17/2013 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Case Management Statement due by 7/10/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 5/17/13. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2013)
May 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 56 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 49 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2013)
April 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Motion Hearing on 49 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint set for 5/9/2013 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 04/12/13. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2013)
March 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER re 49 MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Complaint filed by Trustees of the Northern California Tile Industry Pension Trust Fund, Trustees of the Northern California Tile Industry Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund, Trus tees of the Northern California Tile Industry Labor Management Cooperation Trust Fund, Trustees of the Northern California Tile Industry Vacation and Holiday Trust Fund, Trustees of the Northern California Tile Industry Health and Welfare Trust Fund. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 3/1/2013. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2013)
February 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER: The Case Management and Pretrial Order previously filed in this case on November 21, 2011 is hereby VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 2/14/13. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2013)
February 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Case Management Conference set for 2/13/2013 01:30 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 2/7/2013. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2013)
January 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 1/14/2013. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2013)
October 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 38 CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 37 .ORDER re 36 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Trustees of the Northern California Tile Industry Pension Trust Fund, Trustees of the Northern California Tile Industry Apprenticeship and Traini ng Trust Fund, Trustees of the Northern California Tile Industry Labor Management Cooperation Trust Fund, Trustees of the Northern California Tile Industry Vacation and Holiday Trust Fund, Trustees of the Northern California Tile Industry Health and Welfare Trust Fund. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 10/31/2012. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2012) Modified on 10/31/2012 (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF).
February 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER re 22 Proposed Order filed by Christyne Grace Pavone, Peacock Tile and Marble, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 2/8/2012. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees of the Northern California Tile Industry Pension Trust Fund et al v. Peacock Tile and Marble, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Northern California Tile Industry Pension Trust Fund
Represented By: Adam John Zapala
Represented By: John J. Davis, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Northern California Tile Industry Health and Welfare Trust Fund
Represented By: Adam John Zapala
Represented By: John J. Davis, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Northern California Tile Industry Apprenticeship and Training Trust Fund
Represented By: Adam John Zapala
Represented By: John J. Davis, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Northern California Tile Industry Vacation and Holiday Trust Fund
Represented By: John J. Davis, Jr.
Represented By: Adam John Zapala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Northern California Tile Industry Labor Management Cooperation Trust Fund
Represented By: John J. Davis, Jr.
Represented By: Adam John Zapala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peacock Tile and Marble, Inc.
Represented By: Roger Mark Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christyne Grace Pavone
Represented By: Roger Mark Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?