Board of Trustees of the Sheet Metal Workers Local 104 Health Care Trust et al v. Moak
Plaintiff: Sheet Metal Workers Pension Trust of Northern California, Sheet Metal Workers Local 104 Vacation, Holiday Savings Plan, Bruce Word and Board of Trustees of the Sheet Metal Workers Local 104 Health Care Trust
Defendant: Timothy Moak and Jennifer Moak
Case Number: 4:2011cv04620
Filed: September 16, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER OF EXAMINATION: Judgment Debtor Exam set for 2/19/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 1/9/2013. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2013)
December 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 48 Ex Parte Application For Reference to Magistrate Judge for Judgment Debtor Exam. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2012)
November 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 46 DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Board of Trustees of the Sheet Metal Workers Local 104 Health Care Trust, Sheet Metal Workers Local 104 Vacation, Holiday Savings Plan, Sheet Metal Workers Pension Trust of Northern California, Bruce Word against Jennifer Moak, Timothy Moak. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 11/6/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2012)
October 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT. Amended Pleadings or Motions due by 11/7/2012. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/31/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2012)
June 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING 36 MOTION FOR DE NOVO REVIEW OF MAGISTRATE'S ORDER. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2012)
April 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER REQUESTING FURTHER BRIEFING re 14 MOTION for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/30/2012. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2012)
March 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE James for Report and Recommendation Re 14 MOTION. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/26/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Board of Trustees of the Sheet Metal Workers Local 104 Health Care Trust et al v. Moak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheet Metal Workers Pension Trust of Northern California
Represented By: Michael Joseph Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheet Metal Workers Local 104 Vacation, Holiday Savings Plan
Represented By: Michael Joseph Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Word
Represented By: Michael Joseph Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Sheet Metal Workers Local 104 Health Care Trust
Represented By: Michael Joseph Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Moak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Moak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?