Gallardo et al v. AT&T Mobility LLC
Plaintiff: George Gallardo, Carlos Barragan, Kyle Binns, Carlos Cruz, Jennifer De Witt, Hector Rodriguez and Denise Roman
Defendant: AT&T Mobility LLC
Case Number: 4:2011cv04749
Filed: September 23, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2014 Filing 71 JUDGMENT. ***Civil Case Terminated.*** Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/10/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2014)
October 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING #64 FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2014)
October 9, 2014 Filing 69 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 10/9/2014 before Claudia Wilken (Date Filed: 10/9/2014). (Court Reporter Kathy Wyatt.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/9/2014)
September 4, 2014 Filing 68 Declaration of Derek Smith Re: Notice Administration filed byCarlos Barragan, Kyle Binns, Carlos Cruz, Jennifer De Witt, George Gallardo, Hector Rodriguez, Denise Roman. (Perkins, Roberta) (Filed on 9/4/2014) Modified on 9/5/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
September 4, 2014 Filing 67 Declaration of Miles E. Locker in Support of #64 MOTION for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Award of Attorneys Fees and Costs filed byCarlos Barragan, Kyle Binns, Carlos Cruz, Jennifer De Witt, George Gallardo, Hector Rodriguez, Denise Roman. (Related document(s) #64 ) (Perkins, Roberta) (Filed on 9/4/2014) Modified on 9/5/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
September 4, 2014 Filing 66 Declaration of Roberta D. Perkins in Support of #64 MOTION for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Award of Attorneys Fees and Costs filed byCarlos Barragan, Kyle Binns, Carlos Cruz, Jennifer De Witt, George Gallardo, Hector Rodriguez, Denise Roman. (Related document(s) #64 ) (Perkins, Roberta) (Filed on 9/4/2014) Modified on 9/5/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
September 4, 2014 Filing 65 Memorandum of Points & Authorities in support of re #64 MOTION for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Award of Attorneys Fees and Costs filed byCarlos Barragan, Kyle Binns, Carlos Cruz, Jennifer De Witt, George Gallardo, Hector Rodriguez, Denise Roman. (Related document(s) #64 ) (Perkins, Roberta) (Filed on 9/4/2014) Modified on 9/5/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
September 4, 2014 Filing 64 MOTION for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Award of Attorneys Fees and Costs filed by Carlos Barragan, Kyle Binns, Carlos Cruz, Jennifer De Witt, George Gallardo, Hector Rodriguez, Denise Roman. Motion Hearing set for 10/9/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 9/18/2014. Replies due by 9/25/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Order (Proposed Judgment})(Perkins, Roberta) (Filed on 9/4/2014) Modified on 9/5/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
July 1, 2014 Reset Hearing (See Docket No. 63 ): Fairness Hearing set for 10/9/2014 02:00 PM. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2014)
June 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 63 Order granting #62 Stipulation entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
June 17, 2014 Filing 62 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Deadline to Mail Notice of Class Settlement and to Continue Final Approval Hearing filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, George Gallardo, et al (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mandel, Michael) (Filed on 6/17/2014) Modified on 6/18/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
April 30, 2014 ***See order #61 . Set/Reset Hearing. Final Approval Hearing set for 9/18/2014 02:00 PM. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2014)
April 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting #53 PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2014)
April 22, 2014 Filing 60 Joint Supplemental Brief re #53 AMENDED MOTION FOR ORDER (1) CONDITIONALLY CERTIFYING SETTLEMENT CLASS; (2) PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT; (3) DIRECTING DISTRIBUTION OF CLASS NOTICE; & (4) SETTING FINAL APPROVAL HEARING filed byAT&T Mobility LLC, George Gallardo, et al. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #53 ) (Mandel, Michael) (Filed on 4/22/2014) Modified on 4/23/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
March 20, 2014 Filing 59 AMENDED #58 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 3/20/2014 before Claudia Wilken (Date Filed: 3/20/2014). (Court Reporter Diane Skillman.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/20/2014)
March 20, 2014 Filing 58 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 3/20/2014 before Claudia Wilken (Date Filed: 3/20/2014). (Court Reporter Diane Skillman.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/20/2014)
March 20, 2014 Filing 57 CLERKS NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that the hearing on the MOTION FOR ORDER (1) CONDITIONALLY CERTIFYING SETTLEMENT CLASS; (2) PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT; (3) DIRECTING DISTRIBUTION OF CLASS NOTICE; & (4) SETTING FINAL APPROVAL HEARING scheduled for today, March 20, 2014, will be held at 2:30 p.m. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2014)
February 25, 2014 Filing 56 ADDENDUM to #54 Amended Declaration of David A. Rosenfeld in Support of #53 AMENDED MOTION FOR ORDER (1) CONDITIONALLY CERTIFYING SETTLEMENT CLASS; (2) PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT; (3) DIRECTING DISTRIBUTION OF CLASS NOTICE; & (4) SETTING FINAL APPROVAL HEARING, #54 Declaration in Support,,,filed byCarlos Barragan, Kyle Binns, Carlos Cruz, Jennifer De Witt, George Gallardo, Hector Rodriguez, Denise Roman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s), #53 #54 ) (Rosenfeld, David) (Filed on 2/25/2014) Modified on 2/26/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
February 21, 2014 Filing 55 Proposed Order re #53 Amended Motion for Order Conditionally Certifying Settlement Class; Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement; Directing Distribution of Class Notice; & Setting Final Approval Hearing by Carlos Barragan, Kyle Binns, Carlos Cruz, Jennifer De Witt, George Gallardo, Hector Rodriguez, Denise Roman. (Perkins, Roberta) (Filed on 2/21/2014) Modified on 2/24/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
February 21, 2014 Filing 54 AMENDED Declaration of David A. Rosenfeld in Support of #53 Amended Motion for Order Conditionally Certifying Settlement Class; Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement; Directing Distribution of Class Notice; & Setting Final Approval Hearing filed byCarlos Barragan, Kyle Binns, Carlos Cruz, Jennifer De Witt, George Gallardo, Hector Rodriguez, Denise Roman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Amended Declaratin of David A. Rosenfeld ISO Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, #2 Exhibit A to Amended Declaratin of David A. Rosenfeld ISO Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, #3 Exhibit B to Amended Declaratin of David A. Rosenfeld ISO Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement)(Related document(s) #53 ) (Perkins, Roberta) (Filed on 2/21/2014) Modified on 2/24/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/26/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
February 21, 2014 Filing 53 AMENDED MOTION FOR ORDER (1) CONDITIONALLY CERTIFYING SETTLEMENT CLASS; (2) PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT; (3) DIRECTING DISTRIBUTION OF CLASS NOTICE; & (4) SETTING FINAL APPROVAL HEARING filed by Carlos Barragan, Kyle Binns, Carlos Cruz, Jennifer De Witt, George Gallardo, Hector Rodriguez, Denise Roman. Motion Hearing set for 3/20/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 3/7/2014. Replies due by 3/14/2014. (Perkins, Roberta) (Filed on 2/21/2014) Modified on 2/24/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 31, 2014 Filing 52 MOTION for Order (1) Conditionally Certifying Settlement Class; (2) Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement; (3) Directing Distribution of Class Notice; (4) Setting Final Approval Hearing filed by Carlos Barragan, Kyle Binns, Carlos Cruz, Jennifer De Witt, George Gallardo, Hector Rodriguez, Denise Roman. Motion Hearing set for 3/20/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 2/14/2014. Replies due by 2/21/2014. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of M. Locker in Support, #2 Declaration of D. Rosenfeld in Support, #3 Exhibit 1 to Decltn of D. Rosenfeld, #4 Exhibit A to Exhibit 1 to Decltn of D. Rosenfeld, #5 Exhibit B to Exhibit 1 to Decltn of D. Rosenfeld)(Rosenfeld, David) (Filed on 1/31/2014) Modified on 2/3/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 16, 2014 Set Deadline (See Docket No. 51 ): Motions due by 1/31/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2014)
January 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Order granting #50 Stipulation entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
January 14, 2014 Filing 50 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Time to File Motion for Preliminary Approval filed by Carlos Barragan, Kyle Binns, Carlos Cruz, Jennifer De Witt, George Gallardo, Hector Rodriguez, Denise Roman, AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Perkins, Roberta) (Filed on 1/14/2014) Modified on 1/15/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
December 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Order granting #48 Stipulation entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
December 30, 2013 Filing 48 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation Extending Time to File Motion for Preliminary Approval filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, Carlos Barragan, Kyle Binns, Carlos Cruz, Jennifer De Witt, George Gallardo, Hector Rodriguez, Denise Roman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Perkins, Roberta) (Filed on 12/30/2013) Modified on 12/31/2013 (kk, COURT STAFF).
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting #46 Joint MOTION to Vacate #44 Case Management Statement, Notice of Settlement, Request to Vacate Case Management Conference and Set Date on Motion for Preliminary Approval, MOTION for Settlement. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2013) Modified on 12/2/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
December 2, 2013 Filing 46 Joint MOTION to Vacate #44 Case Management Statement, Notice of Settlement, Request to Vacate Case Management Conference and Set Date on Motion for Preliminary Approval, MOTION for Settlement filed by Carlos Barragan, Kyle Binns, Carlos Cruz, Jennifer De Witt, George Gallardo, Hector Rodriguez, Denise Roman, AT&T Mobility LLC. Responses due by 12/16/2013. Replies due by 12/23/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Perkins, Roberta) (Filed on 12/2/2013) Modified on 12/2/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
December 2, 2013 Reset Hearing (See Docket No. #47 ). Motion Hearing set for 3/20/2014 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2013)
November 29, 2013 Filing 45 CLERKS NOTICE re: notice of deficiency (wrong event used for entry #44) (kk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2013)
November 27, 2013 Filing 44 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Notice of Settlement; Joint Request to Vacate CMC and Set Hearing Date of Motion for Preliminary Approval filed by Carlos Barragan, Kyle Binns, Carlos Cruz, Jennifer De Witt, George Gallardo, Hector Rodriguez, Denise Roman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Perkins, Roberta) (Filed on 11/27/2013)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Order granting #42 Stipulation entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
November 22, 2013 Filing 42 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to File First Amend Complaint w/ Exhibit 1 attached: First Amended Complaint filed by Carlos Barragan, Kyle Binns, Carlos Cruz, Jennifer De Witt, George Gallardo, Hector Rodriguez, Denise Roman, AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - First Amended Complaint)(Perkins, Roberta) (Filed on 11/22/2013) Modified on 11/22/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
October 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting #40 Stipulation for Continuance of Case Management Conference (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2013)
October 24, 2013 See Docket No. #41 . Reset Deadline/Hearing: Case Management Statement due by 11/27/2013. Case Management Conference set for 12/4/2013 02:00 PM. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2013)
October 23, 2013 Filing 40 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Continuance of Case Management Conference filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, George Gallardo, et al. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mandel, Michael) (Filed on 10/23/2013) Modified on 10/24/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
September 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting #38 Stipulation TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2013)
September 23, 2013 See Docket No. #39 . Reset Deadline/Hearing: Case Management Statement due by 10/23/2013. Case Management Conference set for 10/30/2013 02:00 PM. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2013)
September 19, 2013 Filing 38 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, George Gallardo, Carlos Barragan, Kyle Binns, Carlos Cruz, Jennifer De Witt, Hector Rodriguez, Denise Roman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mandel, Michael) (Filed on 9/19/2013) Modified on 9/20/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
August 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting #36 Stipulation for Continuance of Case Management Conference. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2013)
August 12, 2013 **See Docket No. #37 ** Set Deadline/Hearing: Case Management Statement due by 9/18/2013. Case Management Conference set for 9/25/2013 02:00 PM. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2013)
August 8, 2013 Filing 36 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Continuance of Case Management Conference filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, Denise Roman, Hector Rodriguez, George Gallardo, Jennifer De Witt, Carlos Cruz, Kyle binns, Carlos Barragan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mandel, Michael) (Filed on 8/8/2013) Modified on 8/9/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
June 24, 2013 See Order, Docket No. 35 .Set Deadline/Hearing: Case Management Statement due by 8/7/2013. Case Management Conference set for 8/14/2013 02:00 PM. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2013)
June 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Order granting #34 Stipulation entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
June 19, 2013 Filing 34 JOINT STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, Carlos Barragan, Kyle Binns, Carlos Cruz, Jennifer De Witt, George Gallardo, Hector Rodriguez, Denise Roman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mandel, Michael) (Filed on 6/19/2013) Modified on 6/20/2013 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
April 17, 2013 Filing 33 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint byAT&T Mobility LLC. (Mandel, Michael) (Filed on 4/17/2013)
April 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting #31 Stipulation For Continuance of Case Management Conference. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2013)
April 10, 2013 Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 6/19/2013. Case Management Conference set for 6/26/2013 02:00 PM. See Docket No. #32 . (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2013)
April 9, 2013 Filing 31 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER For Continuance of Case Management Conference filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, George Gallardo, et al. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mandel, Michael) (Filed on 4/9/2013) Modified on 4/10/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
March 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING DEFENDANTS #22 MOTION TO DISMISS OR STRIKE. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2013)
March 29, 2013 Set Deadline/Hearing: Case Management Statement due by 4/10/2013. Case Management Conference set for 4/17/2013 02:00 PM. See Docket No. #30 . (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2013)
September 26, 2012 Filing 29 Certificate of Interested Entities by Carlos Barragan, Kyle Binns, Carlos Cruz, Jennifer De Witt, George Gallardo, Hector Rodriguez, Denise Roman (Perkins, Roberta) (Filed on 9/26/2012)
September 24, 2012 Filing 28 Amended Joint Case Management Statement by AT&T Mobility LLC, Denise Roman, Hector Rodriguez, George Gallardo, Jennifer De Witt, Carlos Cruz, Kyle Binns, Carlos Barragan. (Mandel, Michael) (Filed on 9/24/2012) Modified on 9/25/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
September 24, 2012 Filing 27 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, Denise Roman, Hector Rodriguez, George Gallardo, Jennifer De Witt, Carlos Cruz, Kyle Binns, Carlos Barragan. (Mandel, Michael) (Filed on 9/24/2012) Modified on 9/25/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
September 24, 2012 CLERKS NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that the Court, on its own motion, shall take the #22 motion to dismiss under submission on the papers. The hearing and the case management conference previously scheduled for Thursday, September 27, 2012, are vacated. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2012)
September 6, 2012 Filing 26 REPLY (re #22 MOTION to Dismiss and/or Strike Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and/or 12(f) ) filed byAT&T Mobility LLC. (Mandel, Michael) (Filed on 9/6/2012)
August 31, 2012 CLERKS NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that the #22 motion to dismiss and the case management conference, previously set for Thursday, September 20, 2012, are continued to Thursday, September 27, 2012, at 2:00 p.m. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2012)
August 23, 2012 Filing 25 RESPONSE (re #22 MOTION to Dismiss and/or Strike Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and/or 12(f) ) filed byCarlos Barragan, Kyle Binns, Carlos Cruz, Jennifer De Witt, George Gallardo, Hector Rodriguez, Denise Roman. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Counsel, R.D. Perkins, #2 Exhibit 1 to Dcltn of Counsel, #3 Exhibit 2 to Dcltn of Counsel, #4 Exhibit 3 to Dcltn of Counsel, #5 Exhibit 4 to Dcltn of Counsel, #6 Exhibit 5 to Dcltn of Counsel, #7 Exhibit 6 to Dcltn of Counsel)(Perkins, Roberta) (Filed on 8/23/2012)
June 28, 2012 Reset Deadlines as to #22 MOTION to Dismiss and/or Strike Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and/or 12(f). Responses due by 8/23/2012. Replies due by 9/6/2012. Motion Hearing set for 9/20/2012 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Case Management Statement due by 9/13/2012. Case Management Conference set for 9/20/2012 02:00 PM. See Text 24 Order. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2012)
June 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Order granting #23 Stipulation entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
June 26, 2012 Filing 23 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Rescheduling Hearing Date, Setting Briefing Schedule on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and/or Strike Plaintiffs' Complaint and Continuing Case Management Conference filed by Carlos Barragan, Kyle Binns, Carlos Cruz, Jennifer De Witt, George Gallardo, Hector Rodriguez, Denise Roman, AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Perkins, Roberta) (Filed on 6/26/2012) Modified on 6/27/2012 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
June 18, 2012 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss and/or Strike Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and/or 12(f) filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. Motion Hearing set for 8/2/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 7/2/2012. Replies due by 7/9/2012. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mandel, Michael) (Filed on 6/18/2012)
May 7, 2012 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Admissions due by 6/28/2012. Case Management Statement due by 7/19/2012. Case Management Conference set for 7/26/2012 02:00 PM. See Text 21 Order. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2012)
May 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Order granting #20 Stipulation entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. The further CMC will be held on July 26 at 2 pm. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
May 2, 2012 Filing 20 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER FOR FINAL EXTENSION OF CURRENT STAY OF ACTION PENDING PURSUIT OF INFORMAL RESOLUTION filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, George Gallardo, et al. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mandel, Michael) (Filed on 5/2/2012) Modified on 5/3/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
February 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting #18 Stipulation TO FURTHER STAYING ACTION UNTIL MAY 4, 2012 FOR PURSUIT OF INFORMAL RESOLUTION. Case Management Statement due by 6/6/2012. Case Management Conference set for 6/13/2012 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/29/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2012)
February 28, 2012 Filing 18 JOINT STIPULATION TO FURTHER STAYING ACTION UNTIL MAY 4, 2012 FOR PURSUIT OF INFORMAL RESOLUTION filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, George Gallardo, Carlos Barragan, Kyle Binns, Carlos Cruz, Jennifer De Witt Hector, Rodriguez Denise Roman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Further Staying Action Until May 4, 2012 For Pursuit Of Informal Resolution)(Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 2/28/2012) Modified on 2/29/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
January 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Order granting #16 Stipulation entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. CMC is continued to March 7, 2012. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
January 20, 2012 Set Deadlines/Hearings Pursuant to Docket No. 17 : Case Management Statement due by 2/29/2012. Case Management Conference set for 3/7/2012 02:00 PM. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2012)
January 19, 2012 Filing 16 JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE #14 STAY OF ACTION PENDING PURSUIT OF INFORMAL RESOLUTION filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, George Gallardo, et al . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mandel, Michael) (Filed on 1/19/2012) Modified on 1/20/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
December 15, 2011 Filing 15 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Perkins, Roberta) (Filed on 12/15/2011)
December 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting #12 Stipulation To Stay Action Pending Pursuit Of Informal Resolution. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/2/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2011)
December 2, 2011 CLERKS NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that the Case Management Conference, previously set for Wednesday, January 25, 2012, is continued to Wednesday, February 29, 2012, at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA 94612. Case Management Statement due by February 22, 2012. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2011)
November 30, 2011 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AT&T Mobility LLC RE: CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER (Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 11/30/2011)
November 28, 2011 Filing 12 JOINT STIPULATION To Stay Action Pending Pursuit Of Informal Resolution by AT&T Mobility LLC, George Gallardo, et al. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mandel, Michael) (Filed on 11/28/2011) Modified on 11/29/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
November 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE: Case Management Statement due by 1/18/2012. Case Management Conference set for 1/25/2012 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 11/28/2011. (Attachments: #1 Notice/Standing Order)(ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2011)
November 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Claudia Wilken for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 11/23/11. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2011)
November 22, 2011 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (bjtS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2011)
November 21, 2011 Filing 8 Joint Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by AT&T Mobility LLC and Request for Reassignment. (Mandel, Michael) (Filed on 11/21/2011)
October 27, 2011 Filing 7 STIPULATION (Joint) To Extend Time To Respond To Initial Complaint by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Mandel, Michael) (Filed on 10/27/2011)
September 29, 2011 Filing 6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT Pursuant to Local Rule 6-1 by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Kane, Matthew) (Filed on 9/29/2011)
September 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 12/29/2011. Case Management Conference set for 1/5/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/23/11. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2011)
September 23, 2011 Filing 4 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by AT&T Mobility LLC (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2011)
September 23, 2011 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by AT&T Mobility LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2011)
September 23, 2011 Filing 2 Declaration of Thomas Conway in Support of #1 Notice of Removal, filed byAT&T Mobility LLC. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2011) Modified on 12/15/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF). (cp, COURT STAFF).
September 23, 2011 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL /no process from Alameda County Superior Court. Their case number is RG 11591396. (Filing fee $350 receipt number 34611065007). Filed byAT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2011)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gallardo et al v. AT&T Mobility LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Gallardo
Represented By: David Albert Rosenfeld
Represented By: Miles Eric Locker
Represented By: Roberta D. Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Barragan
Represented By: David Albert Rosenfeld
Represented By: Miles Eric Locker
Represented By: Roberta D. Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Binns
Represented By: David Albert Rosenfeld
Represented By: Miles Eric Locker
Represented By: Roberta D. Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Cruz
Represented By: David Albert Rosenfeld
Represented By: Miles Eric Locker
Represented By: Roberta D. Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer De Witt
Represented By: David Albert Rosenfeld
Represented By: Miles Eric Locker
Represented By: Roberta D. Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hector Rodriguez
Represented By: David Albert Rosenfeld
Represented By: Miles Eric Locker
Represented By: Roberta D. Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Roman
Represented By: David Albert Rosenfeld
Represented By: Miles Eric Locker
Represented By: Roberta D. Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Mobility LLC
Represented By: Matthew C. Kane
Represented By: Michael David Mandel
Represented By: Sylvia Jihae Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?