SAP America, Inc. v. Purple Leaf, LLC et al
Plaintiff: SAP America, Inc.
Defendant: Purple Leaf, LLC and Rani Yadav-Ranjan
Case Number: 4:2011cv04601
Filed: September 16, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 79 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE EXTENSION OF CERTAIN FILING DATES TO PERMIT FINALIZATION OF SETTLEMENT re 78 Stipulation, filed by Rani Yadav-Ranjan, Purple Leaf, LLC, Purple Leaf, LLC, a Delaware corporation. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 8/1/12. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2012)
June 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting 59 Motion to Dismiss (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2012)
May 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 69 DISCOVERY ORDER re 65 Letter filed by Rani Yadav-Ranjan, Purple Leaf, LLC, Purple Leaf, LLC, 66 Letter filed by Rani Yadav-Ranjan, Purple Leaf, LLC, Purple Leaf, LLC. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/15/2012. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2012)
April 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 4/27/2012. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2012)
March 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 56 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER re 51 Case Management Conference - Initial. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 3/27/12. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2012)
January 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 1/9/2012. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2012)
December 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting in part and denying in part 20 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re transfer to Eastern District of Texas. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2011)
October 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/5/2012. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/12/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/18/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SAP America, Inc. v. Purple Leaf, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAP America, Inc.
Represented By: Harrison J. Frahn, IV
Represented By: Gautam Vijay Kene
Represented By: Brian Patrick McCloskey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purple Leaf, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rani Yadav-Ranjan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?