United States of America v. Warner
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Paul J. Warner
Case Number: 4:2011cv04181
Filed: August 24, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Humboldt
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Recovery of Defaulted Student Loans (Excl. Veterans)
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER (1) CONTINUING THE MAY 15, 2013 FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND (2) VACATING THE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL. The court CONTINUES the Further Case Management Conference that currently is set for May 15, 2013 to Thursday, May 30, 20 13 at 11:00 a.m. The parties may appear at it by telephone through CourtCall. The parties shall file a joint case management conference statement no later than Thursday, May 23, 2013. Further, in light of this order, the court VACATES the Pretrial Conference and the trial, which currently are set for May 30, 2013 and June 10, 2013, respectively. Mr. Warner's continued failure to participate will result in the court vacating the May 30, 2013 Further Case Management Conference and enterin g judgment in the case. Case Management Statement due by 5/23/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/30/2013 11:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 5/12/2013. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2013)
May 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER VACATING 5/1/2013 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 5/1/2013. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2013)
April 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER Re exchange of financial information for settlement conference (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 4/6/2013)
December 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER regarding 24 discovery dispute and CONTINUING the last day for hearing dispositive motions. The court ORDERS the Government to respond to Mr. Warner's discovery requests within 30 days from the date of this order. In light of the court 's decision, the court CONTINUES the last day for hearing dispositive motions in this case from January 17, 2013 at 11:00 a.m. to March 7, 2013 at 11:00 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 12/6/2012. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2012)
July 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION AND ORDER VACATING ORDER TO MEDIATION PROGRAM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 7/17/2012. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2012)
March 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Setting Case Management Conference. See order for details. Case Management Statement due by 4/5/2012. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/12/2012 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 3/16/2012. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2012)
November 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Establishing Case Management Procedures in Student Loan Cases. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 11/21/2011. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Michael Cosentino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul J. Warner
Represented By: Paul John Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?