Streetspace, Inc v. Google, Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Streetspace, Inc
Defendant: Google, Inc., Admob, Inc, Apple, Inc., Quattro Wireless, Inc, Nokia Corporation, Nokia Inc, Navteq Corporation, Millennial Media, Inc, Jumptap, Inc and Does
Case Number: 4:2011cv04574
Filed: September 19, 2011
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 19, 2011 60 CLERKS NOTICE re Transfer of Action (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2011)
September 19, 2011 58 Case transferred in from District of California Southern; Case Number 3:10-cv-01757. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 15, 2011 59 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 12/21/2011. Case Management Conference set for 12/28/2011 01:30 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2011)
September 12, 2011 57 Order Transferrring Case to the Northern District of CA; The Court grants the motion to transfer 23 and, therefore, does not rule on the other motions 29 , 49 ; Files transferred electronically to: *District of Northern District of CA*.*450 Golden Gate Avenue**San Francisco, CA 94102*. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 9/12/11. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kaj) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/13/2011: # 1 Transfer Order) (kaj).
August 31, 2011 56 NOTICE by Nokia Corporation and Nokia, Inc. of Association of Counsel (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Neil, Michael)(kaj).
August 9, 2011 55 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Millennial Media, Inc (Campbell, Christopher) qc mail sent re mag judge initials on document (kaj).
May 4, 2011 54 Minute Entry by chambers of Judge Larry Alan Burns: Currently on calendar for Monday, May 9, 2011 at 11:15am is a hearing on defendants' motion to dismiss 49 . Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1(d)(1), the Court finds this motion suitable for decision without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearing is taken off calendar and the motion is taken under submission. No appearances will be required on May 9, 2011 (Court Reporter N/A).(Plaintiff Attorney N/A). (Defendant Attorney N/A). (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(kaj)(jrd)
May 2, 2011 53 REPLY to Response to Motion re 49 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Jumptap, Inc. (Rousseau, Timothy)(kaj).
April 25, 2011 52 RESPONSE in Opposition re 49 MOTION to Dismiss (correcting missing signature) filed by Streetspace, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Trevor Coddington, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Proof of Service)(Coddington, Trevor) (kaj).
April 25, 2011 51 RESPONSE in Opposition re 49 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Streetspace, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Trevor Coddington, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Proof of Service)(Coddington, Trevor) (kaj).
April 8, 2011 50 PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: Nelson Kuan appearing for Defendant Millennial Media, Inc. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)
March 22, 2011 49 MOTION to Dismiss by Admob, Inc, Apple, Inc., Google, Inc., Jumptap, Inc, Millennial Media, Inc, Navteq Corporation, Nokia Corporation, Nokia Inc, Quattro Wireless, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities)(Rousseau, Timothy) (lmt).
March 21, 2011 48 Featured Case TRANSFER ORDER: Judge William McCurine Jr. is no longer assigned to the case and Judge Mitchell D. Dembin is now assigned. All conferences or hearing dates set before Judge McCurine are now Vacated, until further order. Any dates set before the district judge remain unchanged. The new case number is 10CV1757 LAB MDD. Signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine Jr. on 3/21/2011.(mtb)
March 15, 2011 47 RESPONSE in Opposition re 46 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File a Sur-Reply to Streetspace's Reply in Support of Motion to Disqualify Counsel filed by Streetspace, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Fazio, James) (kaj).
March 14, 2011 46 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File a Sur-Reply to Streetspace's Reply in Support of Motion to Disqualify Counsel by Millennial Media, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Declaration of John Kyle, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C)(Kyle, John) (kaj).
March 11, 2011 45 Featured Case TRANSFER ORDER: Judge Anthony J Battaglia is no longer assigned to the case and Judge William McCurine Jr is now assigned. All conferences or hearing dates set before Judge Battaglia are now set before Judge McCurine Jr, until further order. Any dates set before any district judge remain unchanged. The new case number is 10CV1757-LAB-WMC. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Battaglia on 3/11/2011. (ecs)
March 10, 2011 44 Minute Entry by Chambers of Judge Larry Alan Burns: Currently on calendar for Monday, March 14, 2011 at 11:15 a.m. is a hearing on Defendants' motion to transfer venue and Plaintiff's motion to disqualify Cooley. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1(d)(1), the Court finds these motions suitable for decision without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearing is taken off calendar and the motions are taken under submission. No appearances will be required on March 14, 2011. Also, Plaintiff's first amended complaint is deemed filed as of March 8, 2011. That is the date from which Defendants should calculate their response deadline.(Court Reporter N/A).(Plaintiff Attorney N/A). (Defendant Attorney N/A). (kaj) (jrl).
March 8, 2011 43 Featured Case ORDER granting (Doc. No. 30 ) Plaintiff's Amended Complaint and denying (Doc. No. 21 ) Motion to Dismiss. The motion to transfer venue (Doc. No. 23) and the motion to disqualify Cooley (Doc. No. 29) will remain on the Court's March 14, 2011 calendar (though the motions will likely be taken under submission on the papers). Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 3/7/11. (rlu) (av1).
March 7, 2011 42 REPLY to Response to Motion re 21 MOTION to Dismiss Rule 12(B)(6) Motion to Dismiss MOTION for a More Definite Statement MOTION to Dismiss Rule 12(B)(6) Motion to Dismiss filed by Millennial Media, Inc. (Kyle, John) (lmt).
March 7, 2011 41 REPLY to Response to Motion re 23 Joint MOTION for Change Venue filed by Apple, Inc., Jumptap, Inc, Millennial Media, Inc, Navteq Corporation, Nokia Corporation, Nokia Inc, Quattro Wireless, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Anne E. Huffsmith in Support, # 2 Exhibit D to the Declaration of Anne E. Huffsmith, # 3 Proof of Service)(Simmons, Luann) (lmt).
March 7, 2011 40 REPLY to Response to Motion re 29 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel for Millennial Media (Cooley LLP) MOTION to Disqualify Counsel for Millennial Media (Cooley LLP) filed by Streetspace, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Trevor Coddington, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Proof of Service)(Fazio, James) (lmt).
March 4, 2011 39 RESPONSE re 35 Order to Show Cause, and Request for Leave to Amend its Complaint filed by Streetspace, Inc. (Fazio, James) (kaj).
March 3, 2011 38 PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: William A. Meunier appearing for Defendant Jumptap, Inc. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)
March 3, 2011 37 PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: Douglas J. Kline appearing for Defendant Jumptap, Inc (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)
March 3, 2011 36 PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: Timothy J. Rousseau appearing for Defendant Jumptap, Inc. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)
March 3, 2011 35 Featured Case ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Streetspace is ordered to show cause, within 2 calendar days of the date this Order is entered, why its amended complaint should not be stricken from the docket, and why the pending motions to dismiss and transfer venue should not remain on the Court's calendar for a March 14, 2011 hearing. The motion to disqualify Cooley LLP will remain on the Court's March 14, 2011 calendar regardless. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 3/3/11.(kaj)(jrd).
February 28, 2011 34 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Streetspace, Inc re 33 Response in Opposition to Motion, Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue; Declaration of James V. Fazio, III in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue (Fazio, James) (kaj).
February 28, 2011 33 RESPONSE in Opposition re 23 Joint MOTION for Change Venue filed by Streetspace, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of James V. Fazio, III in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue, # 2 Exhibts A-M, # 3 Exhibits N-W)(Fazio, James) (kaj).
February 28, 2011 32 RESPONSE in Opposition re 21 MOTION to Dismiss Rule 12(B)(6) Motion to Dismiss MOTION for a More Definite Statement MOTION to Dismiss Rule 12(B)(6) Motion to Dismiss filed by Streetspace, Inc. (Fazio, James) (kaj).
February 28, 2011 31 RESPONSE in Opposition re 29 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel for Millennial Media (Cooley LLP) MOTION to Disqualify Counsel for Millennial Media (Cooley LLP) filed by Millennial Media, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Chris C. Campbell, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Campbell Declaration, # 3 Declaration of Patrick A. Doody, # 4 Declaration of Kevin Todd Duncan, # 5 Declaration of Nelson Kuan, # 6 Exhibit A to Kuan Declaration, # 7 Exhibit B to Kuan Declaration, # 8 Exhibit C to Kuan Declaration, # 9 Exhibit D to Kuan Declaration, # 10 Exhibit E to Kuan Declaration, # 11 Exhibit F to Kuan Declaration, # 12 Exhibit G to Kuan Declaration, # 13 Exhibit H to Kuan Declaration, # 14 Exhibit I to Kuan Declaration, # 15 Exhibit J to Kuan Declaration, # 16 Exhibit K to Kuan Declaration, # 17 Exhibit L to Kuan Declaration, # 18 Exhibit M to Kuan Declaration, # 19 Exhibit N to Kuan Declaration, # 20 Exhibit O to Kuan Declaration, # 21 Exhibit P to Kuan Declaration)(Kyle, John) (kaj).
February 25, 2011 30 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand First Amended Complaint against All Defendants, filed by Streetspace, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Coddington, Trevor) (lmt).
January 28, 2011 29 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel for Millennial Media (Cooley LLP) by Streetspace, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Declaration Coddington, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D)(Fazio, James) (kaj).
January 25, 2011 28 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple, Inc., Quattro Wireless, Inc re 25 Notice of Party With Financial Interest (Simmons, Luann)(kaj).
January 24, 2011 27 PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: Christopher C. Campbell appearing for Defendant Millennial Media, Inc. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)
January 24, 2011 26 PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: Frank V. Pietrantonio appearing for Defendant Millennial Media, Inc. (leh)
January 24, 2011 25 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Apple, Inc., Quattro Wireless, Inc (Simmons, Luann) qc mail re cert of service (kaj).
January 21, 2011 24 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Admob, Inc, Google, Inc. (McDonald, Shawn) (kaj).
January 20, 2011 23 Joint MOTION for Change Venue by Admob, Inc, Apple, Inc., Google, Inc., Jumptap, Inc, Millennial Media, Inc, Quattro Wireless, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Declaration of Apple Inc. and Quattro Wireless, Inc., # 3 Declaration of Google, Inc. and AdMob, Inc., # 4 Declaration of Jumptap, Inc., # 5 Declaration of Millennial Media, Inc., # 6 Declaration of Anne Huffsmith and Exhibits A - C, # 7 Proof of Service)(Simmons, Luann) (kaj).
January 18, 2011 22 Featured Case ORDER granting 18 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint; Nokia shall have until January 18, 2011 to answer or otherwise respond to the plaintiff's Complaint; Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 1/14/11. (kaj) (mam).
January 18, 2011 21 MOTION to Dismiss Rule 12(B)(6) Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, For a More Definite Statement by Millennial Media, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum In Support of Motion)(Kyle, John). Added MOTION for More Definite Statement on 1/19/2011 (kaj).
January 10, 2011 20 PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: Matthew B. Lowrie appearing for Defendant Google, Inc. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)
January 10, 2011 19 Featured Case ORDER granting Extension of Time 13 , 15 ; Pursuant to the joint motions submitted by the parties, defendants Millennial Media, Inc and Apple shall have until January 18, 2011 to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint; Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 1/6/11. (kaj) (jrl).
January 7, 2011 18 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by Navteq Corporation, Nokia Corporation, Nokia Inc. (Ben-Meir, David) (kaj).
January 4, 2011 17 PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: Justin Edwin Gray appearing for Defendants Admob, Inc, Google, Inc. (leh)
December 28, 2010 16 Featured Case ORDER granting 10 12 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Jumptap, Inc answer due 1/18/2011; Google, Inc. answer due 1/31/2011. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 12/28/10. (lmt) (cap).
December 28, 2010 15 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Apple, Inc., Quattro Wireless, Inc. (Simmons, Luann) (lmt).
December 28, 2010 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Luann Loraine Simmons on behalf of Apple, . Modified on 12/29/2010 (tkl).Emailed att. Missing proof of service.
December 28, 2010 13 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to complaint by Millennial Media, Inc, Streetspace, Inc. (Kyle, John)(tkl).
December 23, 2010 12 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by Jumptap, Inc. (Kjelland, Kurt) (lmt).
December 23, 2010 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Kurt M Kjelland on behalf of Jumptap, Inc (Kjelland, Kurt) (lmt).
December 21, 2010 10 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by Admob, Inc, Google, Inc.. (McDonald, Shawn)(kaj).
December 21, 2010 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Shawn E. McDonald on behalf of Admob, Inc, Google, Inc. (McDonald, Shawn) (kaj).
December 16, 2010 8 NOTICE by Streetspace, Inc NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL of Jessica Sung Mi Mitchell (Coddington, Trevor) (contacted atty re cert of service)(lmt).
December 6, 2010 7 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (cge) (av1).
September 16, 2010 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Sung Mi Mitchell on behalf of Streetspace, Inc (Mitchell, Jessica) (kaj).
September 9, 2010 5 NOTICE of Appearance by James V Fazio, III on behalf of Streetspace, Inc (Fazio, James) (kaj).
September 9, 2010 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas E Olson on behalf of Streetspace, Inc (Olson, Douglas) (kaj).
August 23, 2010 3 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Streetspace, Inc (kaj)
August 23, 2010 2 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) *6,847,969* (ecs)
August 23, 2010 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Admob, Inc, Apple, Inc., DOES, Google, Inc., Jumptap, Inc, Millennial Media, Inc, Navteq Corporation, Nokia Corporation, Nokia Inc, Quattro Wireless, Inc ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 17206.), filed by Streetspace, Inc.(ecs) (jcj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Streetspace, Inc v. Google, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Streetspace, Inc
Represented By: Trevor Quick Coddington
Represented By: James V Fazio, III
Represented By: Douglas E Olson
Represented By: Lei Sun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Represented By: Justin Edwin Gray
Represented By: Matthew B. Lowrie
Represented By: Shawn Edward McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Admob, Inc
Represented By: Justin Edwin Gray
Represented By: Shawn Edward McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Represented By: Luann Loraine Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quattro Wireless, Inc
Represented By: Luann Loraine Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nokia Corporation
Represented By: David Heskel Ben-Meir
Represented By: Michael Ira Neil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nokia Inc
Represented By: David Heskel Ben-Meir
Represented By: Michael Ira Neil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navteq Corporation
Represented By: David Heskel Ben-Meir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Millennial Media, Inc
Represented By: Christopher Charles Campbell
Represented By: Nelson Kuan
Represented By: John Shepherd Kyle
Represented By: Frank V. Pietrantonio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jumptap, Inc
Represented By: Kurt M Kjelland
Represented By: Douglas J. Kline
Represented By: William A. Meunier
Represented By: Timothy J. Rousseau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?