Trevillion v. Dillon et al

Plaintiff: Kim Y. Trevillion
Defendant: Harry E. Dillon and Elaine D. Dillon
Case Number: 4:2011cv04474
Filed: September 8, 2011
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Humboldt
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Housing/Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 6, 2012 48 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 1/6/2012. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2012)
November 29, 2011 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re 36 Notice of Change In Counsel filed by Elaine D. Dillon, Harry E. Dillon. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 11/29/11. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2011)
November 28, 2011 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Requested Relief. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 11/28/2011. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2011)
November 16, 2011 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 11/16/2011. (pjhlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2011)
November 15, 2011 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 19 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases. Order finding referral to be moot. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2011)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trevillion v. Dillon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Y. Trevillion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harry E. Dillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elaine D. Dillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?