Jones v. City of Oakland et al
Plaintiff: Lanell Monique Jones
Defendant: Does 1-100, Eriberto Perez-Angeles, Omar Daza-Quiroz and City of Oakland
Case Number: 4:2011cv04725
Filed: September 22, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Merced
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 163 Motion for Review of Taxation of Costs Awarded to City of Oakland. The Clerk's taxation of costs in amount of $6,643.70 is VACATED. None of the City's costs are to be included i n the judgment.Denying 164 Motion for Review of Taxation of Costs Awarded to Defendants Omar Daza-Quiroz and Eriberto Perez-Angeles. The Clerk's taxation of costs in amount of $10,790.56 against Plaintiff stands. The Court VACATES the hearing set for July 23, 2013. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2013)
March 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting in part and denying in part 120 Officer Defendants' Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; granting 121 City of Oakland's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2013)
March 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER #6 RE: PRETRIAL FILINGS AND MOTIONS IN LIMINE (ygrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2013)
March 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER #5 Re: Trial Exhibits and Motions in Limine.Further Pretrial Conference set Wednesday, 3/13/2013 at 8:30am. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/11/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2013)
March 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER TO ALLOW LAPTOP COMPUTER IN COURTROOM 5 FOR TRIAL re 70 Proposed Order filed by City of Oakland. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/6/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2013)
March 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER to Allow Laptop in Courthouse for use at trial in this matter; as to counsel for Defendants Perez-Angeles and Daza-Quiroz.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/4/2013. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2013)
February 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 62 PRETRIAL ORDER AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/25/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2013)
February 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER REGARDING PRETRIAL FILINGS. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/19/2013. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2013)
November 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 12/17/2012 02:00 PM. Show Cause Response due by 12/3/2012. Case Management Conference set for 12/3/2012 is CONTINUED to Monday, 12/17/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 11/28/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. City of Oakland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eriberto Perez-Angeles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omar Daza-Quiroz
Represented By: Aimee G. Hamoy-Perera
Represented By: John Jeffrey Verber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Oakland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lanell Monique Jones
Represented By: Ayanna LaKiedra Jenkins-Toney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?